Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1622486

EP1622486 - DRAWER CLOSING MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.01.2012
Database last updated on 19.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.01.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.02.2012  [2012/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Grass GmbH
Grassplatz 1
6973 Höchst / AT
[2006/34]
Former [2006/06]For all designated states
Grass America, Inc.
1202 Highway 66 South
Kernersville, NC 27284 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WIKLUND, Ken
1853 Canyon Falls Court
Kewlona, British Columbia V1W4A5 / CA
02 / BOOKER, Todd
120 Carriage House Trail
Garner, North Carolina 27529 / US
03 / DOMENIG, Georg
1110 Whispering Pines Drive
Kernersville, North Carolina 27284 / US
 [2007/20]
Former [2006/06]01 / WIKLUND, Ken
4811 Lakeshore Place
Kewlona, British Columbia V1W 4H6 / CA
02 / BOOKER, Todd
120 Carriage House Trail
Garner, North Carolina 27529 / US
03 / DOMENIG, Georg
1110 Whispering Pines Drive
Kernersville, North Carolina 27284 / US
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
[2006/06]
Application number, filing date04761000.113.05.2004
[2006/06]
WO2004US14989
Priority number, dateUS20030470054P13.05.2003         Original published format: US 470054 P
US20030527596P05.12.2003         Original published format: US 527596 P
[2006/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004100716
Date:25.11.2004
Language:EN
[2004/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1622486
Date:08.02.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2004
[2006/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US25.11.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:A47B88/00
[2006/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/06]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHUBLADENSCHLIESSMECHANISMUS[2006/06]
English:DRAWER CLOSING MECHANISM[2006/06]
French:MECANISME DE FERMETURE D'UN TIROIR[2006/06]
Entry into regional phase23.11.2005National basic fee paid 
23.11.2005Search fee paid 
23.11.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
23.11.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.11.2005Examination requested  [2006/06]
25.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.08.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/06]
21.09.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/06]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.11.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
24.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201108   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4494806  (WILLIAMS V HAROLD [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * column 3, line 41 - column 9, line 55; figures 1-4 *;
 [PX]EP1405581  (GRASS GMBH [AT]) [PX] 1-11 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0075]; figures 1-35 *;
 [A]US4550470  (OMATA NOBUAKI [JP]) [A] 1-11 * column 2, line 66 - column 7, line 56; figures 1-7 *
International search[Y]US6499818  (BRUESTLE KLAUS [AT]);
 [Y]US4428307  (VASQUEZ TULIO [CO]);
 [A]US3836222  (KUNTZE G);
 [A]US4436989  (SCHULDT GERHARDT [DE]);
 [A]US5015048  (BRUNNERT EBERHARD [DE]);
 [A]US5377062  (GIELKENS MARC [AT], et al);
 [A]US5564807  (ROECK ERICH [AT], et al);
 [A]US6039421  (FULTERER MANFRED [AT])