Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1776634

EP1776634 - METHOD FOR SOFWARE PROGRAM SYNCHRONIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  03.11.2017
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2017Refusal of applicationpublished on 06.12.2017  [2017/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2007/17]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / GERDES, Martin
Retzstr. 31
52156 Monschau-Rohren / DE
02 / HOLTMANNS, Silke
Härkäpurontie 15
FIN-01800 Klankkala / FI
03 / SCHUBA, Marko
Am Schwanenkamp 68
52457 Aldenhoven / DE
 [2007/27]
Former [2007/17]01 / GERDES, Martin
Haus-Heyden-Str. 183
52134 Herzogenrath / DE
02 / HOLTMANNS, Silke
Martinlaaksontie 40D28
FIN-01620 Vantaa / FI
03 / SCHUBA, Marko
Am Schwanenkamp 68
52457 Aldenhoven / DE
Representative(s)Ericsson
Patent Development
Torshamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2007/17]Pfeifer, Torsten , et al
Ericsson GmbH, Ericsson Allee 1
52134 Herzogenrath / DE
Application number, filing date04764140.214.08.2004
[2007/17]
WO2004EP09148
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006018030
Date:23.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1776634
Date:25.04.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2006
[2007/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.02.2006
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/445, H04L29/08
[2007/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/17]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR SOFTWARE-PROGRAMMSYNCHRONISATION[2007/17]
English:METHOD FOR SOFWARE PROGRAM SYNCHRONIZATION[2007/17]
French:PROCEDE DE SYNCHRONISATION DE PROGRAMMES LOGICIELS[2007/17]
Entry into regional phase15.02.2007National basic fee paid 
15.02.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
15.02.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.02.2007Examination requested  [2007/17]
12.02.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.05.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
29.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2014Date of oral proceedings
21.02.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/49]
21.02.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
25.07.2017Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/49]
Appeal following examination29.04.2014Appeal received No.  T1756/14
03.07.2014Statement of grounds filed
25.07.2017Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
25.07.2017Date of oral proceedings
28.07.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.12.2010
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
29.07.2011Request for further processing filed
29.07.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
17.08.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
25.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
25.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
27.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
27.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
27.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 14
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO0036503  (PCFIRST.COM, INC) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 4 - page 5 * * figures 1,2E * * claims 1-16 * [Y] 2-23;
 [XY]US2002026474  (WANG LAWRENCE C ET AL) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0029] * * claims 1-10 * [Y] 2-23;
 [XY]US2004015942  (BRANSON MICHAEL JOHN ET AL) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 2 * * claims 1-9 * * figure 3 * [Y] 2-23
 [Y]  - JSR 118 EXPERT GROUP, "Passage from Mobile Information Device Profile, v2.0 (JSR-118)", JCP SPECIFICATION, (20021105), XP002318884 [Y] 2-23 * page 5 * * page 433 - page 436 * * page 513 - page 514 *
by applicantWO0036503