Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1660506

EP1660506 - ORAL NEUROTHERAPEUTIC CEFAZOLIN COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  05.04.2013
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2013Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 08.05.2013  [2013/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Revaax Pharmaceuticals LLC
P.O. Box 22476
Indianapolis, IN 46222-0476 / US
[2006/22]
Inventor(s)01 / KOPPEL, Gary, A.
7823 Sunset Lane
Indianapolis, IN 46260 / US
02 / CHANEY, Michael, O.
9703 Deerfield Mall
Carmel, IN 46032 / US
 [2006/22]
Representative(s)Elsy, David , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/22]Elsy, David , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date04782021.224.08.2004
[2006/22]
WO2004US27451
Priority number, dateUS20030497588P25.08.2003         Original published format: US 497588 P
US20030533132P30.12.2003         Original published format: US 533132 P
[2006/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005020904
Date:10.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/10]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1660506
Date:31.05.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2005
[2006/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.05.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:C07D501/36, A61K31/545, A61K31/546, A61K31/43, A61K31/431, A61P25/28
[2006/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/22]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ORALE NEUROTHERAPEUTISCHE CEFAZOLINZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2006/22]
English:ORAL NEUROTHERAPEUTIC CEFAZOLIN COMPOSITIONS[2006/22]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE CEFAZOLINE NEUROTHERAPEUTIQUES ORALES[2006/22]
Entry into regional phase21.03.2006National basic fee paid 
21.03.2006Search fee paid 
21.03.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
21.03.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.06.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
13.03.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.03.2006Examination requested  [2006/22]
22.08.2012Application withdrawn by applicant  [2013/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
25.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
25.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201209   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO02063954  (REVAAX PHARMACEUTICALS LLC [US]) [X] 1 * page 10, table, III,IV,VI,VII, claim 1 *
International search[X]CA1031768  (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO);
 [X]  - RICHTER ET AL, "On the mechanism of Isomerization of Cephalosporing Esters", JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGICAL SCIENCES, (199002), vol. 79, no. 2, pages 185 - 186, XP002987533

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600790221
 [X]  - VORONA ET AL, "Anticancer activity in vitro of some amides and esters of 7-alpha-chlorodeacetoxycephalosporonate sulfone", MATERIALZINATNE UN LIETISKA KIMIJA, (2002), vol. 5, pages 190 - 194, XP008107969