Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1661018

EP1661018 - INTERNET DOMAIN KEYWORD OPTIMIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.12.2015
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.12.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.01.2016  [2016/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sol Invictus Comiti LP
Alte Landstrasse 131
8800 Thalwil, Zurich / CH
[2014/29]
Former [2006/22]For all designated states
Oversee.Net
818 West 7th Street, Suite 700
Los Angeles, CA 90017 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HSU, Frederick, Weider
225 South Olive Street 511
Los Angeles, CA 90012 / US
02 / NG, Lawrence, Chun
100 Alameda Street, Unit 366
Los Angeles, CA 90012 / US
 [2007/22]
Former [2006/22]01 / HSU, Frederick, Weider
225 South Olive Street 511
Los Angeles, CA 90012 / US
02 / NG, Lawrence, Chun
234 South Figueroa Street 720
Los Angeles, CA 90012 / US
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[N/P]
Former [2006/22]Müller, Wolfram Hubertus , et al
Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann, Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date04781063.513.08.2004
[2006/22]
WO2004US26318
Priority number, dateUS20030495635P15.08.2003         Original published format: US 495635 P
[2006/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005017762
Date:24.02.2005
Language:EN
[2005/08]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1661018
Date:31.05.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2005
[2006/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.03.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/16
[2006/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IE [2006/47]
Former [2006/22]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:INTERNET-DOMÄNEN-SCHLÜSSELWORT-OPTIMIERUNG[2006/22]
English:INTERNET DOMAIN KEYWORD OPTIMIZATION[2006/22]
French:OPTIMISATION DE MOT CLE DE DOMAINE INTERNET[2006/22]
Entry into regional phase03.03.2006National basic fee paid 
03.03.2006Search fee paid 
03.03.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
03.03.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.03.2006Examination requested  [2006/22]
27.10.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.12.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.02.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/01]
02.09.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2016/01]
Public notificationsNoting of loss of rights pursuant to Rule 112(1) EPC (EPO Form 2524 dated 11/06/2015)
Sol Invictus Comiti LP
Alte Landstrasse 131
8800 Thalwil, Zurich / CH
[2015/36]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.12.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
13.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
28.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
17.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
10.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
19.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201411   M06   Not yet paid
31.08.201512   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]US2002173971  (STIRPE PAUL ALAN [US], et al) [I] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0190] - paragraph [0191] *;
 [A]GB2339938  (IBM [US]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * page 1, line 14 - line 39 * * page 2, line 18 - line 45 * * claims 1-12 *;
 [A]WO0161562  (GLOBAL NETWORK INC [US]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * page 3, line 21 - page 6, line 12 *;
 [A]US6311194  (SHETH AMIT [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 45 * * column 6, line 52 - column 7, line 19 *;
 [A]US5717925  (HARPER LLOYD [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 21 * * column 5, line 1 - column 6, line 50 * * column 8, line 54 - column 9, line 28 *
International search[XP]US2003208578  (TARABORELLI STEVEN [US], et al);
 [YP]US2003068436  (FLEMING ROBERT J [US], et al);
 [AP]US6615247  (MURPHY STEPHEN C [US])