Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1785521

EP1785521 - FULLY AROMATIC POLYAMIDE FIBER WITH EXCELLENT PROCESSABILITY AND ADHESIVENESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.02.2011
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 17.09.2014  [2014/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Teijin Techno Products Limited
6-7, Minamihommachi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0054 / JP
[2007/20]
Inventor(s)01 / TAKIUE, Kotaro, c/o Teijin Techno Products Limted
Matsuyama Factory, 77, Kitayoshida-cho
Matsuyama-shi, Ehime 7918041 / JP
02 / MAKINO, Shoji, c/o Teijin Techno Products Limted
Matsuyama Factory, 77, Kitayoshida-cho
Matsuyama-shi, Ehime 7918041 / JP
 [2007/20]
Representative(s)Hallybone, Huw George , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Hallybone, Huw George , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2007/20]Hallybone, Huw George , et al
Carpmaels and Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date04772846.431.08.2004
[2007/20]
WO2004JP12897
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006025113
Date:09.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1785521
Date:16.05.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2006
[2007/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1785521
Date:31.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP09.03.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:D06M11/79, D06M23/08, D01F11/00
[2009/07]
Former International [2007/20]D06M11/79, D06M23/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/20]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VOLLAROMATISCHE POLYAMIDFASER MIT AUSGEZEICHNETER VERARBEITBARKEIT UND HAFTFÄHIGKEIT[2007/20]
English:FULLY AROMATIC POLYAMIDE FIBER WITH EXCELLENT PROCESSABILITY AND ADHESIVENESS[2007/20]
French:FIBRE 100 % POLYAMIDE AROMATIQUE PRÉSENTANT D'EXCELLENTES PROPRIÉTÉS DE MISE EN O?uvre ET D'ADHÉSIVITÉ[2009/40]
Former [2007/20]FIBRE 100 % POLYAMIDE AROMATIQUE PRÉSENTANT D'EXCELLENTES PROPRIÉTÉS DE MISE EN OEUVRE ET D'ADHÉSIVITÉ
Entry into regional phase28.02.2007Translation filed 
28.02.2007National basic fee paid 
28.02.2007Search fee paid 
28.02.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
28.02.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.02.2007Examination requested  [2007/20]
10.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.02.2010Fee for grant paid
12.02.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.01.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
12.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
CY31.03.2010
CZ31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
EE31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
GR31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
RO31.03.2010
SE31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
SK31.03.2010
TR31.03.2010
BG30.06.2010
ES12.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
CH31.08.2010
IE31.08.2010
LI31.08.2010
LU31.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
HU01.10.2010
[2014/38]
Former [2013/42]AT31.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
CY31.03.2010
CZ31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
EE31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
RO31.03.2010
SE31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
SK31.03.2010
TR31.03.2010
BG30.06.2010
ES12.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
CH31.08.2010
IE31.08.2010
LI31.08.2010
LU31.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
HU01.10.2010
Former [2012/47]AT31.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
BG31.03.2010
CY31.03.2010
CZ31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
EE31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
RO31.03.2010
SE31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
SK31.03.2010
TR31.03.2010
ES12.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
CH31.08.2010
IE31.08.2010
LI31.08.2010
LU31.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
HU01.10.2010
Former [2012/44]AT31.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
BG31.03.2010
CY31.03.2010
CZ31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
EE31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
RO31.03.2010
SE31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
SK31.03.2010
ES12.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
CH31.08.2010
IE31.08.2010
LI31.08.2010
LU31.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
HU01.10.2010
Former [2012/42]AT31.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
BG31.03.2010
CY31.03.2010
CZ31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
EE31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
RO31.03.2010
SE31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
SK31.03.2010
ES12.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
CH31.08.2010
IE31.08.2010
LI31.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
HU01.10.2010
Former [2012/41]AT31.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
BG31.03.2010
CY31.03.2010
CZ31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
EE31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
RO31.03.2010
SE31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
SK31.03.2010
ES12.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
CH31.08.2010
IE31.08.2010
LI31.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
Former [2011/36]AT31.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
CY31.03.2010
CZ31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
EE31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
RO31.03.2010
SE31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
SK31.03.2010
ES12.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
CH31.08.2010
IE31.08.2010
LI31.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
Former [2011/20]AT31.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
CY31.03.2010
CZ31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
EE31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
RO31.03.2010
SE31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
SK31.03.2010
ES12.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
CH31.08.2010
LI31.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
Former [2011/15]AT31.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
CY31.03.2010
CZ31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
EE31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
RO31.03.2010
SE31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
SK31.03.2010
ES12.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
Former [2011/08]AT31.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
CY31.03.2010
CZ31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
EE31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
RO31.03.2010
SE31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
SK31.03.2010
ES12.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
Former [2011/07]AT31.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
CY31.03.2010
CZ31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
EE31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
RO31.03.2010
SE31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
SK31.03.2010
ES12.07.2010
Former [2010/51]AT31.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
CY31.03.2010
CZ31.03.2010
EE31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
RO31.03.2010
SE31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
SK31.03.2010
ES12.07.2010
Former [2010/46]AT31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
ES12.07.2010
Former [2010/38]AT31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
Former [2010/36]PL31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS60239523
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1986, no. 03, Database accession no. 1986-017061, XP002508386 & JPS60239523 A 19851128 (TEIJIN LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract *
International search[X]JPS5854021  (TEIJIN LTD);
 [X]JPS59163425  (TEIJIN LTD);
 [X]JPS62149934  (TEIJIN LTD);
 [X]JPS6017112  (TEIJIN LTD);
 [X]JPS53147811  (TEIJIN LTD);
 [X]JPS59137535  (TEIJIN LTD);
 [X]JPS6052623  (TEIJIN LTD);
 [X]JP2004162230  (TEIJIN TECHNO PRODUCTS LTD);
 [A]JP2002539340