Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1644599

EP1644599 - ELECTRIC MORTISE LOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SERRATURE MERONI S.p.A.
Via Diaz, 21
I-20054 Nova Milanese (Milan) / IT
[2006/15]
Inventor(s)01 / SEMENTILLI, Domenico, Serrature Meroni S.p.A.
Via Sabotino, 14/C
I-04011 Aprilia / IT
 [2006/15]
Representative(s)Long, Giorgio , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A.
Via Senato, 8
20121 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Long, Giorgio , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8
20121 Milano / IT
Former [2006/15]Siniscalco, Fabio , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8
20121 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date04766196.212.07.2004
[2006/15]
WO2004EP51464
Priority number, dateIT2003TO0054615.07.2003         Original published format: IT TO20030546
[2006/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005012674
Date:10.02.2005
Language:EN
[2005/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1644599
Date:12.04.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2005
[2006/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1644599
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.02.2005
ClassificationInternational:E05B47/00, E05B63/08
[2006/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/15]
Extension statesAL27.12.2005
HR27.12.2005
LT27.12.2005
LV27.12.2005
MK27.12.2005
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHES EINSTECKSCHLOSS[2006/15]
English:ELECTRIC MORTISE LOCK[2006/15]
French:SERRURE A MORTAISE ELECTRIQUE[2006/15]
Entry into regional phase27.12.2005National basic fee paid 
27.12.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
27.12.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.12.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.12.2005Examination requested  [2006/15]
15.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.12.2008Fee for grant paid
23.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CY18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
TR18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
GB12.07.2009
IE12.07.2009
IT12.07.2009
LU12.07.2009
PT27.07.2009
CH31.07.2009
FR31.07.2009
LI31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/32]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
GB12.07.2009
IE12.07.2009
IT12.07.2009
LU12.07.2009
PT27.07.2009
CH31.07.2009
FR31.07.2009
LI31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
Former [2011/21]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
GB12.07.2009
IE12.07.2009
IT12.07.2009
LU12.07.2009
PT27.07.2009
CH31.07.2009
FR31.07.2009
LI31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2011/15]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
GB12.07.2009
IE12.07.2009
IT12.07.2009
PT27.07.2009
CH31.07.2009
FR31.07.2009
LI31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2010/51]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
GB12.07.2009
IE12.07.2009
PT27.07.2009
CH31.07.2009
FR31.07.2009
LI31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2010/35]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
GB12.07.2009
IE12.07.2009
PT27.07.2009
CH31.07.2009
FR31.07.2009
LI31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2010/25]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
GB12.07.2009
PT27.07.2009
CH31.07.2009
FR31.07.2009
LI31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2010/22]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
CH31.07.2009
FR31.07.2009
LI31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2010/11]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2010/10]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2009/51]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2009/46]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
Former [2009/44]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
Former [2009/41]AT18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
Former [2009/36]FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
ES29.05.2009
Former [2009/35]NL18.02.2009
ES29.05.2009
Cited inInternational search[XAY]DE266253  (BERNHARD GRIESKAMP) [X] 1 * page 1, line 25 - page 2, line 5; figures 1,2 * [A] 7 [Y] 6;
 [Y]DE19951621  (WILKA SCHLIESTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 6 * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US3829138  (MORITA Y) [A] 1 * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 6; figure 3 *;
 [A]DE29804032U  (HEGER KARL [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *