Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1667911

EP1667911 - METHOD AND CONTAINER FOR STERILIZING AND STORING SOFT CONTACT LENSES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.09.2012
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Opposition withdrawnpublished on 20.11.2019  [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
[2012/43]
Former [2006/24]For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / MATSUZAWA, Yasuo
10454 Turner Road
Roswell, GA 30076 / US
02 / ENCIU, Nicolae
2011 Nottely Court
Lawrenceville, GA 30043 / US
03 / AGUADO, Celeste
1708 Granger Court
Atlanta, GA 30341 / US
 [2006/24]
Representative(s)Bohest AG
Holbeinstrasse 36-38
4051 Basel / CH
[2014/45]
Former [2012/43]Bohest AG
Postfach 160
4003 Basel / CH
Former [2008/39]Bohest AG
Postfach 160
4003 Basel / CH
Former [2007/35]Heinen, Detlef , et al
BOHEST Intellectual Property A. Braun Braun Héritier Eschmann AG Holbeinstrasse 36-38
4051 Basel / CH
Former [2006/24]Leon, Susanna Iris , et al
Novartis AG Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box
CH-4002 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date04765064.310.09.2004
[2006/24]
WO2004EP10137
Priority number, dateUS20030502745P12.09.2003         Original published format: US 502745 P
[2006/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005025991
Date:24.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1667911
Date:14.06.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2005
[2006/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1667911
Date:24.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:A45C11/00, A61L12/04, A61L12/08
[2008/10]
Former International [2006/24]B65B25/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/24]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND BEHÄLTER ZUR STERILISATION UND ZUM AUFBEWAHREN VON WEICHEN KONTAKTLINSEN[2006/24]
English:METHOD AND CONTAINER FOR STERILIZING AND STORING SOFT CONTACT LENSES[2006/24]
French:PROCEDE ET RECIPIENT POUR LA STERILISATION ET LE STOCKAGE DE LENTILLES DE CONTACT SOUPLES[2006/24]
Entry into regional phase12.04.2006National basic fee paid 
11.01.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.2008Examination requested  [2008/09]
22.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.09.2012Fee for grant paid
04.09.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.02.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.07.2013  14.10.2019  WITHDRAWN
Leeming, John Gerard
J.A. Kemp & Co.
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Opponent's representative
J A Kemp LLP
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 [2019/47]
Former [2017/33]
Opponent(s)01  23.07.2013  29.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Leeming, John Gerard
J.A. Kemp & Co.
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Opponent's representative
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2013/35]
Opponent(s)01  23.07.2013   
Leeming, John Gerard
J.A. Kemp & Co.
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Opponent's representative
Forsythe, Dominic
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
02.09.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.03.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
20.11.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.11.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition20.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0228/16
29.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
30.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
15.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
11.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
14.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
12.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.09.2004
AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
IT24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
PT24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
TR24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
LU10.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
FR30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
[2016/30]
Former [2015/34]HU10.09.2004
AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
IT24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
TR24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
LU10.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
FR30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
Former [2015/32]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
IT24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
TR24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
CH30.09.2013
FR30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
Former [2014/37]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
IT24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
CH30.09.2013
FR30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
Former [2014/34]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
IT24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
Former [2014/20]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
IT24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
Former [2013/46]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
IT24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
Former [2013/37]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
IT24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
Former [2013/35]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
Former [2013/34]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
Former [2013/31]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
GR25.01.2013
Former [2013/26]BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
GR25.01.2013
Former [2013/24]BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
GR25.01.2013
Former [2013/23]CY24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
Former [2013/22]FI24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
Former [2013/21]SE24.10.2012
Cited inInternational search[XY]US4122942  (WOLFSON LEONARD G) [X] 8-13,19,20 * column 1, lines 27-33 * * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 14 * * column 2, lines 43-47; claims 1-3 * [Y] 1-7,14-18;
 [Y]US6348507  (GROEMMINGER SUZANNE F ET AL) [Y] 1-7 * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 12 *;
 [Y]WO9927813  (NOVARTIS ERFIND VERWALT GMBH ;NOVARTIS AG (CH); NICOLSON PAUL CLEM) [Y] 14-18 * page 7, lines 8-21; figure 4 *;
 [A]US4002234  (LOSHAEK SAMUEL) [A] 1-20 * claims 1,2 *