Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1668556 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1668556



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1342
17.11.2015 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
16.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.11.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
11.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.11.2015 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 30
10.11.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
10.11.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
09.09.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 52
07.08.2015 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
07.08.2015 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
05.08.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.08.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
03.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
03.08.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
03.08.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
31.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
31.07.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
31.07.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
31.07.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
31.07.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Opposition 3
31.07.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
30.06.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
25.06.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
25.06.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Appeal 2
22.05.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.05.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.04.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.04.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.04.2015 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
28.04.2015 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
28.04.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
28.04.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
28.04.2015 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 4
22.04.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
15.01.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
22.08.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.08.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.08.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 22
11.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 1
11.06.2014 Communication of amended entries Appeal 2
22.05.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
10.04.2014 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
10.04.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
10.04.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.04.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.04.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 17
14.03.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
12.03.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
25.02.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.02.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.02.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
24.02.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
19.02.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 4
19.02.2014 Request for correction Appeal 5
18.02.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
18.02.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
17.02.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 4
17.02.2014 Request for correction Appeal 5
12.02.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
10.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.02.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
10.02.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
08.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.12.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.12.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.12.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.12.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
09.12.2013 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
09.12.2013 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 19
09.12.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 9
09.12.2013 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
09.12.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
09.12.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
09.12.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
09.12.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
09.12.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
09.12.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
09.12.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
09.12.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 4
19.11.2013 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 4
15.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
12.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.11.2013 Claims Opposition 1
12.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
12.11.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 12
11.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
05.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
05.11.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
18.10.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 17
16.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.10.2013 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
16.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
16.10.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.09.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.09.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
10.09.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
10.09.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
26.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
26.08.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.05.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.05.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.05.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.05.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.05.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.05.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.05.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
02.05.2013 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
02.05.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.05.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.06.2012 Claims Opposition 3
27.06.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 27
25.06.2012 Claims Opposition 3
25.06.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 27
24.04.2012 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
19.04.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
13.04.2012 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
13.04.2012 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
23.12.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
23.12.2011 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
23.11.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.11.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
16.11.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 27
16.11.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
16.11.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
16.11.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
16.11.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 85
16.11.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 238
20.01.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.11.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.11.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
15.11.2010 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
15.11.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.11.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
09.11.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
09.11.2010 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
09.11.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.11.2010 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
20.08.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
20.08.2010 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
20.08.2010 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
20.08.2010 Text intended for grant Search / examination 31
03.06.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
03.06.2009 Description Search / examination 2
03.06.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
20.05.2009 Registration under R 23 EPC Search / examination 3
14.05.2009 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 1
11.05.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
11.05.2009 Description Search / examination 2
11.05.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.05.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.05.2009 Annex Search / examination 4
04.05.2009 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 2
07.04.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
31.03.2009 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 5
25.03.2009 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 4
23.03.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.03.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.03.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
09.03.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.03.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.11.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
11.11.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.10.2008 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 3
23.10.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
22.10.2008 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 5
20.10.2008 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 33
15.10.2008 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 2
15.10.2008 R23 Annex A Search / examination 1
15.10.2008 R23 Annex B Search / examination 1
15.10.2008 R23 Annex C Search / examination 1
15.10.2008 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 4
09.10.2008 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 2
23.07.2008 Annex Search / examination 6
23.07.2008 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 1
23.07.2008 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 7
14.02.2008 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
05.12.2007 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 5
14.11.2007 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
14.11.2007 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
27.10.2007 Claims Search / examination 4
27.10.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.10.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.10.2007 Claims Search / examination 4
19.10.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.10.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.07.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
20.07.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.05.2006 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
12.05.2006 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
10.04.2006 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
10.02.2006 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
31.01.2006 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 35
31.01.2006 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
31.01.2006 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
31.01.2006 Translation of priority document Search / examination 34
26.01.2006 Annex Search / examination 1
26.01.2006 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
26.01.2006 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 32
26.01.2006 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
26.01.2006 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
26.01.2006 Translation of priority document Search / examination 34
22.08.2005 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
25.04.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 56
07.04.2005 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
07.04.2005 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 32
30.09.2004 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
30.09.2004 Claims International Searching Authority 4
30.09.2004 Description International Searching Authority 17
30.09.2004 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 2
30.09.2004 Drawings International Searching Authority 9