Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1676226

EP1676226 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SCALABLE MEETINGS IN A DISCUSSION SYNTHESIS ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.03.2007
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Synthetron NV
MBrussels Village
Paleizenstraat 44
1030 Brussels / BE
[2016/10]
Former [2006/27]For all designated states
Synthetron NV
Elegemstraat 120
1700 Dilbeek / BE
Inventor(s)01 / VERHAEGHE, Paul, Charles
Ringlaan 80
B-3080 Tervuren / BE
02 / FAIETA, Baldo
Sint Antoniuskaai 9k
B-9000 Gent / BE
 [2007/12]
Former [2006/27]01 / VERHAEGHE, Paul, Charles
Elegemstraat 120
B-1700 Dilbeek / BE
02 / FAIETA, Baldo
Sint Antoniuskaai 9k
B-9000 Gent / BE
Representative(s)Office Kirkpatrick
Avenue Wolfers, 32
1310 La Hulpe / BE
[N/P]
Former [2006/27]Bird, William Edward , et al
Bird Goen & Co., Klein Dalenstraat 42A
3020 Winksele / BE
Application number, filing date04761497.927.09.2004
[2006/27]
WO2004BE00136
Priority number, dateWO2003EP1066825.09.2003         Original published format: PCT/EP0310/668
[2006/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005029372
Date:31.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1676226
Date:05.07.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2005
[2006/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.03.2005
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/00
[2006/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/27]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR SKALIERBARE BESPRECHUNGEN IN EINER DISKUSSIONSSYNTHESEUMGEBUNG[2006/27]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SCALABLE MEETINGS IN A DISCUSSION SYNTHESIS ENVIRONMENT[2006/27]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE RENCONTRES MISES A L'ECHELLE DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT DE SYNTHESE DE DISCUSSIONS[2006/27]
Entry into regional phase25.04.2006National basic fee paid 
25.04.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
25.04.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.07.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.04.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.04.2006Examination requested  [2006/27]
18.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.2015Date of oral proceedings
19.06.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
19.06.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination10.08.2015Appeal received No.  T2072/15
16.10.2015Statement of grounds filed
29.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.08.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
04.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
26.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
26.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
17.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
25.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
31.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
28.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 14
26.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 15
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201209   M06   Fee paid on   26.12.2012
30.09.201310   M06   Fee paid on   17.03.2014
30.09.201411   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2015
30.09.201916   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0103026  (VERHAEGHE PAUL C) [X] 1-58 * abstract * * page 2, line 13 - page 33 * * page 4, line 13 - page 5, line 2 * * claims 1,3 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO0237231  (COOLCRYPT LTD ; HORTON CATHY B (GB)) [A] 1-58 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 4 *;
 [A]US6347332  (MALET EDWIN I ET AL) [A] 1-58 * abstract *;
 [A]US5878214  (GILLIAM TERRY K ET AL) [A] 1-58 * abstract *
 [A]  - "AUTOMATIC CATEGORIZATION TOOL FOR ORGANIZING BRAINSTORMING COMMENTS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (1998), vol. 41, no. 1, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 207 - 209, XP000772078 [A] 1-58 * the whole document *