Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1665078

EP1665078 - CONTEXTUAL PREDICTION OF USER WORDS AND USER ACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.09.2015
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
America Online, Inc.
22000 AOL Way
Dulles, VA 20166 / US
[2006/23]
Inventor(s)01 / KAY, David, Jon
3824 Woodlawn Avenue N
Seattle, WA 98103 / US
02 / BRADFORD, Ethan, R.
1412 N. 35th Street
Seattle, WA 98103 / US
03 / VAN MEURS, Pim
6212 NE 193rd Street
Kenmore, WA 98028 / US
04 / PEDDIE, Peter, C.
24 Roy Street 421
Seattle, WA 98109 / US
 [2006/23]
Representative(s)Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/50]Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann
Stöckeler & Zinkler & Partner
Patentanwälte
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Former [2006/23]Schoppe, Fritz , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Application number, filing date04778736.121.07.2004
[2006/23]
WO2004US23363
Priority number, dateUS20030504240P19.09.2003         Original published format: US 504240 P
US2004086663410.06.2004         Original published format: US 866634
[2006/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005036413
Date:21.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1665078
Date:07.06.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2005
[2006/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.04.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.09.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/27, G06F3/023
[2009/44]
Former International [2006/23]G06F17/21, G06F3/02, G06F15/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KONTEXT-VORHERSAGE VON BENUTZERWÖRTERN UND BENUTZERAKTIONEN[2006/23]
English:CONTEXTUAL PREDICTION OF USER WORDS AND USER ACTIONS[2006/23]
French:PREVISION CONTEXTUELLE DE MOTS UTILISATEURS ET D'ACTIONS UTILISATEURS[2006/23]
Entry into regional phase14.03.2006National basic fee paid 
14.03.2006Search fee paid 
14.03.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
14.03.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.04.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
14.03.2006Examination requested  [2006/23]
03.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.11.2016
22.11.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
13.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination13.02.2017Appeal received No.  T1096/17
13.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)EP12003767.6  / EP2498190
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.05.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
04.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
10.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
08.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
22.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
13.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
10.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
14.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
29.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
31.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 14
30.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 15
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201108   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.2011
31.07.201916   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO03060451  (AIRTX INC [US]) [X] 1-38 * page 12, line 20 - page 13, line 11 * * page 15, line 8 - page 17, line 17 *;
 [A]US5805911  (MILLER JOHN W [US]) [A] 2,14,26 * column 3, line 23 - line 35 *
International search[X]US2003095102  (KRAFT CHRISTIAN [DK], et al);
 [X]US5818437  (GROVER DALE L [US], et al);
 [X]US6377965  (HACHAMOVITCH DEAN J [US], et al)