Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1651116

EP1651116 - TUBULAR PATENT FORAMEN OVALE (PFO) CLOSURE DEVICE WITH CATCH SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.05.2014
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc.
4250 W. Kiltie Lane
Flagstaff AZ 86001 / US
[2011/36]
Former [2006/18]For all designated states
NMT Medical, Inc.
27 Wormwood Street
Boston, MA 02210 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHANDUSZKO, Andrzej, J.
311 N. Carriage Lane
Chandler, AZ 85224 / US
 [2006/18]
Representative(s)Chapman, Paul William , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London
WC1R 4PJ / GB
[2013/26]
Former [2006/18]Chapman, Paul William , et al
Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date04778248.714.07.2004
[2006/18]
WO2004US22643
Priority number, dateUS20030486992P14.07.2003         Original published format: US 486992 P
[2006/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005006990
Date:27.01.2005
Language:EN
[2005/04]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1651116
Date:03.05.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2005
[2006/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1651116
Date:26.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.06.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/00
[2006/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/18]
TitleGerman:RÖHRENFÖRMIGE VERSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG FÜR PATENTES FORAMEN OVALE (PFO) MIT RIEGELSYSTEM[2006/18]
English:TUBULAR PATENT FORAMEN OVALE (PFO) CLOSURE DEVICE WITH CATCH SYSTEM[2006/18]
French:DISPOSITIF TUBULAIRE DE FERMETURE DU FORAMEN OVALE PERMEABLE (FOP) PRESENTANT UN SYSTEME DE PRISE[2006/18]
Entry into regional phase14.02.2006National basic fee paid 
14.02.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
14.02.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.02.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.02.2006Examination requested  [2006/18]
29.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.09.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
05.02.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.2013Fee for grant paid
09.05.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP12150504.4  / EP2481356
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.12.2009
Opposition(s)27.03.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
28.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
26.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
25.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
25.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.07.2004
AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
DK26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
MC26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
TR26.06.2013
LU14.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
PT28.10.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
DK26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
MC26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
TR26.06.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/21]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
DK26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
MC26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/20]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
MC26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/18]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
MC26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/16]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
MC26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
CY10.07.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/14]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
CY10.07.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/11]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
CY10.07.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/10]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
CY10.07.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/09]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/08]BE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2013/50]FI26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
Former [2013/49]FI26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
GR27.09.2013
Cited inInternational search[XAY]WO0149185  (FREUDENTHAL FRANZ ; PFM PRODUKTE FUER DIE MEDIZIN (DE); SIEGNER GEORG) [X] 1,2,7,9-16,20-23,25 * page 13, line 7 - line 21 * * page 15, line 3 - line 11 * * page 17, line 5 - page 18, line 16 * [A] 24,26 [Y] 3-6,8,17-19;
 [XY]US6261309  (URBANSKI JEFFREY) [X] 1-3 * column 5, line 46 - line 56; figure 5 * [Y] 3;
 [X]US6344048  (CHIN YEM ET AL) [X] 39-42 * column 8, line 41 - line 56 *;
 [Y]US6312446  (BUSCEMI PAUL J ET AL) [Y] 4-6,8,17-19 * column 6, line 54 - column 7, line 20 *;
 [A]US5078736  (BEHL ROBERT S) [A] 1 * column 6, line 60 - column 7, line 15 *;
 [A]US6355052  (NEUSS MALTE ET AL) [A] 41,42 * column 7, line 64 - column 8, line 12 *