Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1548736

EP1548736 - DISK CARTRIDGE AND RECORDING AND/OR REPRODUCING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.05.2011
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.05.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.06.2011  [2011/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2010/26]For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
Former [2005/26]For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KURITA, Kazuhito, c/o SONY CORPORATION
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
02 / MATSUDA, Mikinori, c/o SONY CORPORATION
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
03 / YAMADA, Takahiro, c/o SONY EMCS CORPORATION
17-1 Higashigotanda 2-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0022 / JP
04 / KANADA, Tokio, c/o SONY CORPORATION
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
05 / FUKUSHIMA, Takashi, c/o SONY CORPORATION
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
 [2005/26]
Representative(s)Smith, Samuel Leonard
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/26]Smith, Samuel Leonard
J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date04770909.223.07.2004
[2005/26]
WO2004JP10516
Priority number, dateJP2003028138928.07.2003         Original published format: JP 2003281389
JP2003028139228.07.2003         Original published format: JP 2003281392
JP2004014047310.05.2004         Original published format: JP 2004140473
JP2004014049810.05.2004         Original published format: JP 2004140498
[2005/26]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005010886
Date:03.02.2005
Language:EN
[2005/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1548736
Date:29.06.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2005
[2005/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1548736
Date:30.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP03.02.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:G11B23/03
[2005/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2006/44]
Former [2005/26]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DATENTRÄGERKASSETTE UND AUFZEICHNUNGS- UND/ODER WIEDERGABEEINRICHTUNG[2005/26]
English:DISK CARTRIDGE AND RECORDING AND/OR REPRODUCING DEVICE[2005/26]
French:CARTOUCHE DE DISQUE ET DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT ET/OU DE REPRODUCTION[2005/26]
Entry into regional phase17.03.2005Translation filed 
17.03.2005National basic fee paid 
17.03.2005Search fee paid 
17.03.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
17.03.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.03.2005Examination requested  [2005/26]
09.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.05.2010Fee for grant paid
11.05.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.03.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
13.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
10.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XA]JPH0945033  (KYOCERA CORP) [X] 1,2,5,6,8-13 * the whole document * [A] 3,4,7
International search[X]JPH0793935  (SONY CORP);
 [X]JPH05128780  (SONY CORP);
 [Y]JPH076493  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [Y]JP2001357650  (HITACHI MAXELL)
by applicantJPH11353845