Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1631828

EP1631828 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CHARACTERIZATION OF MOLECULES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.06.2015
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019New entry: Invitation to file observations in an appeal + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Analiza, Inc.
408 Glen Park Drive
Bay Village, OH 44140 / US
[2006/10]
Inventor(s)01 / CHAIT, Arnon
26101 Mile Road
Cleveland, OH 44128 / US
02 / ZASLAVSKY, Boris, Y.
34200 Country View Lane
Solon, OH 44139 / US
 [2006/10]
Representative(s)McNamara, Kathryn , et al
Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/30]Cowley, Catherine Mary , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
Former [2006/10]Killin, Stephen James , et al
Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date04776693.614.06.2004
[2006/10]
WO2004US19343
Priority number, dateUS20030478645P12.06.2003         Original published format: US 478645 P
US20040561945P14.04.2004         Original published format: US 561945 P
[2006/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004111655
Date:23.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1631828
Date:08.03.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2004
[2006/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.12.2004
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/68
[2006/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/10]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR CHARAKTERISIERUNG VON MOLEKÜLEN[2006/10]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CHARACTERIZATION OF MOLECULES[2006/10]
French:SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES DE CARACTERISATION DE MOLECULES[2006/10]
Entry into regional phase19.12.2005National basic fee paid 
19.12.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.12.2005Examination requested  [2006/10]
15.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.02.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.2010Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.12.2010
01.12.2010Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
20.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
04.06.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.10.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.03.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
08.06.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.2016Date of oral proceedings
20.05.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
20.05.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination27.07.2016Appeal received No.  T2490/16
30.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
13.11.2019Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2019/46]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.10.2007
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
08.06.2015Request for further processing filed
08.06.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.07.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
25.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
26.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
25.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
26.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
29.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 14
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 15
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 16
Cited inInternational search[X]  - KOHWI Y ET AL, "AMPHIPATHIC LIPID-BOUND PROTEIN ANTIGENS IN MOUSE BLADDER CARCINOMAS DETECTED BY A MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1984), vol. 23, no. 25, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 5945 - 5950, XP002304137 [X] 1-47 * abstract * * page 5946, column L, paragraph 3 * * page 5946, column R, paragraph LAST; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00320a009
 [X]  - HARBOE M ET AL, "Generation of antibodies to the signal peptide of the MPT83 lipoprotein of Mycobacterium tuberculosis", SCANDINAVIAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (200201), vol. 55, no. 1, ISSN 0300-9475, pages 82 - 87, XP002304138 [X] 1-47 * abstract * * page 86, column L, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-3083.2002.01030.x
 [A]  - ARNOLDI A ET AL, "LIPOPHILICITY-ANTIFUNGAL ACTIVITY RELATIONSHIPS FOR SOME ISOFLAVONOID PHYTOALEXINS", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (1990), vol. 38, no. 3, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 834 - 838, XP001203648 [A] 1-47 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf00093a052
 [A]  - MUELLER W ET AL, "Real and pseudo oxygen gradients in Ca-alginate beads monitored during polarographic PO-2-measurements using Pt-needle microelectrodes", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (1994), vol. 44, no. 5, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 617 - 625, XP002304154 [A] 1-47 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.260440508