EP1629226 - BACKFLOW PREVENTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neoperl GmbH Klosterrunsstr. 11 79379 Müllheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | For all designated states Neoperl GmbH Klosterrunsstrasse 11 79379 Müllheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FANGMEIER, Martin Liestengasse 2c 79424 Auggen / DE | [2006/09] | Representative(s) | Maucher, Wolfgang, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | Maucher, Wolfgang, et al Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Dreikönigstrasse 13 79102 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04765653.3 | 22.09.2004 | [2006/09] | WO2004EP10837 | Priority number, date | DE2003216977U | 03.11.2003 Original published format: DE 20316977 U | [2006/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005052421 | Date: | 09.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1629226 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1629226 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16K15/06 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
F16K15/063 (EP,US);
Y10T137/3294 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7913 (EP,US);
Y10T137/792 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7932 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7938 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RÜCKFLUSSVERHINDERER | [2006/09] | English: | BACKFLOW PREVENTER | [2006/09] | French: | SYSTEME ANTI-REFLUX | [2006/09] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/09] | 22.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.02.2007 | CZ | 21.02.2007 | DK | 21.02.2007 | EE | 21.02.2007 | FI | 21.02.2007 | FR | 21.02.2007 | GB | 21.02.2007 | IE | 21.02.2007 | NL | 21.02.2007 | PL | 21.02.2007 | RO | 21.02.2007 | SI | 21.02.2007 | SK | 21.02.2007 | TR | 21.02.2007 | BG | 21.05.2007 | SE | 21.05.2007 | GR | 22.05.2007 | ES | 01.06.2007 | PT | 23.07.2007 | HU | 22.08.2007 | AT | 22.09.2007 | LU | 22.09.2007 | BE | 30.09.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | [2015/21] |
Former [2009/44] | CY | 21.02.2007 | |
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
EE | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
FR | 21.02.2007 | ||
GB | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
TR | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
HU | 22.08.2007 | ||
AT | 22.09.2007 | ||
LU | 22.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
CH | 30.09.2007 | ||
LI | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CY | 21.02.2007 | |
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
EE | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
FR | 21.02.2007 | ||
GB | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
HU | 22.08.2007 | ||
AT | 22.09.2007 | ||
LU | 22.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
CH | 30.09.2007 | ||
LI | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 21.02.2007 | |
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
EE | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
FR | 21.02.2007 | ||
GB | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
AT | 22.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
CH | 30.09.2007 | ||
LI | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/31] | CZ | 21.02.2007 | |
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
EE | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
FR | 21.02.2007 | ||
GB | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
AT | 22.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
CH | 30.09.2007 | ||
LI | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 21.02.2007 | |
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
EE | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
FR | 21.02.2007 | ||
GB | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
AT | 22.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | CZ | 21.02.2007 | |
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
FR | 21.02.2007 | ||
GB | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
AT | 22.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/50] | CZ | 21.02.2007 | |
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
GB | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
AT | 22.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
FR | 12.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/40] | CZ | 21.02.2007 | |
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
GB | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
FR | 12.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 21.02.2007 | |
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
GB | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
FR | 12.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CZ | 21.02.2007 | |
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
GB | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | CZ | 21.02.2007 | |
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
GB | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | DK | 21.02.2007 | |
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
GB | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | DK | 21.02.2007 | |
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/44] | FI | 21.02.2007 | |
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [XI]GB661479 (GEN MOTORS CORP) [X] 1-4,7,8 * page 1, line 53 - line 94; figure -; claim 1 * [I] 9,10; | [A]GB1031226 (CLAPETS T J SOC D) [A] 1* page 2, line 37 - line 107; figure - *; | [AD]DE3722665 (WILDFANG DIETER KG [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE3722665 |