Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1621052

EP1621052 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ALIGNMENT OF COMPONENTS OF A PLASMA ARC TORCH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.11.2010
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hypertherm, Inc.
Etna Road
P.O. Box 5010
Hanover, NH 03755 / US
[2012/01]
Former [2006/05]For all designated states
HYPERTHERM, INC.
P.O. Box 5010, Etna Road
Hanover, NH 03755 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BRANDT, Aaron, D.
PO Box 620
Grantham NH 03753 / US
02 / ANDERSON, Richard, R.
171 Rum Brook Lane
Grantham, NH 03753 / US
03 / CURRIER, Brian, J.
10 Second Street
Newport, NH 03773 / US
04 / LINDSAY, Jon W.
Meadow Brook Village, Building 2, Apartment 8
West Lebanon, NH 03784 / US
05 / DUAN, Zheng
15 Carriage Lane
Hanover, NH 03755 / US
06 / JONES, Casey
100 Jones Hill Road
Enfield, NH 03748 / US
07 / SHIPULSKI, Edward, M.
5 Moody Lane
Etna, NH 03750 / US
 [2007/15]
Former [2006/05]01 / BRANDT, Aaron, D.
3 Tenley Drive
West Lebanon, NH 03784 / US
02 / ANDERSON, Richard, R.
171 Rum Brook Lane
Grantham, NH 03753 / US
03 / CURRIER, Brian, J.
10 Second Street
Newport, NH 03773 / US
04 / LINDSAY, Jon W.
Meadow Brook Village, Building 2, Apartment 8
West Lebanon, NH 03784 / US
05 / DUAN, Zheng
15 Carriage Lane
Hanover, NH 03755 / US
06 / JONES, Casey
100 Jones Hill Road
Enfield, NH 03748 / US
07 / SHIPULSKI, Edward, M.
5 Moody Lane
Etna, NH 03750 / US
Representative(s)Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/05]Trueman, Lucy Petra
Barker Brettell, 138 Hagley Road, Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Application number, filing date04759383.509.04.2004
[2006/05]
WO2004US11072
Priority number, dateUS2003041180111.04.2003         Original published format: US 411801
[2006/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004093502
Date:28.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1621052
Date:01.02.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2004
[2006/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1621052
Date:15.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.10.2004
ClassificationInternational:H05H1/28, H05H1/34
[2006/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/05]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HR11.11.2005
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSRICHTUNG VON KOMPONENTEN EINES PLASMABOGENBRENNERS[2006/05]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ALIGNMENT OF COMPONENTS OF A PLASMA ARC TORCH[2006/05]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'ALIGNEMENT DES COMPOSANTS D'UNE TORCHE AU PLASMA D'ARC[2010/25]
Former [2006/05]PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'ALIGNEMENT DES COMPOSANTS D'UN CHALUMEAU DE SOUDAGE AU PLASMA
Entry into regional phase11.11.2005National basic fee paid 
11.11.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
11.11.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.11.2005Examination requested  [2006/05]
04.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.04.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2009Observations by third parties
28.06.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.09.2010Fee for grant paid
28.09.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10184398.5  / EP2265098
EP10184945.3  / EP2271190
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.07.2011  11.08.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Thermacut, k.s
Sokolovská 574
68601 Uherské Hradiste / CZ
Opponent's representative
Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
 02  15.09.2011  26.09.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Kjellberg Finsterwalde Plasma und Maschinen GmbH
Leipziger Strasse 82
03238 Finsterwalde / DE
Opponent's representative
Manasse, Uwe
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
 03  13.12.2017  31.07.2018  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
B&Bartoni, spol. s r.o.
Doubravicka 18
294 30 Dolní Cetno / CZ
Opponent's representative
Lachmannová, Eva
Sindelka & Lachmannová, advokati
Rimská 103/12
120 00 Praha 2 / CZ
 [2018/43]
Former [2018/22]
Opponent(s)01  29.07.2011  11.08.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Thermacut s.r.o.
Uherské Hradiste / CZ
Opponent's representative
Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
 02  15.09.2011  26.09.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Kjellberg Finsterwalde Plasma und Maschinen GmbH
Leipziger Strasse 82
03238 Finsterwalde / DE
Opponent's representative
Manasse, Uwe
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
 03  13.12.2017  13.12.2017  INTERVENTION
B&Bartoni, spol. s r.o.
Doubravicka 18
294 30 Dolní Cetno / CZ
Opponent's representative
Lachmannová, Eva
Sindelka & Lachmannová, advokati
Rimská 103/12
120 00 Praha 2 / CZ
Former [2017/42]
Opponent(s)01  29.07.2011  11.08.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Thermacut s.r.o.
Uherské Hradiste / CZ
Opponent's representative
Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
 02  15.09.2011  26.09.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Kjellberg Finsterwalde Plasma und Maschinen GmbH
Leipziger Strasse 82
03238 Finsterwalde / DE
Opponent's representative
Manasse, Uwe
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
Former [2011/43]
Opponent(s)01  29.07.2011  11.08.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Holma AG Laser & Plasma Consumables
Rietbergstrasse 49
9403 Goldach / CH
Opponent's representative
Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
 02  15.09.2011   
Kjellberg Finsterwalde Plasma und Maschinen GmbH
Leipziger Strasse 82
03238 Finsterwalde / DE
Opponent's representative
Manasse, Uwe
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2011/36]
Opponent(s)01  29.07.2011   
Holma AG Laser & Plasma Consumables
Rietbergstrasse 49
9403 Goldach / CH
Opponent's representative
Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
24.10.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.04.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
17.07.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.07.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition25.09.2015Appeal received No.  T1924/15
27.11.2015Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
10.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
07.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.12.2010
BE15.12.2010
CY15.12.2010
DK15.12.2010
EE15.12.2010
HU15.12.2010
PL15.12.2010
RO15.12.2010
SE15.12.2010
SI15.12.2010
BG15.03.2011
GR16.03.2011
IE09.04.2011
LU09.04.2011
PT15.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2011/37]AT15.12.2010
BE15.12.2010
CY15.12.2010
EE15.12.2010
PL15.12.2010
RO15.12.2010
SE15.12.2010
SI15.12.2010
BG15.03.2011
GR16.03.2011
PT15.04.2011
Former [2011/36]AT15.12.2010
BE15.12.2010
CY15.12.2010
EE15.12.2010
PL15.12.2010
SE15.12.2010
SI15.12.2010
BG15.03.2011
GR16.03.2011
PT15.04.2011
Former [2011/35]AT15.12.2010
BE15.12.2010
CY15.12.2010
EE15.12.2010
SE15.12.2010
SI15.12.2010
BG15.03.2011
GR16.03.2011
PT15.04.2011
Former [2011/32]AT15.12.2010
BE15.12.2010
CY15.12.2010
SE15.12.2010
SI15.12.2010
BG15.03.2011
Former [2011/24]CY15.12.2010
SE15.12.2010
Cited inInternational search[XA]US2001007320  (SEVERANCE WAYNE STANLEY [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-9,11,16-20,24-27,31,33,35 * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0060] * * figure 1a * [A] 36;
 [X]WO9010366  (TETRONICS RES & DEV CO LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,6-9,11,12,16-20,24-27,30,31,33,35 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 2 * * page 14, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,5 *;
 [A]US5906758  (SEVERANCE JR WAYNE STANLEY [US]) [A] 1,2,6-8,10-12,16-20,24-27,30-33,35,36 * figure 2 *
otherUS2001007320
 WO9010366