EP1675778 - CLOSURE SYSTEM CONSTITUTED FROM A CLOSURE CAP AND A CONTAINER PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alpla-Werke Alwin Lehner GmbH und Co. KG Allmendstrasse 81 6971 Hard / AT | [2006/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUFFA, Udo Oberlinder Strasse 59 96524 Gefell / DE | [2006/27] | Representative(s) | Müller, Enno, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/27] | Müller, Enno, et al Rieder & Partner Corneliusstrasse 45 D-42329 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 04766753.0 | 09.09.2004 | [2006/27] | WO2004EP52108 | Priority number, date | DE20031044241 | 23.09.2003 Original published format: DE 10344241 | DE20031061610 | 30.12.2003 Original published format: DE 10361610 | DE20041042633 | 03.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004042633 | [2006/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005030603 | Date: | 07.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1675778 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1675778 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65D50/04 | [2006/27] | CPC: |
B65D50/046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSSKOMBINATION AUS EINER VERSCHLUSSKAPPE UND EINEM BEHÄLTNISTEIL | [2006/27] | English: | CLOSURE SYSTEM CONSTITUTED FROM A CLOSURE CAP AND A CONTAINER PART | [2006/27] | French: | FERMETURE COMBINEE COMPOSEE D'UN BOUCHON FILETE ET D'UNE PARTIE DU CONTENANT | [2009/41] |
Former [2006/27] | FERMETURE COMBINEE COMPOSEE D'UN BOUCHON FILETE ET D'UNE PARTIE CONTENANT | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/27] | 23.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.10.2009 | 02.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.03.2010 | CZ | 17.03.2010 | DK | 17.03.2010 | EE | 17.03.2010 | FI | 17.03.2010 | IE | 17.03.2010 | IT | 17.03.2010 | NL | 17.03.2010 | PL | 17.03.2010 | RO | 17.03.2010 | SE | 17.03.2010 | SI | 17.03.2010 | SK | 17.03.2010 | TR | 17.03.2010 | BG | 17.06.2010 | GR | 18.06.2010 | ES | 28.06.2010 | PT | 19.07.2010 | LU | 09.09.2010 | HU | 18.09.2010 | BE | 30.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 17.03.2010 | |
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
LU | 09.09.2010 | ||
HU | 18.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 17.03.2010 | |
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
HU | 18.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 17.03.2010 | |
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 17.03.2010 | |
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CY | 17.03.2010 | |
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | CY | 17.03.2010 | |
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | CY | 17.03.2010 | |
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CY | 17.03.2010 | |
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | FI | 17.03.2010 | |
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | FI | 17.03.2010 | |
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | FI | 17.03.2010 | |
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | PL | 17.03.2010 | |
SI | 17.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4149646 (JULIAN RANDALL K) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US4204615 (MCCARTHY ROBERT F [US]) [X] 2,16 * column 3, lines 59-68 * * column 4, lines 1-42; figures 1-6 *; | [XY]US4948002 (THORNOCK DEL M [US], et al) [X] 2,17,19-21 * column 6, lines 3-49; figures 1-5 * [Y] 18; | [XA]WO9723388 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1,3-8,10-12,15 * page 7, paragraphs 3,4; figures 2b,2e * * page 8, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 9, paragraph 2 * [A] 9,10,13,14; | [X]US5735417 (DARR RICHARD C [US], et al) [X] 2 * abstract *; | [A]US5819967 (LO JULIAN B [US]) [A] 2 * abstract *; | [A]US5865330 (BUONO CAETANO [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2001013523 (GROSS RICHARD A [US], et al) [A] 2,22* abstract *; | [AY]WO03068611 (GEN MILLS INC [US], et al) [A] 2 * paragraph [0035]; figures 2,3 * [Y] 18 |