Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1665905

EP1665905 - CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD OF OPERATING A GAS DISCHARGE LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.07.2009
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 22.12.2010  [2010/51]
Applicant(s)For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HU  IE  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[2008/47]
Former [2007/07]For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2006/29]For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HU  IE  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PL 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2006/23]For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HU  IE  IT  LU  MC  NL  PL 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / LÜRKENS, Peter, c/o Philips IP & Standards GmbH
Weisshausstr. 2
52066 Aachen / DE
 [2006/23]
Representative(s)Volmer, Georg
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Postfach 50 04 42
52088 Aachen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/23]Volmer, Georg
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH, Postfach 50 04 42
52088 Aachen / DE
Application number, filing date04769952.507.09.2004
[2006/23]
WO2004IB51702
Priority number, dateEP2003010343417.09.2003         Original published format: EP 03103434
[2006/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005027592
Date:24.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1665905
Date:07.06.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2005
[2006/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1665905
Date:27.08.2008
Language:EN
[2008/35]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP1665905
Date:18.02.2009
[N/P]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.03.2005
ClassificationInternational:H05B41/38
[2006/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER GASENTLADUNGSLAMPE[2006/23]
English:CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD OF OPERATING A GAS DISCHARGE LAMP[2006/23]
French:AGENCEMENT DE CIRCUIT ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'UNE LAMPE A DECHARGE DANS UN GAZ[2006/23]
Entry into regional phase18.04.2006National basic fee paid 
18.04.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
18.04.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.04.2006Examination requested  [2006/23]
07.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.07.2008Fee for grant paid
03.07.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.05.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
01.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.08.2008
BE27.08.2008
CY27.08.2008
CZ27.08.2008
DK27.08.2008
EE27.08.2008
FI27.08.2008
IT27.08.2008
NL27.08.2008
PL27.08.2008
RO27.08.2008
SI27.08.2008
SK27.08.2008
TR27.08.2008
IE07.09.2008
LU07.09.2008
CH30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
BG27.11.2008
SE27.11.2008
GR28.11.2008
ES08.12.2008
PT27.01.2009
HU28.02.2009
[2010/51]
Former [2010/38]AT27.08.2008
BE27.08.2008
CY27.08.2008
CZ27.08.2008
DK27.08.2008
EE27.08.2008
FI27.08.2008
IT27.08.2008
NL27.08.2008
PL27.08.2008
RO27.08.2008
SI27.08.2008
SK27.08.2008
TR27.08.2008
IE07.09.2008
LU07.09.2008
CH30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
BG27.11.2008
SE27.11.2008
ES08.12.2008
PT27.01.2009
HU28.02.2009
Former [2010/34]AT27.08.2008
BE27.08.2008
CY27.08.2008
CZ27.08.2008
DK27.08.2008
EE27.08.2008
FI27.08.2008
IT27.08.2008
NL27.08.2008
PL27.08.2008
RO27.08.2008
SI27.08.2008
SK27.08.2008
IE07.09.2008
LU07.09.2008
CH30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
BG27.11.2008
SE27.11.2008
ES08.12.2008
PT27.01.2009
HU28.02.2009
Former [2010/33]AT27.08.2008
BE27.08.2008
CZ27.08.2008
DK27.08.2008
EE27.08.2008
FI27.08.2008
IT27.08.2008
NL27.08.2008
PL27.08.2008
RO27.08.2008
SI27.08.2008
SK27.08.2008
IE07.09.2008
LU07.09.2008
CH30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
BG27.11.2008
SE27.11.2008
ES08.12.2008
PT27.01.2009
Former [2010/24]AT27.08.2008
BE27.08.2008
CZ27.08.2008
DK27.08.2008
EE27.08.2008
FI27.08.2008
IT27.08.2008
NL27.08.2008
PL27.08.2008
RO27.08.2008
SI27.08.2008
SK27.08.2008
IE07.09.2008
CH30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
BG27.11.2008
SE27.11.2008
ES08.12.2008
PT27.01.2009
Former [2010/10]AT27.08.2008
BE27.08.2008
CZ27.08.2008
DK27.08.2008
EE27.08.2008
FI27.08.2008
IT27.08.2008
NL27.08.2008
RO27.08.2008
SI27.08.2008
SK27.08.2008
IE07.09.2008
CH30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
BG27.11.2008
SE27.11.2008
ES08.12.2008
PT27.01.2009
Former [2009/51]AT27.08.2008
BE27.08.2008
CZ27.08.2008
DK27.08.2008
EE27.08.2008
FI27.08.2008
IT27.08.2008
NL27.08.2008
RO27.08.2008
SI27.08.2008
SK27.08.2008
IE07.09.2008
CH30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
BG27.11.2008
ES08.12.2008
PT27.01.2009
Former [2009/41]AT27.08.2008
BE27.08.2008
CZ27.08.2008
DK27.08.2008
EE27.08.2008
FI27.08.2008
IT27.08.2008
NL27.08.2008
RO27.08.2008
SI27.08.2008
SK27.08.2008
IE07.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
BG27.11.2008
ES08.12.2008
PT27.01.2009
Former [2009/36]AT27.08.2008
BE27.08.2008
CZ27.08.2008
DK27.08.2008
EE27.08.2008
FI27.08.2008
NL27.08.2008
RO27.08.2008
SI27.08.2008
SK27.08.2008
IE07.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
BG27.11.2008
ES08.12.2008
PT27.01.2009
Former [2009/35]AT27.08.2008
BE27.08.2008
CZ27.08.2008
DK27.08.2008
FI27.08.2008
NL27.08.2008
RO27.08.2008
SI27.08.2008
SK27.08.2008
IE07.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
BG27.11.2008
ES08.12.2008
PT27.01.2009
Former [2009/26]AT27.08.2008
BE27.08.2008
CZ27.08.2008
DK27.08.2008
FI27.08.2008
NL27.08.2008
RO27.08.2008
SI27.08.2008
SK27.08.2008
MC30.09.2008
BG27.11.2008
ES08.12.2008
PT27.01.2009
Former [2009/24]AT27.08.2008
BE27.08.2008
CZ27.08.2008
DK27.08.2008
FI27.08.2008
NL27.08.2008
SI27.08.2008
SK27.08.2008
MC30.09.2008
BG27.11.2008
ES08.12.2008
Former [2009/20]AT27.08.2008
BE27.08.2008
DK27.08.2008
FI27.08.2008
NL27.08.2008
SI27.08.2008
MC30.09.2008
ES08.12.2008
Former [2009/19]AT27.08.2008
BE27.08.2008
DK27.08.2008
FI27.08.2008
NL27.08.2008
SI27.08.2008
ES08.12.2008
Former [2009/15]AT27.08.2008
FI27.08.2008
NL27.08.2008
SI27.08.2008
ES08.12.2008
Former [2009/12]FI27.08.2008
NL27.08.2008
ES08.12.2008
Former [2009/09]NL27.08.2008
ES08.12.2008
Cited inInternational search[X]DE19829600  (SEUFERT GMBH DR [DE]) [X] 1-6,10-12 * column 1, line 11 - column 8, line 65; figures 1-7 *;
 [X]EP0765107  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1,3,6,11 * column 4, line 45 - column 8, line 8; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US4484107  (KANEDA ISAO [JP]) [X] 1,3,11 * column A; figures 4-12 *;
 [X]WO9836622  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,3,5,11 * page 1, line 9 - page 3, line 34; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]WO9836623  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al);
 [A]WO0241670  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL])