Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1597655

EP1597655 - SQL LANGUAGE EXTENSIONS FOR MODIFYING COLLECTION-VALUED AND SCALAR VALUED COLUMNS IN A SINGLE STATEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.12.2019
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/12]
Former [2005/47]For all designated states
MICROSOFT CORPORATION
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RATHAKRISHNAN, Balaji, Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
02 / STEFANI, Stefano, Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
03 / BLAKELEY, Jose, A., Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
04 / SEELIGER, Oliver, Nicholas, Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
05 / SURNA, Aleksandras c/o Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
 [2005/47]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/47]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date04779537.229.07.2004
[2005/47]
WO2004US24522
Priority number, dateUS2003069330224.10.2003         Original published format: US 693302
[2005/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005045582
Date:19.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/20]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1597655
Date:23.11.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2005
[2005/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US29.12.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2008/49]
Former International [2006/11]G06F17/00
Former International [2005/47]G06F1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/47]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SQL-SPRACHENERWEITERUNGEN ZUM MODIFIZIEREN VON SAMMLUNGSWERTIGENUND SKALARWERTIGEN SPALTEN IN EINER EINZIGEN ANWEISUNG[2005/47]
English:SQL LANGUAGE EXTENSIONS FOR MODIFYING COLLECTION-VALUED AND SCALAR VALUED COLUMNS IN A SINGLE STATEMENT[2005/47]
French:EXTENSIONS DE LANGAGE SQL POUR MODIFIER DES COLONNES A VALEURS DE COLLECTION ET D'ECHELLE DANS UNE INSTRUCTION SIMPLE[2005/47]
Entry into regional phase28.06.2005National basic fee paid 
28.06.2005Search fee paid 
28.06.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
28.06.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.06.2005Examination requested  [2005/47]
14.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
21.09.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
21.09.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
02.01.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
Appeal following examination01.12.2016Appeal received No.  T0697/17
26.01.2017Statement of grounds filed
07.02.2018Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2018/06]
06.03.2018Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2018/10]
17.10.2019Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.01.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
13.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
10.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
14.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
12.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
13.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
08.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
08.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
09.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 14
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 15
15.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 16
Documents cited:Search[Y]  - LARSON, P.-A., "The Data Model and Query Language of LauRel", IEEE DATA ENGINEERING BULLETIN, USA, (198809), vol. 11, no. 3, pages 23 - 30, XP002491550 [Y] 4,12,20 * abstract *
 [Y]  - SACKS-DAVIS R ET AL, "Atlas: a nested relational database system for text applications", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON KNOWLEDGE AND DATA ENGINEERING USA, (199506), vol. 7, no. 3, ISSN 1041-4347, pages 454 - 470, XP002491551 [Y] 4,12,20 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/69.390250
International search[Y]US6564203  (KRISHNAPRASAD MURALIDHAR [US], et al);
 [Y]US6122644  (GRAEFE GOETZ [US], et al);
 [Y]US6892204  (HAAS ROBERT P [US], et al)
by applicantUS6122644
    - LARSON, P.-A., "The Data Model and Query Language of LauRel", IEEE DATA ENGINEERING BULLETIN, (198809), vol. 11, no. 3, pages 23 - 30, XP002491550
    - SACKS-DAVIS R ET AL., "Atlas: a nested relational database system for text applications", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON KNOWLEDGE AND DATA ENGINEERING USA, (19950603), vol. 7, doi:doi:10.1109/69.390250, pages 454 - 470, XP002491551

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/69.390250