Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1668556

EP1668556 - A USER INTERFACE FOR AN EXTRACORPOREAL BLOOD TREATMENT MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  20.11.2015
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2015Revocation of patentpublished on 23.12.2015  [2015/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gambro Lundia AB
Magistratsvägen 16
Box 10101
220 10 Lund / SE
[N/P]
Former [2006/24]For all designated states
Gambro Lundia AB
Magistratsvägen 16, Box 10101
220 10 Lund / SE
Inventor(s)01 / ZACCARELLI, Massimo
No. 37, via Ada Negri
I-41038 San Felice sul Panaro / IT
02 / FERRARINI, Lorenza
No. 19, via Roncaglio
I-41036 Medolla / IT
03 / PELLETIER, Danielle
N. 1420 rue Bachand
St. Jean sur Richelieu J2W 2B9, Québec / CA
04 / LETTERI, Jeffrey, J.
1363 San Mateo Drive
Punta Gorda, FL 33950 / US
 [2008/14]
Former [2006/24]01 / ZACCARELLI, Massimo
No. 37, via Ada Negri
I-41038 San Felice sul Panaro / IT
02 / FERRARINI, Lorenza
No. 19, via Roncaglio
I-41036 Medolla / IT
03 / PELLETIER, Danielle
N. 16, rue du Vingtain
F-69110 Sainte-Foy-les-Lyon / FR
04 / LETTERI, Jeffrey, J.
1363 San Mateo Drive
Punta Gorda, FL 33950 / US
Representative(s)Ponzellini, Gianmarco , et al
PGA S.p.A.
PLS See message P.Soeteway in File 00940761.0 -
Via Mascheroni, 31
20145 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2014/13]Ponzellini, Gianmarco , et al
Ponzellini, Gioia e Associati S.r.l. Via Mascheroni, 31
20145 Milano / IT
Former [2009/19]Ponzellini, Gianmarco , et al
Gambro Legal and Intellectual Property Dept. P.O. Box 98
41037 Mirandola / IT
Former [2008/48]Guéry-Jacques, Géraldine , et al
Gambro Legal & Intellectual Property Dept. P.O. Box 98
41037 Mirandola / IT
Former [2006/24]Villanova, Massimo , et al
Gambro Intellectual Property Department, P.O. Box 98
41037 Mirandola (MO) / IT
Application number, filing date04769327.009.09.2004
[2006/24]
WO2004IB02929
Priority number, dateIT2003MO0025925.09.2003         Original published format: IT MO20030259
[2006/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005031628
Date:07.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1668556
Date:14.06.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2005
[2006/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1668556
Date:16.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.04.2005
ClassificationInternational:G06F19/00, A61M1/14, A61M1/16, A61M1/36
[2006/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BENUTZEROBERFLÄCHE FÜR EINE EXTRAKORPORALE BLUTBEHANDLUNGSMASCHINE[2010/35]
English:A USER INTERFACE FOR AN EXTRACORPOREAL BLOOD TREATMENT MACHINE[2006/24]
French:INTERFACE UTILISATEUR POUR MACHINE DE TRAITEMENT EXTRACORPOREL DU SANG[2006/24]
Former [2006/24]BENUTZEROBERFLÄCHE FÜR EINE AUSSERKÖRPERLICHE BLUTBEHANDLUNGSMASCHINE
Entry into regional phase26.01.2006National basic fee paid 
26.01.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
26.01.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.01.2006Examination requested  [2006/24]
20.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.08.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.11.2010Fee for grant paid
09.11.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.11.2011    ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Nordmeyer, Philipp Werner
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstraße 16
80333 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2011/51]
Opponent(s)01  16.11.2011    ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Nordmeyer, Philipp Werner
Df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstraße 16
80333 München / DE
23.12.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.06.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.11.2013Date of oral proceedings
09.12.2013Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
09.12.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.09.2015Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ]
02.09.2015Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/52]
10.11.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition10.02.2014Appeal received No.  T0336/14
07.04.2014Statement of grounds filed
02.09.2015Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
02.09.2015Date of oral proceedings
09.09.2015Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
05.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
05.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
04.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
07.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of ExecutionID:01
For:AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
Date:20.10.2008
ID:02
For:AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
Date:04.05.2009
[2009/25]
Former [2008/48]ID:01
For:AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
Date:20.10.2008
[2009/25]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.02.2011
BE16.02.2011
CY16.02.2011
CZ16.02.2011
DK16.02.2011
EE16.02.2011
FI16.02.2011
HU16.02.2011
NL16.02.2011
PL16.02.2011
PT16.02.2011
RO16.02.2011
SE16.02.2011
SI16.02.2011
SK16.02.2011
TR16.02.2011
BG16.05.2011
GR17.05.2011
IE09.09.2011
LU09.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
[2014/34]
Former [2013/45]AT16.02.2011
BE16.02.2011
CY16.02.2011
CZ16.02.2011
DK16.02.2011
EE16.02.2011
FI16.02.2011
HU16.02.2011
NL16.02.2011
PL16.02.2011
RO16.02.2011
SE16.02.2011
SI16.02.2011
SK16.02.2011
TR16.02.2011
BG16.05.2011
GR17.05.2011
IE09.09.2011
LU09.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
Former [2013/44]AT16.02.2011
BE16.02.2011
CY16.02.2011
CZ16.02.2011
DK16.02.2011
EE16.02.2011
FI16.02.2011
NL16.02.2011
PL16.02.2011
RO16.02.2011
SE16.02.2011
SI16.02.2011
SK16.02.2011
TR16.02.2011
BG16.05.2011
GR17.05.2011
IE09.09.2011
LU09.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
Former [2011/50]AT16.02.2011
BE16.02.2011
CY16.02.2011
CZ16.02.2011
DK16.02.2011
EE16.02.2011
FI16.02.2011
NL16.02.2011
PL16.02.2011
RO16.02.2011
SE16.02.2011
SI16.02.2011
SK16.02.2011
BG16.05.2011
GR17.05.2011
Former [2011/47]AT16.02.2011
BE16.02.2011
CY16.02.2011
DK16.02.2011
EE16.02.2011
FI16.02.2011
NL16.02.2011
PL16.02.2011
SE16.02.2011
SI16.02.2011
BG16.05.2011
GR17.05.2011
Former [2011/40]AT16.02.2011
BE16.02.2011
CY16.02.2011
FI16.02.2011
NL16.02.2011
PL16.02.2011
SE16.02.2011
SI16.02.2011
BG16.05.2011
GR17.05.2011
Former [2011/37]BE16.02.2011
CY16.02.2011
FI16.02.2011
PL16.02.2011
SE16.02.2011
SI16.02.2011
BG16.05.2011
GR17.05.2011
Former [2011/36]PL16.02.2011
SE16.02.2011
GR17.05.2011
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO0226286  (COBE CARDIOVASCULAR INC [US]) [X] 1,10,14-16,18 * page 18, lines 4-11 * * page 72, line 19 - page 72, line 24 * * page 76, line 4 - page 77, line 19 * * page 86, line 22 - page 87, line 15 * * page 89, lines 9-19 * * page 102, line 21 - page 103, line 2 * * figures 25,27,30A-L * * figure 25 * [Y] 17;
 [Y]US2002151804  (O'MAHONY JOHN J [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,9,11,13,17,20 * figures 5-16 * * paragraphs [0017] - [0019] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraphs [0068] - [0075] * * paragraphs [0079] , [0080] *;
 [Y]US6361518  (BRIERTON MARK J [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,9,11,13,20 * column 51 - column 61; figures 26,27 *;
 [A]US5679245  (MANICA KEITH [US]) [A] 1 * column 7, lines 22-30 * * column 14, lines 6-50 * * column 17, lines 4-8 *