Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1667589

EP1667589 - APPARATUS FOR HANDLING CELLS, EMBRYOS OR OOCYTES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.10.2010
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 07.08.2013  [2013/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ovature Research Inc.
775 E Blithedale, PMB 515
Mill Valley, CA 94941-1554 / US
[N/P]
Former [2007/10]For all designated states
Overture Research Inc.
775 E Blithedale, PMB 515
Mill Valley, CA 94941-1554 / US
Former [2006/24]For all designated states
CENTRAL RESEARCH LABORATORIES LIMITED
Dawley Road Hayes
Middlesex, UB3 1HH / GB
Inventor(s)01 / DODGSON, John, Robert
16a Monnery Road
London N19 5RZ / GB
 [2006/24]
Representative(s)Sharp, Alan Cooper
Cooper Sharp & Co 32 Spencer Street St Albans
Hertfordshire AL3 5EG / GB
[2009/31]
Former [2006/24]Sharp, Alan Cooper
Cooper Sharp & Co, 32 Spencer Street
St Albans AL3 SE4, Herts. / GB
Application number, filing date04768433.710.09.2004
[2006/24]
WO2004GB03886
Priority number, dateGB2003002115810.09.2003         Original published format: GB 0321158
[2006/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005023124
Date:17.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/11]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1667589
Date:14.06.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2005
[2006/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1667589
Date:25.11.2009
Language:EN
[2009/48]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP1667589
Date:26.05.2010
[2010/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.04.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/43
[2006/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GERÄT ZUR HANDHABUNG VON ZELLEN, EMBRYOS ODER OOZYTEN[2006/24]
English:APPARATUS FOR HANDLING CELLS, EMBRYOS OR OOCYTES[2006/24]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE MANIPULATION DE CELLULES, D'EMBRYONS OU D'OVOCYTES[2006/24]
Entry into regional phase10.04.2006National basic fee paid 
10.04.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
10.04.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.04.2006Examination requested  [2006/24]
05.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
18.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.09.2009Fee for grant paid
25.09.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.08.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/44]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
18.04.2008Request for further processing filed
18.04.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.05.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
01.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.11.2009
BE25.11.2009
CY25.11.2009
CZ25.11.2009
DK25.11.2009
EE25.11.2009
FI25.11.2009
IT25.11.2009
PL25.11.2009
PT25.11.2009
RO25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
SI25.11.2009
SK25.11.2009
TR25.11.2009
BG25.02.2010
GR26.02.2010
ES08.03.2010
HU26.05.2010
[2013/32]
Former [2012/47]AT25.11.2009
BE25.11.2009
CY25.11.2009
CZ25.11.2009
DK25.11.2009
EE25.11.2009
FI25.11.2009
IT25.11.2009
PL25.11.2009
RO25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
SI25.11.2009
SK25.11.2009
TR25.11.2009
BG25.02.2010
GR26.02.2010
ES08.03.2010
HU26.05.2010
Former [2012/42]AT25.11.2009
BE25.11.2009
CY25.11.2009
CZ25.11.2009
DK25.11.2009
EE25.11.2009
FI25.11.2009
IT25.11.2009
PL25.11.2009
RO25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
SI25.11.2009
SK25.11.2009
BG25.02.2010
GR26.02.2010
ES08.03.2010
HU26.05.2010
Former [2011/15]AT25.11.2009
BE25.11.2009
CY25.11.2009
CZ25.11.2009
DK25.11.2009
EE25.11.2009
FI25.11.2009
IT25.11.2009
PL25.11.2009
RO25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
SI25.11.2009
SK25.11.2009
BG25.02.2010
GR26.02.2010
ES08.03.2010
Former [2010/51]AT25.11.2009
BE25.11.2009
CY25.11.2009
CZ25.11.2009
DK25.11.2009
EE25.11.2009
FI25.11.2009
PL25.11.2009
RO25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
SI25.11.2009
SK25.11.2009
BG25.02.2010
GR26.02.2010
ES08.03.2010
Former [2010/39]AT25.11.2009
BE25.11.2009
CY25.11.2009
CZ25.11.2009
DK25.11.2009
EE25.11.2009
FI25.11.2009
PL25.11.2009
RO25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
SI25.11.2009
SK25.11.2009
BG25.02.2010
ES08.03.2010
Former [2010/36]AT25.11.2009
BE25.11.2009
CY25.11.2009
CZ25.11.2009
DK25.11.2009
EE25.11.2009
FI25.11.2009
PL25.11.2009
RO25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
SI25.11.2009
BG25.02.2010
ES08.03.2010
Former [2010/35]AT25.11.2009
BE25.11.2009
CY25.11.2009
DK25.11.2009
EE25.11.2009
FI25.11.2009
PL25.11.2009
RO25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
SI25.11.2009
BG25.02.2010
ES08.03.2010
Former [2010/33]AT25.11.2009
BE25.11.2009
CY25.11.2009
FI25.11.2009
PL25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
SI25.11.2009
ES08.03.2010
Former [2010/31]AT25.11.2009
BE25.11.2009
CY25.11.2009
FI25.11.2009
PL25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
SI25.11.2009
Former [2010/30]AT25.11.2009
CY25.11.2009
FI25.11.2009
PL25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
SI25.11.2009
Former [2010/25]CY25.11.2009
FI25.11.2009
PL25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
SI25.11.2009
Former [2010/23]FI25.11.2009
PL25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
SI25.11.2009
Former [2010/22]FI25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
Cited inInternational search[X]US6184029  (WILDING PETER [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 9, line 56 - column 10, line 32 * * column 11, line 25 - column 13, line 36 * * figures 4,6A,6B,7 *;
 [X]EP1340810  (EFFECTOR CELL INST [JP]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0058]; figures 1-6 *;
 [X]US2003107386  (DODGSON JOHN [GB], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0042]; figure 6 *;
 [X]WO0188087  (UNIV ILLINOIS [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 9, line 27 - page 13, line 22; figures 1,2 *
by applicantUS6193647
 US6184029