Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1689898 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1296
24.08.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
15.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
15.08.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 11
04.08.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.08.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.07.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 11
18.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.07.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
11.05.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.04.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.07.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
06.07.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
06.07.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.07.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.07.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.07.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.06.2016 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
29.02.2016 Claims Opposition 2
29.02.2016 Description Opposition 24
29.02.2016 Description Opposition 19
29.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
29.02.2016 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
29.02.2016 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 30
28.10.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
28.10.2015 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
28.10.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
11.05.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.05.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.05.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.05.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.05.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.05.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.05.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
06.05.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
06.05.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
18.03.2015 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
18.03.2015 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
18.03.2015 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
12.03.2015 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 23
12.03.2015 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 4
12.03.2015 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 4
18.02.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.02.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.02.2015 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 3
13.02.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
11.02.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
10.02.2015 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 3
22.10.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
20.10.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.10.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
14.10.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.10.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.10.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.10.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.10.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.10.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.10.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
02.10.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.09.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.09.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 6
24.09.2014 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
24.09.2014 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 4
04.09.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
09.07.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.07.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.07.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.07.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.07.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 2
03.07.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 24
30.06.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
30.06.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
30.06.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
30.06.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 25
06.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.06.2014 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
27.03.2014 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
21.03.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
03.03.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
03.03.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
24.02.2014 Claims Appeal 4
24.02.2014 Claims Appeal 3
24.02.2014 Claims Appeal 4
24.02.2014 Claims Appeal 2
24.02.2014 Claims Appeal 4
24.02.2014 Claims Appeal 4
24.02.2014 Claims Appeal 4
24.02.2014 Claims Appeal 2
24.02.2014 Claims Appeal 2
24.02.2014 Claims Appeal 1
24.02.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 15
21.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 2
21.02.2014 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 2
21.02.2014 Communication of amended entries Appeal 1
29.01.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Search / examination 1
16.01.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
10.01.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
02.01.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 3
17.12.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
17.12.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
18.10.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.10.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.10.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.10.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.10.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.10.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.10.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.10.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.10.2013 Annex to a communication Opposition 9
15.10.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
15.10.2013 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
15.10.2013 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
15.10.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 9
15.10.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
15.10.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
15.10.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
15.10.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
15.10.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
15.10.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.09.2013 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.09.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
19.09.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
19.09.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
03.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.08.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 14
23.08.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 12
23.08.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
22.08.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 14
22.08.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
21.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
21.08.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
21.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
21.08.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
21.08.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 14
20.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
20.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
20.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
20.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
20.08.2013 Claims Opposition 3
20.08.2013 Claims Opposition 3
20.08.2013 Claims Opposition 4
20.08.2013 Claims Opposition 4
20.08.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
06.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.08.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.07.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.07.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.03.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.03.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.03.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.03.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.03.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.03.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.03.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
19.03.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
19.03.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.03.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.03.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.03.2013 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.03.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.03.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.03.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
25.03.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
24.03.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
24.03.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
28.12.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.12.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.12.2010 Claims Opposition 4
21.12.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
02.11.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.11.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.11.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
22.10.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
24.08.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
18.08.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
29.06.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.06.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.06.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
22.06.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
22.06.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
21.06.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
15.04.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
15.04.2010 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
15.04.2010 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
09.03.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
09.03.2010 Request for documents Opposition 1
08.03.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.03.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
02.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
02.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
02.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
02.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
02.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
02.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
02.03.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 19
02.03.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
02.03.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
02.03.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
02.03.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 53
02.03.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
02.03.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
02.03.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
02.03.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
01.03.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 14
01.03.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
01.03.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
01.03.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
26.02.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
26.02.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 20
26.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
26.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
26.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
26.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
26.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
25.02.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 20
25.02.2010 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
04.05.2009 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.04.2009 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
19.03.2009 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
19.03.2009 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 2
03.03.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
03.03.2009 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
03.03.2009 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
03.03.2009 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
30.01.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
22.12.2008 Notice concerning a request for amendments/ corrections Search / examination 1
28.11.2008 Claims Search / examination 3
28.11.2008 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
14.11.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
14.11.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
14.11.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
14.11.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 33
04.11.2008 Annex to a communication Search / examination 43
04.11.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
04.11.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
04.11.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
04.11.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
04.11.2008 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
02.09.2008 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
28.08.2008 Claims Search / examination 4
28.08.2008 Claims Search / examination 3
28.08.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
18.04.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.10.2007 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
12.10.2007 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
10.10.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
08.10.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
25.09.2007 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
20.08.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
20.08.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
06.07.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
25.06.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.02.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
16.02.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.01.2007 Annex Search / examination 3
26.01.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
02.11.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
02.11.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.09.2006 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
09.08.2006 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
09.08.2006 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
25.07.2006 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
25.07.2006 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
19.07.2006 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
14.07.2006 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
22.06.2006 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
05.04.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
04.10.2005 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
05.07.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 38
16.06.2005 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
16.06.2005 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 36
14.04.2005 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
26.10.2004 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
26.10.2004 Claims International Searching Authority 5
26.10.2004 Description International Searching Authority 27
26.10.2004 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
26.10.2004 Drawings International Searching Authority 3