Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1687369

EP1687369 - POWDER COATING FLUOROPOLYMER COMPOSITIONS WITH AROMATIC MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center
P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US
Former [2006/32]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JING, Naiyong
3M Center, Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
02 / CHEN, Lisa P.
3M Center, Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
03 / ANDERSON, Jeffrey T.
3M Center, Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
04 / BLONG, Thomas J.
3M Center, Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
05 / RIDDLE, Justin A.
3M Center, Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
06 / CHANDLER, Blake E.
3M Center, Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
 [2006/32]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/32]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date04783000.502.09.2004
[2006/32]
WO2004US28614
Priority number, dateUS2003068307810.10.2003         Original published format: US 683078
[2006/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005040260
Date:06.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1687369
Date:09.08.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2005
[2006/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1687369
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.05.2005
ClassificationInternational:C08K5/13, C09D127/12
[2006/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/32]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FLUORPOLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR PULVERBESCHICHTUNG MIT AROMATISCHEN MATERIALIEN[2009/08]
English:POWDER COATING FLUOROPOLYMER COMPOSITIONS WITH AROMATIC MATERIALS[2006/32]
French:COMPOSITIONS FLUOROPOLYMERES POUR REVETEMENT PAR PULVERISATION COMPRENANT DES SUBSTANCES AROMATIQUES[2006/32]
Former [2006/32]PULVERLACK-FLUORPOLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT AROMATISCHEN MATERIALEN
Entry into regional phase08.05.2006National basic fee paid 
08.05.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
08.05.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.08.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.05.2006Examination requested  [2006/32]
06.07.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
04.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.07.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.11.2008Fee for grant paid
18.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
CY25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
TR25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
HU26.08.2009
IE02.09.2009
LU02.09.2009
CH30.09.2009
LI30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/32]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
HU26.08.2009
IE02.09.2009
LU02.09.2009
CH30.09.2009
LI30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2011/21]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
IE02.09.2009
LU02.09.2009
CH30.09.2009
LI30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2010/46]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
IE02.09.2009
CH30.09.2009
LI30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2010/36]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
IE02.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2010/20]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2010/10]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2009/51]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2009/46]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
Former [2009/44]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
Former [2009/41]AT25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
Former [2009/36]FI25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
Cited inInternational search[X]US4713418  (LOGOTHETIS ANESTIS L [US], et al) [X] 1-38 * example - *;
 [X]EP0320894  (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1-38 * example 4 *;
 [X]US5268405  (OJAKAAR LEO [US], et al) [X] 1-38 * table 2 *;
 [PX]WO03093334  (DUPONT DOW ELASTOMERS LLC [US]) [PX] 1-38 * example - *;
 [PX]WO03093335  (DUPONT DOW ELASTOMERS LLC [US]) [PX] 1-38 * example - *;
 [X]EP0574319  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1-38 * claim - *;
 [X]US5371143  (NOVAK CHARLES T [US], et al) [X] 1-38 * tables 4,12 *;
 [X]EP1167443  (NEXPRESS SOLUTIONS LLC [US]) [X] 1-38 * claim - *;
 [X]US5719245  (YAMAMOTO YUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-38 * example - *;
 [X]EP1167442  (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-38 * example 3 *;
 [X]GB1521095  (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG) [X] 1-38 * claim - *;
 [X]US4297447  (YASUDA TOSHIO) [X] 1-38 * Practical experiment 4 *;
 [X]US2001034414  (EFFENBERGER JOHN A [US], et al) [X] 1-38 * example 29 *;
 [X]EP0168020  (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1-38 * table 1 *;
 [DX]US6489420  (DUCHESNE DENIS [US], et al) [DX] 1-38 * example - *