blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1667566

EP1667566 - HEAT PUMP CLOTHES DRYER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Self Propelled Research and Development Specialists LLC
176 Stanley Drive
Glastonbury, CT 06033 / US
[2012/27]
Former [2006/24]For all designated states
Self Propelled Research and Development Specialists LLC
479 Silver Lane
East Hartford, CT 06118 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GOLDBERG, Michael
176 Stanley Drive
Glastonbury, CT 06033 / US
02 / TRUMAN, James, C.
56 Crane Hill Road
Storrs, CT 06268 / US
03 / KNIFFIN, Alexander, B.
70 Forest Street
East Hartford, CT 06118 / US
 [2006/24]
Representative(s)Murgitroyd & Company
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/33]Novagraaf Technologies
122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR
Former [2006/24]Pichat, Thierry
Novagraaf Technologies, 122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date04785119.123.09.2004
[2006/24]
WO2004US31624
Priority number, dateUS20030507466P29.09.2003         Original published format: US 507466 P
US2004094913923.09.2004         Original published format: US 949139
[2006/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2005032322
Date:14.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/15]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1667566
Date:14.06.2006
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2006/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US20.10.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.2015
ClassificationIPC:D06F25/00, D06F58/20
[2015/34]
CPC:
D06F25/00 (EP,KR,US); D06F58/206 (EP,KR,US); D06F34/26 (EP,KR,US);
D06F58/04 (EP,KR,US); D06F58/22 (EP,KR,US); D06F2103/32 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2103/34 (EP,KR,US); D06F2103/36 (EP,KR,US); D06F2105/20 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2105/36 (EP,KR,US) (-)
Former IPC [2006/34]F26B21/06
Former IPC [2006/24]A47L1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KLEIDERTROCKNER MIT WÄRMEPUMPE[2006/24]
English:HEAT PUMP CLOTHES DRYER[2006/24]
French:SECHE-LINGE A POMPE A CHALEUR[2006/24]
Entry into regional phase31.03.2006National basic fee paid 
31.03.2006Search fee paid 
31.03.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.04.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
31.03.2006Examination requested  [2006/24]
08.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.04.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/37]
03.05.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/37]
Appeal following examination15.11.2012Appeal received No.  J0005/13
18.01.2013Statement of grounds filed
17.01.2014Result of appeal procedure: allowance of appeal
17.01.2014Date of oral proceedings
05.02.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:The application was refused due to failure to appoint a representative
22.06.2015Request for further processing filed
22.06.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.07.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
10.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
30.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
30.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
30.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
30.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
29.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
28.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200704   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2008
30.09.200805   M06   Fee paid on   10.07.2009
30.09.201714   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2018
30.09.201815   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE4216106  (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 38; figure -; claim - * [A] 7,8;
 [XA]EP0999302  (WHIRLPOOL CO [US], et al) [X] 7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0007] , [0017] - [0020]; figure -; claim - *[A] 1-6,8
International search[X]US138721  ;
 [Y]US3922798  (MCMILLAN STEPHEN L);
 [X]US4603489  (GOLDBERG MICHAEL [US]);
 [Y]US4621438  (LANCIAUX FRANCIS [US]);
 [A]EP0239025  (ZANUSSI ELETTRODOMESTICI [IT]);
 [Y]US5050313  (WAKAEYA SHINJI [JP], et al);
 [Y]EP0468573  (WHIRLPOOL INT [NL]);
 [Y]JPH0531298  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [Y]US5555645  (JOSLIN DAN F [US]);
 [Y]US6619063  (BRUMETT ANTHONY LEE [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.