Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1615574

EP1615574 - DIRECTIONAL LASER PROBE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.03.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.12.2018Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Synergetics, Inc.
3845 Corporate Centre Drive
St. Charles, MO 63304 / US
[2006/03]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHELLER, Gregg D.
17820 Suzanne Ridge Drive
Wildwood, MO 63038 / US
02 / AULD, Michael D.
5376 NW 120th Avenue
Coral Springs FL 33076 / US
 [2007/36]
Former [2006/03]01 / SCHELLER, Gregg D.
17820 Suzanne Ridge Drive
Wildwood, MO 63038 / US
02 / AULD, Michael D.
2007 Chesterfield Forest Drive
Chesterfield, MO 63005 / US
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/18]Hackney, Nigel John , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London
EC2V 8AS / GB
Former [2006/03]Hackney, Nigel John , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date04758955.126.03.2004
[2006/03]
WO2004US09115
Priority number, dateUS2003040987409.04.2003         Original published format: US 409874
[2006/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004091380
Date:28.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/44]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1615574
Date:18.01.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2004
[2006/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1615574
Date:02.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US29.09.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/18, A61B18/22, A61F9/011, A61M25/01, // A61B17/00, A61B18/24
[2009/07]
Former International [2006/03]A61B18/18
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/03]
TitleGerman:DIREKTIONALE LASERSONDE[2006/03]
English:DIRECTIONAL LASER PROBE[2006/03]
French:SONDE LASER DIRECTIONNELLE[2006/03]
Entry into regional phase31.10.2005National basic fee paid 
31.10.2005Search fee paid 
31.10.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
31.10.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.01.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
31.10.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.10.2005Examination requested  [2006/03]
29.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.03.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
20.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.11.2011Fee for grant paid
24.11.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)EP11168927.9   Application refused  : 01.12.2011
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.05.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.02.2013  07.02.2013  ADMISSIBLE
D.O.R.C. International B.V.
Zuidland / NL
Opponents representative
V.O., et al
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
 [2015/47]
Former [2013/11]
Opponent(s)01  04.02.2013  07.02.2013  ADMISSIBLE
D.O.R.C. International B.V.
Zuidland / NL
Opponents representative
Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al
VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
08.03.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.09.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
24.06.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.06.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition02.09.2015Appeal received No.  T1756/15
02.11.2015Statement of grounds filed
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
25.02.2010Request for further processing filed
25.02.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.03.2010Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
20.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200603   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2006
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.03.2004
CY02.05.2012
CZ02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
EE02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
RO02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
SK02.05.2012
TR02.05.2012
BG02.08.2012
IE26.03.2013
LU26.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]CY02.05.2012
CZ02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
EE02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
RO02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
SK02.05.2012
TR02.05.2012
BG02.08.2012
IE26.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
Former [2014/07]CY02.05.2012
CZ02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
EE02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
RO02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
SK02.05.2012
BG02.08.2012
IE26.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
Former [2013/47]CY02.05.2012
CZ02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
EE02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
RO02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
SK02.05.2012
BG02.08.2012
MC31.03.2013
Former [2013/34]CY02.05.2012
CZ02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
EE02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
RO02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
SK02.05.2012
BG02.08.2012
Former [2013/10]CY02.05.2012
CZ02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
EE02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
RO02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
SK02.05.2012
Former [2013/09]CY02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
EE02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
Former [2013/08]CY02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
Former [2012/51]CY02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
Former [2012/49]CY02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
Former [2012/48]FI02.05.2012
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0938871  (ECLIPSE SURGICAL TECH [US]) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraph [0049]; figure 8A * [Y] 6,7;
 [Y]WO0061023  (SYNERGETICS INC [US]) [Y] 6,7 * items with reference numerals 40 and 26 *;
 [X]WO9824513  (THERMO MED 2000 KFT [HU], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 2, line 29 - page 4, line 2; figures 1,3 *;
 [X]EP0682910  (TIEBER FRIEDRICH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * column 5, lines 7-12; figure 1 *;
 [X]WO9726836  (RITA MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-5 * item with reference numeral 42; page 7, line 29 - page 8, line 1; figures 4-6 *;
 [X]US5281214  (WILKINS DOUGLAS P [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7 * figure 5 *
International search[X]US5281214  (WILKINS DOUGLAS P [US], et al);
 [Y]US5855577  (MURPHY-CHUTORIAN DOUGLAS R [US], et al);
 [Y]US5469524  (ESCH VICTOR C [US], et al)