Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1673523

EP1673523 - METHOD FOR DIAGNOSING FAULTS IN AN INTAKE SYSTEM OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE, WHICH HAS A VARIABLE INTAKE MANIFOLD GEOMETRY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.12.2009
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.03.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.04.2011  [2011/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
[2006/26]
Inventor(s)01 / KONRAD, Heiko
Oberes Strassfeld 12
82065 Baierbrunn / DE
02 / KRÄMER, Gerd
Oberes Strassfeld 6
82065 Baierbrunn / DE
03 / SCHULTE, Wolfgang
Zaubzerstrasse 18
81677 München / DE
 [2006/26]
Application number, filing date04765855.406.10.2004
[2006/26]
WO2004EP11169
Priority number, dateDE200314673408.10.2003         Original published format: DE 10346734
[2006/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005035954
Date:21.04.2005
Language:DE
[2005/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1673523
Date:28.06.2006
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2005
[2006/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1673523
Date:11.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.04.2005
ClassificationInternational:F02B27/02, F02D41/22
[2006/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2007/03]
Former [2006/26]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR FEHLERDIAGNOSE BEI EINER IN DER SAUGROHRGEOMETRIE VARIIERBAREN SAUGANLAGE EINER BRENNFRAKFTMASCHINE[2006/26]
English:METHOD FOR DIAGNOSING FAULTS IN AN INTAKE SYSTEM OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE, WHICH HAS A VARIABLE INTAKE MANIFOLD GEOMETRY[2006/26]
French:PROCEDE POUR DIAGNOSTIQUER UN DEFAUT SUR UNE INSTALLATION D'ASPIRATION A GEOMETRIE DE TUBULURE D'ASPIRATION VARIABLE D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE[2006/26]
Entry into regional phase31.03.2006National basic fee paid 
31.03.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.03.2006Examination requested  [2006/26]
17.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.11.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.12.2008Fee for grant paid
10.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT11.02.2009
GB06.10.2009
FR02.11.2009
[2011/15]
Former [2011/01]GB06.10.2009
FR02.11.2009
Former [2010/35]FR02.11.2009
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0521545  (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 26 * * column 5, line 25 - column 8, line 39 * * column 10, line 7 - column 11, line 30 *;
 [XA]JPH05321674  ;
 [A]US5261369  (VERNIER YANNICK [FR]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * column 1, line 28 - line 58 * * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 11 * * column 5, line 41 - column 6, line 46 * * column 7, line 10 - line 31 *;
 [DA]DE19727669  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1-4 * abstract * * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 53 *;
 [DA]DE4005973  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1-4 * abstract * * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 10 *
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940309), vol. 018, no. 143, Database accession no. (M - 1574), [X] 1,4 * abstract * * column 3, paragraph 12 - paragraph 13 * * column 4, paragraph 17 - paragraph 18 * [A] 2,3