Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1651761

EP1651761 - METHOD FOR ISOLATING SMALL RNA MOLECULES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2006/18]METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR ISOLATING SMALL RNA MOLECULES
[2014/19]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.07.2017
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Opposition withdrawnpublished on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Life Technologies Corporation
5823 Newton Drive
Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US
[2016/47]
Former [2011/48]For all designated states
Life Technologies Corporation
5791 Van Allen Way
Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US
Former [2006/18]For all designated states
AMBION, INC.
2130 Woodward Street
Austin, TX 78744-1832 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CONRAD, Richard, C.
6814 La Concha Pass
Austin, TX 78749-1740 / US
 [2006/18]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/36]Weber, Birgit
Life Technologies GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 129 B
64293 Darmstadt / DE
Former [2011/31]Weber, Birgit
Life Technologies Frankfurter Strasse 129 B
64293 Darmstadt / DE
Former [2011/31]Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte
Riemergasse 14
1010 Wien / AT
Former [2006/18]Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte
Riemergasse 14
1010 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date04779084.526.07.2004
[2006/18]
WO2004US23850
Priority number, dateUS20030490325P25.07.2003         Original published format: US 490325 P
US2003066712619.09.2003         Original published format: US 667126
[2006/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005012523
Date:10.02.2005
Language:EN
[2005/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1651761
Date:03.05.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2005
[2006/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1651761
Date:03.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.02.2005
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/10
[2006/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/18]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ISOLIERUNG KLEINER RNA-MOLEKÜLE[2014/19]
English:METHOD FOR ISOLATING SMALL RNA MOLECULES[2014/19]
French:TECHNIQUE PERMETTANT D'ISOLER DE PETITES MOLECULES D'ARN[2014/19]
Former [2006/18]VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR ISOLIERUNG KLEINER RNA-MOLEKÜLE
Former [2006/18]METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR ISOLATING SMALL RNA MOLECULES
Former [2006/18]TECHNIQUES ET COMPOSITIONS PERMETTANT D'ISOLER DE PETITES MOLECULES D'ARN
Entry into regional phase24.02.2006National basic fee paid 
24.02.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
24.02.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.02.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.02.2006Examination requested  [2006/18]
02.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
15.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.08.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.11.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.06.2014Fee for grant paid
26.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP10183646.8  / EP2298891
EP14183292.3  / EP2902490
EP18166823.7  / EP3366771
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.06.2006
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.06.2015  12.06.2015  WITHDRAWN
QIAGEN GmbH
Qiagen Str. 1
40724 Hilden / DE
Opponent's representative
Roth, Carla, et al
König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Mönchenwerther Straße 11
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2019/46]
Former [2015/29]
Opponent(s)01  03.06.2015   
QIAGEN GmbH
Qiagen Str. 1
40724 Hilden / DE
Opponent's representative
Roth, Carla, et al
König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Mönchenwerther Straße 11
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
10.07.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.02.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M03)
29.08.2016Reply to a communication from the opposition division
01.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
08.06.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.07.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition13.09.2017Appeal received No.  T2035/17
28.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
28.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
26.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
25.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
25.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
29.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
28.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.07.2004
AT03.09.2014
BE03.09.2014
BG03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
TR03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
PT05.01.2015
IE26.07.2015
LU26.07.2015
[2017/39]
Former [2016/33]AT03.09.2014
BE03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
PT05.01.2015
IE26.07.2015
LU26.07.2015
Former [2016/15]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
PT05.01.2015
LU26.07.2015
Former [2016/13]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/50]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/37]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/35]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/24]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/23]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/22]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/16]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
Former [2015/12]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
Former [2015/10]ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
Former [2015/09]FI03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]  - (20030417), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20030417123134/www.ambion.com/techlib/prot/fm_1903.pdf, (20041206), XP002309227 [X] 1-53 * the whole document *
 [A]  - STELLRECHT CHRISTINE M ET AL, "Concurrent isolation of ribosomal, messenger, and low molecular weight RNA.", BIOTECHNIQUES, (200211), vol. 33, no. 5, ISSN 0736-6205, pages 1122 - 1124, XP001204185 [A] * the whole document *
 [T]  - (2004), URL: http://www.ambion.com/techlib/prot/fm_1560.pdf, (20041206), XP002309228
Examination   - GRIBANOV O G ET AL, "A simple method for RNA isolation and purification", BIOORGANICHESKAYA KHIMIYA, (199709), vol. 23, no. 9, ISSN 0132-3423, pages 763 - 765, XP009158002
by applicantUS5155018
 US5990302
 US6043354
 US6110363
 US5234809
 US6180778
 US5514545
 US5545522