Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1675464

EP1675464 - WEED CONTROL IN JOINTS OF CONCRETE BLOCK AND OTHER PAVING STONE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.12.2016
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2018Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sønderberg, Frederiksen Jens
Brydevej 10
5700 Svendborg / DK
For all designated states
Beck, Poul Konrad
Søholt Allé 14
8600 Silkeborg / DK
For all designated states
Hvorslev, Steffen Birk
Svingelvej 8
8840 Rødkærsbro / DK
[2014/23]
Former [2006/27]For all designated states
Sonderberg, Frederiksen Jens
Brydevej 10
5700 Svendborg / DK
For all designated states
Beck, Poul Konrad
Soholt Allé 14
8600 Silkeborg / DK
For all designated states
Hvorslev, Steffen Birk
Svingelvej 8
8840 Rodkaersbro / DK
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2006/27]
Representative(s)Tellefsen, Jens J. , et al
Patrade A/S
Ceresbyen 75
8000 Aarhus C / DK
[N/P]
Former [2014/23]Tellefsen, Jens J. , et al
Patrade A/S Fredens Torv 3A
8000 Aarhus C / DK
Former [2006/27]Tellefsen, Jens J. , et al
Patrade A/S, Fredens Torv 3A
8000 Aarhus C / DK
Application number, filing date04762849.017.09.2004
[2006/27]
WO2004DK00629
Priority number, dateDK2003000134717.09.2003         Original published format: DK 200301347
[2006/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005025316
Date:24.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1675464
Date:05.07.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2005
[2006/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1675464
Date:04.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.03.2005
ClassificationInternational:A01N59/00, E01C5/00, E01H11/00, // (A01N59/00, 59:00), A01N25:08
[2014/23]
Former International [2006/27]A01N59/00, E01C5/00, E01H11/00, // A01N59/00, A01N59/00, A01N25/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/27]
TitleGerman:UNKRAUTBEKÄMPFUNG IN BETONSTEINFUGEN UND ANDEREN PFLASTERSTEINEN[2006/27]
English:WEED CONTROL IN JOINTS OF CONCRETE BLOCK AND OTHER PAVING STONE[2006/27]
French:DESHERBAGE DES JOINTS DE BLOC DE BETON ET AUTRE TYPE DE PAVE[2006/27]
Entry into regional phase07.04.2006National basic fee paid 
07.04.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
07.04.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.04.2006Examination requested  [2006/27]
23.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.04.2014Fee for grant paid
15.04.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.04.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.08.2006
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.07.2014   
Gebrüder Dorfner GmbH & Co. Kaolin- und Kristallquarzsand-Werke KG
Scharhof 1
92242 Hirschau / DE
Opponent's representative
Hannke, Christian, et al
Hannke Bittner & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB
Prüfeninger Straße 1
93049 Regensburg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/34]
Opponent(s)01  10.07.2014   
Gebrüder Dorfner GmbH & Co. Kaolin- und Kristallquarzsand-Werke KG
Scharhof 1
92242 Hirschau / DE
Opponent's representative
Hannke, Christian, et al
Hannke Bittner & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Prüfeninger Strasse 1
93049 Regensburg / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
14.04.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.10.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
14.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.12.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition13.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0403/17
24.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
22.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
19.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
06.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
19.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
17.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
27.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.09.2004
BG04.06.2014
CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
ES04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
SI04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
TR04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LU17.09.2014
PT06.10.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU17.09.2004
BG04.06.2014
CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
ES04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
SI04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LU17.09.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2016/25]BG04.06.2014
CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
ES04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
SI04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LU17.09.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2015/37]CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
ES04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
SI04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LU17.09.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2015/36]CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
ES04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
SI04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
LU17.09.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2015/22]CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
ES04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
LU17.09.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2015/20]CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
ES04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2015/11]CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
ES04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2015/10]CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
ES04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
Former [2014/50]CY04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
Former [2014/49]CY04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
Former [2014/47]CY04.06.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH06272203  ;
 [XY]WO03037817  (LIDDY JOHN THOMAS [GB], et al) [X] 1-9,11,12,1-9,11,12,1-9,11,12 * page 1, line 11 - line 20 * * page 3, line 1 - line 12 * * page 4, line 22 - line 31 * * page 5, line 13 - line 25 * * page 1, line 11 - line 20 * * page 3, line 1 - line 12 * * page 4, line 22 - line 31 * * page 5, line 13 - line 25 * * page 1, line 11 - line 20 * * page 3, line 1 - line 12 * * page 4, line 22 - line 31 * * page 5, line 13 - line 25 * [Y] 1-16,1-16,1-16;
 [XY]JPH06245680  ;
 [Y]US3591360  (VAHLSING FREDERICK H JR) [Y] 1-16,1-16,1-16 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *;
 [X]JPH05123063
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941222), vol. 0186, no. 83, Database accession no. (M - 1730), & JP06272203 A 19940927 (CENTRAL GLASS) [X] 1-16,1-16,1-16 * column A * * column A * * column A *
 [XY]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 40, Database accession no. 1994-321203, XP002314483 & JPH06245680 A 19940906 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1,9,11,16,1,9,11,16,1,9,11,16 * abstract * * abstract * * abstract * [Y] 1-16,1-16,1-16
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 25, Database accession no. 1993-199658, XP002314484 & JPH05123063 A 19930521 (YAMAKAWA SANGYO KK) [X] 1,9,13,16,1,9,13,16,1,9,13,16 * abstract * * abstract * * abstract *
by applicantCA2299301
 JPH06272203
 WO03037817
 JPH06245680
 US3591360
    - B- SHACKEL, "Design and construction of interlocking concrete block pavement", SCHOOL OF CIVIL ENGINEERING, UNIVERSITY OF NEW SOUTH WALES