Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1651777

EP1651777 - USE SINGLE NUCLEOTIDE POLYMORPHSM IN THE CODING REGION OF THE PORCINE LEPTIN RECEPTOR GENE TO ENHANCE PORK PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  03.09.2010
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR, TR
published on 22.12.2010  [2010/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Newsham Choice Genetics, LLC
800 North Lindbergh Boulevard
St Louis, MO 63167 / US
[2008/22]
Former [2006/18]For all designated states
Monsanto Technology LLC
800 North Lindbergh Boulevard
St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KOJIMA, Cheryl J.
117 Royal Heights Drive
Knoxville, TN 37920 / US
02 / DU, Fengxing
228 Country Hollow Court
St. Charles, MO 63304 / US
03 / GROSZ, Michael, D.
814 JB Hunt Court
Ellisville, MO 63021 / US
04 / BYATT, John, C.
214 Country Creek Court
Ballwin, MO 63011 / US
 [2006/18]
Representative(s)Holmberg-Schwindt, Tor Martin , et al
Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB
P.O. Box 17704
118 93 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]Holmberg, Martin Tor , et al
Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704
118 93 Stockholm / SE
Former [2006/18]Bosch, Henry , et al
Monsanto Services International 270-272 Avenue de Tervuren
1150 Bruxelles / BE
Application number, filing date04778518.316.07.2004
[2006/18]
WO2004US23050
Priority number, dateUS20030493158P07.08.2003         Original published format: US 493158 P
US20040553582P16.03.2004         Original published format: US 553582 P
[2006/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005017204
Date:24.02.2005
Language:EN
[2005/08]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1651777
Date:03.05.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2005
[2006/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1651777
Date:16.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.03.2006
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2006/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/18]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG EINES EINZELNUKLEOTID-POLYMORPHISMUS IM CODIERENDEN BEREICH DES LEPTINREZEPTOR-GENS AUS SCHWEIN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER SCHWEINEFLEISCHPRODUKTION[2006/18]
English:USE SINGLE NUCLEOTIDE POLYMORPHSM IN THE CODING REGION OF THE PORCINE LEPTIN RECEPTOR GENE TO ENHANCE PORK PRODUCTION[2006/18]
French:UTILISATION DE POLYMORPHISME NUCLEOTIDIQUE UNIQUE DANS LA REGION DE CODAGE DU GENE DE RECEPTEUR DE LEPTINE PORCIN PERMETTANT D'AUGMENTER LA PRODUCTION EN ELEVAGE PORCIN[2006/18]
Entry into regional phase03.02.2006National basic fee paid 
03.02.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
03.02.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.12.2005Observations by third parties
03.02.2006Examination requested  [2006/18]
29.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
26.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.04.2008Fee for grant paid
09.04.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.12.2008  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Mertens, Martha
Ilmmünsterstr. 33
80686 Munich / DE
 02  12.12.2008  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Seibt, Doris
Wendelsteinweg 12
88570 Markt Schwaben / DE
 03  15.12.2008  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Krakau - Brandl, Ulrike
Neubiberger Strasse 28b
81737 Munich / DE
 04  21.12.2008  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Setz, Karl, J.
Degenhartring 1
94136 Kellberg / DE
 05  29.12.2008  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Geisel, Michael
Kreuzgasse 18
88677 Markdorf / DE
 06  29.12.2008  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Altstädter, Rosemarie
Rossweg 38
88677 Markdorf / DE
 07  29.12.2008  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Guhl, Herta und Erhard
Wirmetsweiler 13
88677 Markdorf / DE
 08  29.12.2008  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Lelsedeff, Irmgard
- not readable -
88046 Friedrichshafen / DE
 09  29.12.2008  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Leidorf, Othmar
Auf dem Ruhbühl 32
88090 Immenstaad / DE
 10  29.12.2008  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Müller, Stephan
Kobenbachweg 5a
88090 Immenstaad / DE
 11  08.01.2009  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Zimmermann, Karl
Untere Breite Strasse 23
88212 Ravensburg / DE
 12  10.01.2009  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Schrobbsdorf, Heiner
Jüdelstrasse 50
38126 Braunschweig / DE
 13  14.01.2009  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Verband Katholisches Landvolk e.V.
Postfach 700137
70571 Stuttgart / DE
 14  14.01.2009  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Eiber, Markus und Hein
Wankstrasse 7
82362 Weilheim / DE
 15  14.01.2009  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Eiber, Ulrike
Eichleite 51
82031 Grünwald / DE
 16  20.01.2009  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Leicher, Andreas und Henriette
Holunderweg 27
54296 Trier / DE
 17  09.02.2009  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Leicher, Florian
Holunderweg 27
54296 Trier / DE
 18  28.03.2009  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Bund für Umwelt und Naturschutz Deutschland (BUND) Herr B. Friess, Landesgeschäftsführer
Paulinenstrasse 47
70178 Stuttgart / DE
 19  15.04.2009  09.07.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Deutscher Bauernverband e.V.
Claire-Waldoff-Str. 7
10117 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Schubert, Klemens
Müller & Schubert Patentanwälte
Schlüterstrasse 37
10629 Berlin / DE
 20  15.04.2009  13.07.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Land Hessen Vertreten durch S. Lautenschläger, Ministerin f. Umwelt, Energie, Landwirtschaft u.Verbr.Schutz
Mainzer Str. 80
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB
Marstallstrasse 8
80539 München / DE
 21  15.04.2009  13.07.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Greenpeace e. V. SAMMELEINSPRUCH
Grosse Elbstr. 39
22767 HAMBURG / DE
 22  16.04.2009  13.07.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Göpper, Siegfried
Mühlenmeister / Landwirtschaftsmeister Mühlenstrasse 35
79367 Weisweil / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2010/40]
Opponent(s)01  02.12.2008  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Mertens, Martha
Ilmmünsterstr. 33
80686 Munich / DE
 02  12.12.2008  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Seibt, Doris
Wendelsteinweg 12
88570 Markt Schwaben / DE
 03  15.12.2008  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Krakau - Brandl, Ulrike
Neubiberger Strasse 28b
81737 Munich / DE
 04  21.12.2008  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Setz, Karl, J.
Degenhartring 1
94136 Kellberg / DE
 05  29.12.2008  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Geisel, Michael
Kreuzgasse 18
88677 Markdorf / DE
 06  29.12.2008  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Altstädter, Rosemarie
Rossweg 38
88677 Markdorf / DE
 07  29.12.2008  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Guhl, Herta und Erhard
Wirmetsweiler 13
88677 Markdorf / DE
 08  29.12.2008  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Lelsedeff, Irmgard
- not readable -
88046 Friedrichshafen / DE
 09  29.12.2008  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Leidorf, Othmar
Auf dem Ruhbühl 32
88090 Immenstaad / DE
 10  29.12.2008  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Müller, Stephan
Kobenbachweg 5a
88090 Immenstaad / DE
 11  08.01.2009  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Zimmermann, Karl
Untere Breite Strasse 23
88212 Ravensburg / DE
 12  10.01.2009  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Schrobbsdorf, Heiner
Jüdelstrasse 50
38126 Braunschweig / DE
 13  14.01.2009  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Verband Katholisches Landvolk e.V.
Postfach 700137
70571 Stuttgart / DE
 14  14.01.2009  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Eiber, Markus und Hein
Wankstrasse 7
82362 Weilheim / DE
 15  14.01.2009  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Eiber, Ulrike
Eichleite 51
82031 Grünwald / DE
 16  20.01.2009  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Leicher, Andreas und Henriette
Holunderweg 27
54296 Trier / DE
 17  09.02.2009  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Leicher, Florian
Holunderweg 27
54296 Trier / DE
 18  28.03.2009  01.09.2010  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Bund für Umwelt und Naturschutz Deutschland (BUND) Herr B. Friess, Landesgeschäftsführer
Paulinenstrasse 47
70178 Stuttgart / DE
 19  15.04.2009  09.07.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Deutscher Bauernverband e.V.
Claire-Waldoff-Str. 7
10117 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Schubert, Klemens
Patentanwalt Dr. K. Schubert Neue Promenade 5
10178 Berlin-Mitte / DE
 20  15.04.2009  13.07.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Land Hessen Vertreten durch S. Lautenschläger, Ministerin f. Umwelt, Energie, Landwirtschaft u.Verbr.Schutz
Mainzer Str. 80
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
DTS München
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte St.-Anna-Strasse 15
D-80538 München / DE
 21  15.04.2009  13.07.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Greenpeace e. V. SAMMELEINSPRUCH
Grosse Elbstr. 39
22767 HAMBURG / DE
 22  16.04.2009  13.07.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Göpper, Siegfried
Mühlenmeister / Landwirtschaftsmeister Mühlenstrasse 35
79367 Weisweil / DE
Former [2009/41]
Opponent(s)01  02.12.2008   
Mertens, Martha
Ilmmünsterstr. 33
80686 Munich / DE
 02  12.12.2008   
Seibt, Doris
Wendelsteinweg 12
88570 Markt Schwaben / DE
 03  15.12.2008   
Krakau - Brandl, Ulrike
Neubiberger Strasse 28b
81737 Munich / DE
 04  21.12.2008   
Setz, Karl, J.
Degenhartring 1
94136 Kellberg / DE
 05  29.12.2008   
Geisel, Michael
Kreuzgasse 18
88677 Markdorf / DE
 06  29.12.2008   
Altstädter, Rosemarie
Rossweg 38
88677 Markdorf / DE
 07  29.12.2008   
Guhl, Herta und Erhard
Wirmetsweiler 13
88677 Markdorf / DE
 08  29.12.2008   
Lelsedeff, Irmgard
- not readable -
88046 Friedrichshafen / DE
 09  29.12.2008   
Leidorf, Othmar
Auf dem Ruhbühl 32
88090 Immenstaad / DE
 10  29.12.2008   
Müller, Stephan
Kobenbachweg 5a
88090 Immenstaad / DE
 11  08.01.2009   
Zimmermann, Karl
Untere Breite Strasse 23
88212 Ravensburg / DE
 12  10.01.2009   
Schrobbsdorf, Heiner
Jüdelstrasse 50
38126 Braunschweig / DE
 13  14.01.2009   
Verband Katholisches Landvolk e.V.
Postfach 700137
70571 Stuttgart / DE
 14  14.01.2009   
Eiber, Markus und Hein
Wankstrasse 7
82362 Weilheim / DE
 15  14.01.2009   
Eiber, Ulrike
Eichleite 51
82031 Grünwald / DE
 16  20.01.2009   
Leicher, Andreas und Henriette
Holunderweg 27
54296 Trier / DE
 17  09.02.2009   
Leicher, Florian
Holunderweg 27
54296 Trier / DE
 18  28.03.2009   
Bund für Umwelt und Naturschutz Deutschland (BUND) Herr B. Friess, Landesgeschäftsführer
Paulinenstrasse 47
70178 Stuttgart / DE
 19  15.04.2009  09.07.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Deutscher Bauernverband e.V.
Claire-Waldoff-Str. 7
10117 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Schubert, Klemens
Patentanwalt Dr. K. Schubert Neue Promenade 5
10178 Berlin-Mitte / DE
 20  15.04.2009  13.07.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Land Hessen Vertreten durch S. Lautenschläger, Ministerin f. Umwelt, Energie, Landwirtschaft u.Verbr.Schutz
Mainzer Str. 80
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
DTS München
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte St.-Anna-Strasse 15
D-80538 München / DE
 21  15.04.2009  13.07.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Greenpeace e. V. SAMMELEINSPRUCH
Grosse Elbstr. 39
22767 HAMBURG / DE
 22  16.04.2009  13.07.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Göpper, Siegfried
Mühlenmeister / Landwirtschaftsmeister Mühlenstrasse 35
79367 Weisweil / DE
Former [2009/34]
Opponent(s)01  02.12.2008   
Mertens, Martha
Ilmmünsterstr. 33
80686 Munich / DE
 02  12.12.2008   
Seibt, Doris
Wendelsteinweg 12
88570 Markt Schwaben / DE
 03  15.12.2008   
Krakau - Brandl, Ulrike
Neubiberger Strasse 28b
81737 Munich / DE
 04  21.12.2008   
Setz, Karl, J.
Degenhartring 1
94136 Kellberg / DE
 05  29.12.2008   
Geisel, Michael
Kreuzgasse 18
88677 Markdorf / DE
 06  29.12.2008   
Altstädter, Rosemarie
Rossweg 38
88677 Markdorf / DE
 07  29.12.2008   
Guhl, Herta und Erhard
Wirmetsweiler 13
88677 Markdorf / DE
 08  29.12.2008   
Lelsedeff, Irmgard
- not readable -
88046 Friedrichshafen / DE
 09  29.12.2008   
Leidorf, Othmar
Auf dem Ruhbühl 32
88090 Immenstaad / DE
 10  29.12.2008   
Müller, Stephan
Kobenbachweg 5a
88090 Immenstaad / DE
 11  08.01.2009   
Zimmermann, Karl
Untere Breite Strasse 23
88212 Ravensburg / DE
 12  10.01.2009   
Schrobbsdorf, Heiner
Jüdelstrasse 50
38126 Braunschweig / DE
 13  14.01.2009   
Verband Katholisches Landvolk e.V.
Postfach 700137
70571 Stuttgart / DE
 14  14.01.2009   
Eiber, Markus und Hein
Wankstrasse 7
82362 Weilheim / DE
 15  14.01.2009   
Eiber, Ulrike
Eichleite 51
82031 Grünwald / DE
 16  20.01.2009   
Leicher, Andreas und Henriette
Holunderweg 27
54296 Trier / DE
 17  09.02.2009   
Leicher, Florian
Holunderweg 27
54296 Trier / DE
 18  28.03.2009   
Bund für Umwelt und Naturschutz Deutschland (BUND) Herr B. Friess, Landesgeschäftsführer
Paulinenstrasse 47
70178 Stuttgart / DE
 19  15.04.2009  09.07.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Deutscher Bauernverband e.V.
Claire-Waldoff-Str. 7
10117 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Müller, Thomas
Patentanwalt Müller & Schubert Innere Wiener Strasse 13
81667 München / DE
 20  15.04.2009  13.07.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Land Hessen Vertreten durch S. Lautenschläger, Ministerin f. Umwelt, Energie, Landwirtschaft u.Verbr.Schutz
Mainzer Str. 80
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
DTS München
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte St.-Anna-Strasse 15
D-80538 München / DE
 21  15.04.2009  13.07.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Greenpeace e. V. SAMMELEINSPRUCH
Grosse Elbstr. 39
22767 HAMBURG / DE
 22  16.04.2009  13.07.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Göpper, Siegfried
Mühlenmeister / Landwirtschaftsmeister Mühlenstrasse 35
79367 Weisweil / DE
Former [2009/33]
Opponent(s)01  02.12.2008   
Mertens, Martha
Ilmmünsterstr. 33
80686 Munich / DE
 02  12.12.2008   
Seibt, Doris
Wendelsteinweg 12
88570 Markt Schwaben / DE
 03  15.12.2008   
Krakau - Brandl, Ulrike
Neubiberger Strasse 28b
81737 Munich / DE
 04  21.12.2008   
Setz, Karl, J.
Degenhartring 1
94136 Kellberg / DE
 05  29.12.2008   
Geisel, Michael
Kreuzgasse 18
88677 Markdorf / DE
 06  29.12.2008   
Altstädter, Rosemarie
Rossweg 38
88677 Markdorf / DE
 07  29.12.2008   
Guhl, Herta und Erhard
Wirmetsweiler 13
88677 Markdorf / DE
 08  29.12.2008   
Lelsedeff, Irmgard
- not readable -
88046 Friedrichshafen / DE
 09  29.12.2008   
Leidorf, Othmar
Auf dem Ruhbühl 32
88090 Immenstaad / DE
 10  29.12.2008   
Müller, Stephan
Kobenbachweg 5a
88090 Immenstaad / DE
 11  08.01.2009   
Zimmermann, Karl
Untere Breite Strasse 23
88212 Ravensburg / DE
 12  10.01.2009   
Schrobbsdorf, Heiner
Jüdelstrasse 50
38126 Braunschweig / DE
 13  14.01.2009   
Verband Katholisches Landvolk e.V.
Postfach 700137
70571 Stuttgart / DE
 14  14.01.2009   
Eiber, Markus und Hein
Wankstrasse 7
82362 Weilheim / DE
 15  14.01.2009   
Eiber, Ulrike
Eichleite 51
82031 Grünwald / DE
 16  20.01.2009   
Leicher, Andreas und Henriette
Holunderweg 27
54296 Trier / DE
 17  09.02.2009   
Leicher, Florian
Holunderweg 27
54296 Trier / DE
 18  28.03.2009   
Bund für Umwelt und Naturschutz Deutschland (BUND) Herr B. Friess, Landesgeschäftsführer
Paulinenstrasse 47
70178 Stuttgart / DE
 19  15.04.2009  09.07.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Deutscher Bauernverband e.V.
Claire-Waldoff-Str. 7
10117 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Müller, Thomas
Patentanwalt Müller & Schubert Innere Wiener Strasse 13
81667 München / DE
 20  15.04.2009   
Land Hessen Vertreten durch S. Lautenschläger, Ministerin f. Umwelt, Energie, Landwirtschaft u.Verbr.Schutz
Mainzer Str. 80
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
DTS München
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte St.-Anna-Strasse 15
D-80538 München / DE
Former [2009/20]
Opponent(s)01  02.12.2008   
Mertens, Martha
Ilmmünsterstr. 33
80686 Munich / DE
 02  12.12.2008   
Seibt, Doris
Wendelsteinweg 12
88570 Markt Schwaben / DE
 03  15.12.2008   
Krakau - Brandl, Ulrike
Neubiberger Strasse 28b
81737 Munich / DE
 04  21.12.2008   
Setz, Karl, J.
Degenhartring 1
94136 Kellberg / DE
 05  29.12.2008   
Geisel, Michael
Kreuzgasse 18
88677 Markdorf / DE
 06  29.12.2008   
Altstädter, Rosemarie
Rossweg 38
88677 Markdorf / DE
 07  29.12.2008   
Guhl, Herta und Erhard
Wirmetsweiler 13
88677 Markdorf / DE
 08  29.12.2008   
Lelsedeff, Irmgard
- not readable -
88046 Friedrichshafen / DE
 09  29.12.2008   
Leidorf, Othmar
Auf dem Ruhbühl 32
88090 Immenstaad / DE
 10  29.12.2008   
Müller, Stephan
Kobenbachweg 5a
88090 Immenstaad / DE
 11  08.01.2009   
Zimmermann, Karl
Untere Breite Strasse 23
88212 Ravensburg / DE
 12  10.01.2009   
Schrobbsdorf, Heiner
Jüdelstrasse 50
38126 Braunschweig / DE
 13  14.01.2009   
Verband Katholisches Landvolk e.V.
Postfach 700137
70571 Stuttgart / DE
 14  14.01.2009   
Eiber, Markus und Hein
Wankstrasse 7
82362 Weilheim / DE
 15  14.01.2009   
Eiber, Ulrike
Eichleite 51
82031 Grünwald / DE
 16  20.01.2009   
Leicher, Andreas und Henriette
Holunderweg 27
54296 Trier / DE
 17  09.02.2009   
Leicher, Florian
Holunderweg 27
54296 Trier / DE
 18  28.03.2009   
Bund für Umwelt und Naturschutz Deutschland (BUND) Herr B. Friess, Landesgeschäftsführer
Paulinenstrasse 47
70178 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2009/02]
Opponent(s)01  02.12.2008   
Mertens, Martha
Ilmmünsterstr. 33
80686 Munich / DE
15.07.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Opposition is deemed not to be filed 01, 02, 03, 04, 05, 06, 07, 08, 09, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18
25.07.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular right
06.08.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.04.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
09.05.2010Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.07.2008
BE16.07.2008
CY16.07.2008
CZ16.07.2008
DK16.07.2008
EE16.07.2008
FI16.07.2008
IE16.07.2008
IT16.07.2008
LU16.07.2008
NL16.07.2008
PL16.07.2008
RO16.07.2008
SI16.07.2008
SK16.07.2008
TR16.07.2008
CH31.07.2008
LI31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
BG16.10.2008
SE16.10.2008
GR17.10.2008
ES27.10.2008
PT16.12.2008
HU17.01.2009
GB16.07.2009
FR31.07.2009
DE02.02.2010
[2010/51]
Former [2010/34]AT16.07.2008
BE16.07.2008
CY16.07.2008
CZ16.07.2008
DK16.07.2008
EE16.07.2008
FI16.07.2008
IE16.07.2008
IT16.07.2008
LU16.07.2008
NL16.07.2008
PL16.07.2008
RO16.07.2008
SI16.07.2008
SK16.07.2008
CH31.07.2008
LI31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
BG16.10.2008
SE16.10.2008
ES27.10.2008
PT16.12.2008
HU17.01.2009
GB16.07.2009
FR31.07.2009
DE02.02.2010
Former [2010/33]AT16.07.2008
BE16.07.2008
CZ16.07.2008
DK16.07.2008
EE16.07.2008
FI16.07.2008
IE16.07.2008
IT16.07.2008
LU16.07.2008
NL16.07.2008
PL16.07.2008
RO16.07.2008
SI16.07.2008
SK16.07.2008
CH31.07.2008
LI31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
BG16.10.2008
SE16.10.2008
ES27.10.2008
PT16.12.2008
GB16.07.2009
FR31.07.2009
DE02.02.2010
Former [2010/30]AT16.07.2008
BE16.07.2008
CZ16.07.2008
DK16.07.2008
EE16.07.2008
FI16.07.2008
IE16.07.2008
IT16.07.2008
NL16.07.2008
PL16.07.2008
RO16.07.2008
SI16.07.2008
SK16.07.2008
CH31.07.2008
LI31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
BG16.10.2008
SE16.10.2008
ES27.10.2008
PT16.12.2008
GB16.07.2009
FR31.07.2009
DE02.02.2010
Former [2010/25]AT16.07.2008
BE16.07.2008
CZ16.07.2008
DK16.07.2008
EE16.07.2008
FI16.07.2008
IE16.07.2008
IT16.07.2008
NL16.07.2008
PL16.07.2008
RO16.07.2008
SI16.07.2008
SK16.07.2008
CH31.07.2008
LI31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
BG16.10.2008
SE16.10.2008
ES27.10.2008
PT16.12.2008
GB16.07.2009
FR31.07.2009
Former [2010/24]AT16.07.2008
BE16.07.2008
CZ16.07.2008
DK16.07.2008
EE16.07.2008
FI16.07.2008
IE16.07.2008
IT16.07.2008
NL16.07.2008
PL16.07.2008
RO16.07.2008
SI16.07.2008
SK16.07.2008
CH31.07.2008
LI31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
BG16.10.2008
SE16.10.2008
ES27.10.2008
PT16.12.2008
FR31.07.2009
Former [2010/22]AT16.07.2008
BE16.07.2008
CZ16.07.2008
DK16.07.2008
EE16.07.2008
FI16.07.2008
IE16.07.2008
IT16.07.2008
NL16.07.2008
RO16.07.2008
SI16.07.2008
SK16.07.2008
CH31.07.2008
LI31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
BG16.10.2008
SE16.10.2008
ES27.10.2008
PT16.12.2008
FR31.07.2009
Former [2010/10]AT16.07.2008
BE16.07.2008
CZ16.07.2008
DK16.07.2008
EE16.07.2008
FI16.07.2008
IE16.07.2008
IT16.07.2008
NL16.07.2008
RO16.07.2008
SI16.07.2008
SK16.07.2008
CH31.07.2008
LI31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
BG16.10.2008
SE16.10.2008
ES27.10.2008
PT16.12.2008
Former [2009/41]AT16.07.2008
BE16.07.2008
CZ16.07.2008
DK16.07.2008
EE16.07.2008
FI16.07.2008
IE16.07.2008
IT16.07.2008
NL16.07.2008
RO16.07.2008
SI16.07.2008
SK16.07.2008
CH31.07.2008
LI31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
BG16.10.2008
ES27.10.2008
PT16.12.2008
Former [2009/35]AT16.07.2008
BE16.07.2008
CZ16.07.2008
DK16.07.2008
EE16.07.2008
FI16.07.2008
IE16.07.2008
NL16.07.2008
RO16.07.2008
SI16.07.2008
SK16.07.2008
CH31.07.2008
LI31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
BG16.10.2008
ES27.10.2008
PT16.12.2008
Former [2009/30]AT16.07.2008
BE16.07.2008
CZ16.07.2008
DK16.07.2008
EE16.07.2008
FI16.07.2008
NL16.07.2008
RO16.07.2008
SI16.07.2008
SK16.07.2008
CH31.07.2008
LI31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
BG16.10.2008
ES27.10.2008
PT16.12.2008
Former [2009/26]AT16.07.2008
BE16.07.2008
CZ16.07.2008
DK16.07.2008
EE16.07.2008
FI16.07.2008
NL16.07.2008
RO16.07.2008
SI16.07.2008
SK16.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
BG16.10.2008
ES27.10.2008
PT16.12.2008
Former [2009/24]AT16.07.2008
BE16.07.2008
CZ16.07.2008
DK16.07.2008
EE16.07.2008
FI16.07.2008
NL16.07.2008
SI16.07.2008
SK16.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
BG16.10.2008
ES27.10.2008
PT16.12.2008
Former [2009/22]AT16.07.2008
BE16.07.2008
DK16.07.2008
EE16.07.2008
FI16.07.2008
NL16.07.2008
SI16.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
BG16.10.2008
ES27.10.2008
PT16.12.2008
Former [2009/19]AT16.07.2008
BE16.07.2008
DK16.07.2008
FI16.07.2008
NL16.07.2008
SI16.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
BG16.10.2008
ES27.10.2008
PT16.12.2008
Former [2009/18]AT16.07.2008
BE16.07.2008
FI16.07.2008
NL16.07.2008
SI16.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
BG16.10.2008
ES27.10.2008
PT16.12.2008
Former [2009/15]AT16.07.2008
FI16.07.2008
NL16.07.2008
SI16.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
BG16.10.2008
ES27.10.2008
PT16.12.2008
Former [2009/13]AT16.07.2008
FI16.07.2008
NL16.07.2008
BG16.10.2008
ES27.10.2008
PT16.12.2008
Former [2009/12]FI16.07.2008
NL16.07.2008
BG16.10.2008
ES27.10.2008
PT16.12.2008
Former [2009/09]NL16.07.2008
ES27.10.2008
PT16.12.2008
Cited inInternational search[X]US6458531  (ROTHSCHILD MAX F [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-8,16,17,23,24,30 * examples 1-4; claims 1-22 *;
 [X]  - STRATIL A ET AL, "HpaII and RsaI PCR-RFLPs within an intron of the porcine leptin receptor gene (LEPR) and its linkage mapping", ANIMAL GENETICS, (199810), vol. 29, no. 5, ISSN 0268-9146, pages 405 - 406, XP002320727 [X] 1,2,4,6-8,16,17,23,24,30 * page 406 *
 [X]  - VINCENT A L ET AL, "Rapid communication: A restriction fragment length polymorphism in the porcine leptin receptor (LEPR) gene", JOURNAL OF ANIMAL SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 75, no. 8, ISSN 0021-8812, page 2287, XP002320728 [X] 1,2,4,6-8,16,17,23,24,30 * the whole document *
 [X]  - RUIZ-CORTES Z TATIANA ET AL, "Porcine leptin receptor: Molecular structure and expression in the ovary", MOLECULAR REPRODUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT, (200008), vol. 56, no. 4, ISSN 1040-452X, pages 465 - 474, XP002320729 [X] 6-8 * page 466; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1098-2795(200008)56:4<465::AID-MRD4>3.0.CO;2-Q
    [] - "Sus scrofa transmembrane leptin receptor (LEPR) mRNA, LEPR-Rb allele, complete cds.", DATABASE EMBL, Database accession no. AF092422, URL: EBI, [ ] * C in second position = Thr (bp 221) *
 [X]  - "Sus scrofa transmembrane leptin receptor (OBR) mRNA, OBR-db allele, partial cds.", DATABASE EMBL, Database accession no. AF167719, URL: EBI, XP002320733 [X] 6-8 * the whole document *
 [X]  - KORWIN-KOSSAKOWSKA AGNIESZKA ET AL, "The effect of the polymorphism of leptin (LEP), leptin receptor (LEPR) and osteopontin (OPN) genes on selected reproduction traits of synthetic Line 990 sows", ANIMAL SCIENCE PAPERS AND REPORTS, (2002), vol. 20, no. 3, ISSN 0860-4037, pages 159 - 168, XP008044159 [X] 1,2,16,17,23,24,30 * page 163 - page 166 *
 [X]  - SWITONSKI MAREK ET AL, "Searching for genes controlling fatness traits in pigs: A review.", ANIMAL SCIENCE PAPERS AND REPORTS, (2003), vol. 21, no. 2, ISSN 0860-4037, pages 73 - 86, XP008044189 [X] 1,2,16,17,23,24,30 * page 78 - page 79 *
 [X]  - KORWIN-KOSSAKOWSKA AGNIESZKA, "[Genes for reproductive traits in pigs: A review]", DATABASE BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, Database accession no. PREV200100323124, XP002320732 [X] 1,2,16,17,23,24,30 * abstract *
    [] - PRACE I MATERIALY ZOOTECHNICZNE, (2000), no. 57, ISSN 0137-1649, pages 25 - 37,