Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1618597

EP1618597 - Partial response receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2006/04]PARTIAL RESPONSE RECEIVER
[2008/44]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.01.2010
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rambus, Inc.
4440 El Camino Real
Los Altos, CA 94022 / US
[2006/04]
Inventor(s)01 / STOJANOVIC, Vladimir, M.
73 Barnes Court, Apartment B
Stanford, CA 94305 / US
02 / HOROWITZ, Mark, A.
1309 San Mateo Drive
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
03 / ZERBE, Jared, L.
431 Hillside Drive
Woodside, CA 94062 / US
04 / BESSIOS, Anthony
39469 Galluadet Drive
Fremont, CA 94538 / US
05 / HO, Andrew, C., C.
87 Almendral Avenue
Atherton, CA 94027 / US
06 / WEI, Jason, C.
18830 Newsom Avenue
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
07 / TSANG, Grace
11935 Rhus Ridge Road
Los Altos Hills, California 94022 / US
08 / GARLEPP, Bruno, W.
5193 Rhonda Drive
San Jose, CA 95129 / US
 [2007/19]
Former [2007/15]01 / STOJANOVIC, Vladimir, M.
73 Barnes Court, Apartment B
Stanford, CA 94305 / US
02 / HOROWITZ, Mark, A.
1309 San Mateo Drive
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
03 / ZERBE, Jared, L.
431 Hillside Drive
Woodside, CA 94062 / US
04 / BESSIOS, Anthony
39469 Galluadet Drive
Fremont, CA 94538 / US
05 / HO, Andrew, C., C.
3725 Ortega Court
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
06 / WEI, Jason, C.
18830 Newsom Avenue
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
07 / TSANG, Grace
11935 Rhus Ridge Road
Los Altos Hills, California 94022 / US
08 / GARLEPP, Bruno, W.
5193 Rhonda Drive
San Jose, CA 95129 / US
Former [2007/13]01 / STOJANOVIC, Vladimir, M.
73 Barnes Court, Apartment B
Stanford, CA 94305 / US
02 / HOROWITZ, Mark, A.
13961 Fremont Pines Lane
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
03 / ZERBE, Jared, L.
431 Hillside Drive
Woodside, CA 94062 / US
04 / BESSIOS, Anthony
39469 Galluadet Drive
Fremont, CA 94538 / US
05 / HO, Andrew, C., C.
3725 Ortega Court
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
06 / WEI, Jason, C.
18830 Newsom Avenue
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
07 / TSANG, Grace
11935 Rhus Ridge Road
Los Altos Hills, California 94022 / US
08 / GARLEPP, Bruno, W.
5193 Rhonda Drive
San Jose, CA 95129 / US
Former [2007/09]01 / STOJANOVIC, Vladimir, M.
73 Barnes Court, Apartment B
Stanford, CA 94305 / US
02 / HOROWITZ, Mark, A.
13961 Fremont Pines Lane
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
03 / ZERBE, Jared, L.
431 Hillside Drive
Woodside, CA 94062 / US
04 / BESSIOS, Anthony
39469 Galluadet Drive
Fremont, CA 94538 / US
05 / HO, Andrew, C., C.
3725 Ortega Court
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
06 / WEI, Jason, C.
18830 Newsom Avenue
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
07 / Grace TSANG
11935 Rhus Ridge Road
Los Altos Hills, California 94022 / US
08 / GARLEPP, Bruno, W.
5193 Rhonda Drive
San Jose, CA 95129 / US
Former [2006/04]01 / STOJANOVIC, Vladimir, M.
73 Barnes Court, Apartment B
Stanford, CA 94305 / US
02 / HOROWITZ, Mark, A.
13961 Fremont Pines Lane
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
03 / ZERBE, Jared, L.
431 Hillside Drive
Woodside, CA 94062 / US
04 / BESSIOS, Anthony
39469 Galluadet Drive
Fremont, CA 94538 / US
05 / HO, Andrew, C., C.
3725 Ortega Court
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
06 / WEI, Jason, C.
18830 Newsom Avenue
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
07 / TSANG, Grace
1165 Laureles Drive
Los Altos, CA 94022 / US
08 / GARLEPP, Bruno, W.
5193 Rhonda Drive
San Jose, CA 95129 / US
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1
20355 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/28]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1
20355 Hamburg / DE
Former [2008/40]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Former [2006/04]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date04759335.509.04.2004
[2006/04]
WO2004US10980
Priority number, dateUS20030461729P09.04.2003         Original published format: US 461729 P
US2003066287216.09.2003         Original published format: US 662872
[2006/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004093144
Date:28.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/44]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1618597
Date:25.01.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2004
[2006/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1618597
Date:25.03.2009
Language:EN
[2009/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.10.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.05.2007
ClassificationInternational:H04L25/06
[2007/15]
Former International [2006/48]H03H7/30, H03H7/40, H03K5/159
Former International [2006/04]H01L21/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/04]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Partialantwortempfänger[2008/44]
English:Partial response receiver[2008/44]
French:Récepteur à response partielle[2008/44]
Former [2006/04]PARTIALANTWORTEMPFÄNGER
Former [2006/04]PARTIAL RESPONSE RECEIVER
Former [2006/04]RECEPTEUR A REPONSE PARTIELLE
Entry into regional phase09.11.2005National basic fee paid 
09.11.2005Search fee paid 
14.03.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
14.03.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.11.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.03.2006Examination requested  [2006/19]
01.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.02.2009Fee for grant paid
09.02.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP05024725.3  / EP1626547
EP09155838.7  / EP2063593
EP10175167.5  / EP2259519
EP15169337.1  / EP2945335
Opposition(s)29.12.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
14.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.03.2009
BE25.03.2009
CY25.03.2009
CZ25.03.2009
DK25.03.2009
EE25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
NL25.03.2009
PL25.03.2009
RO25.03.2009
SI25.03.2009
SK25.03.2009
TR25.03.2009
IE09.04.2009
LU09.04.2009
CH30.04.2009
LI30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG25.06.2009
SE25.06.2009
GR26.06.2009
ES06.07.2009
PT01.09.2009
HU26.09.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/32]AT25.03.2009
BE25.03.2009
CZ25.03.2009
DK25.03.2009
EE25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
NL25.03.2009
PL25.03.2009
RO25.03.2009
SI25.03.2009
SK25.03.2009
IE09.04.2009
LU09.04.2009
CH30.04.2009
LI30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG25.06.2009
SE25.06.2009
GR26.06.2009
ES06.07.2009
PT01.09.2009
HU26.09.2009
Former [2011/21]AT25.03.2009
BE25.03.2009
CZ25.03.2009
DK25.03.2009
EE25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
NL25.03.2009
PL25.03.2009
RO25.03.2009
SI25.03.2009
SK25.03.2009
IE09.04.2009
LU09.04.2009
CH30.04.2009
LI30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG25.06.2009
SE25.06.2009
GR26.06.2009
ES06.07.2009
PT01.09.2009
Former [2010/50]AT25.03.2009
BE25.03.2009
CZ25.03.2009
DK25.03.2009
EE25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
NL25.03.2009
PL25.03.2009
RO25.03.2009
SI25.03.2009
SK25.03.2009
IE09.04.2009
CH30.04.2009
LI30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG25.06.2009
SE25.06.2009
GR26.06.2009
ES06.07.2009
PT01.09.2009
Former [2010/21]AT25.03.2009
BE25.03.2009
CZ25.03.2009
DK25.03.2009
EE25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
NL25.03.2009
PL25.03.2009
RO25.03.2009
SI25.03.2009
SK25.03.2009
IE09.04.2009
CH30.04.2009
LI30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG25.06.2009
SE25.06.2009
ES06.07.2009
PT01.09.2009
Former [2010/10]AT25.03.2009
BE25.03.2009
CZ25.03.2009
DK25.03.2009
EE25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
NL25.03.2009
PL25.03.2009
RO25.03.2009
SI25.03.2009
SK25.03.2009
CH30.04.2009
LI30.04.2009
BG25.06.2009
SE25.06.2009
ES06.07.2009
PT01.09.2009
Former [2009/51]AT25.03.2009
BE25.03.2009
CZ25.03.2009
EE25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
NL25.03.2009
PL25.03.2009
RO25.03.2009
SI25.03.2009
SK25.03.2009
SE25.06.2009
ES06.07.2009
PT01.09.2009
Former [2009/46]AT25.03.2009
BE25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
PL25.03.2009
SI25.03.2009
SE25.06.2009
ES06.07.2009
Former [2009/44]AT25.03.2009
BE25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
PL25.03.2009
SI25.03.2009
SE25.06.2009
Former [2009/41]AT25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
PL25.03.2009
SI25.03.2009
SE25.06.2009
Former [2009/36]FI25.03.2009
SI25.03.2009
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5191462  (GITLIN RICHARD D [US], et al) [X] 2-6 * column 5, line 23 - line 43 * * column 6, line 52 - column 7, line 25 * * figures 1,2,4 * [A] 1
International search[Y]US5191462  (GITLIN RICHARD D [US], et al);
 [Y]US6304071  (POPPLEWELL ANDREW [GB], et al);
 [Y]US5448200  (FERNANDEZ FRANCISCO J [US], et al);
 [Y]US6262591  (HUI DAVID T [US]);
 [Y]US6118824  (SMITH DOUGLAS G [US], et al);
 [Y]US5402378  (MIN KYUNG-YOUL [KR], et al);
 [Y]US3582879  (SULLIVAN HERBERT)
 [Y]  - KASTURIA ET AL., "Techniques for High-Speed Implementation of Nonlinear Cancellation", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATION, (199106), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 711 - 717, XP002179197

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.87640
 [Y]  - WINTERS ET AL., "Adaptive Nonlinear Cancellation for High-Speed Fiber-Optic Systems", IEEE JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, (199207), vol. 10, no. 7, pages 971 - 977, XP000301488

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.144921