Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1664090

EP1664090 - NOVEL PEPTIDOMIMETIC NS3-SERINE PROTEASE INHIBITORS OF HEPATITIS C VIRUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.07.2013
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.08.2013  [2013/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
[N/P]
Former [2012/33]For all designated states
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway NJ 07065-0907 / US
Former [2006/23]For all designated states
SCHERING CORPORATION
2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth
New Jersey 07033-0530 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Kevin, X.
9 Gloria Avenue
Edison, New Jersey 08820 / US
02 / NJOROGE, F. George
11 Softwood Way
Warren, New Jersey 07059 / US
03 / YANG, Weiying
4505 Hana Road
Edison, New Jersey 08817 / US
04 / VIBULBHAN, Bancha
201 North 24th Street
Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US
05 / GIRIJAVALLABHAN, Viyyoor, M.
10 Maplewood Drive
Parsippany, New Jersey 07054 / US
06 / VENKATRAMAN, Srikanth
35 Roanoke Street
Woodbridge, New Jersey 07095 / US
07 / VELAZQUEZ, Francisco
4 Alexandra Way
Clinton, New Jersey 08009 / US
 [2006/23]
Representative(s)Adams, Harvey Vaughan John , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/23]Adams, Harvey Vaughan John , et al
Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2SQ / GB
Application number, filing date04782000.624.08.2004
[2006/23]
WO2004US27422
Priority number, dateUS20030497749P26.08.2003         Original published format: US 497749 P
[2006/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005021584
Date:10.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/10]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1664090
Date:07.06.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2005
[2006/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.08.2005
ClassificationInternational:C07K5/08, A61K38/06
[2006/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/23]
Extension statesAL22.03.2006
HR22.03.2006
LT22.03.2006
LV22.03.2006
MK22.03.2006
TitleGerman:NEUE PEPTIDOMIMETISCHE INHIBITOREN DER NS3-SERINPROTEASE DES HEPATITIS-C-VIRUS[2006/23]
English:NOVEL PEPTIDOMIMETIC NS3-SERINE PROTEASE INHIBITORS OF HEPATITIS C VIRUS[2006/23]
French:NOUVEAUX INHIBITEURS PEPTIDOMIMETIQUES DE LA SERINE PROTEASE NS3 DU VIRUS DE L'HEPATITE C[2006/23]
Entry into regional phase22.03.2006National basic fee paid 
22.03.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
22.03.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.03.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.03.2006Examination requested  [2006/23]
08.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/35]
09.04.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2013/35]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.06.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
03.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
07.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
06.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
08.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201209   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[DX]WO02079234  (ANGELETTI P IST RICHERCHE BIO [IT], et al) [DX] 1,5-9,17-53 * abstract *;
 [DX]WO0208244  (SCHERING CORP [US], et al) [DX] 1,5-9,17-53 * claims 1,2,7,10,26,28-49 *
 [DX]  - ORVIETO FEDERICA ET AL, "Novel, potent phenethylamide inhibitors of the hepatitis C virus (HCV) NS3 protease: Probing the role of P2 aryloxyprolines with hybrid structures.", BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (20030818), vol. 13, no. 16, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 2745 - 2748, XP002314396 [DX] 1,5-9,17-53 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(03)00536-5