Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1667566 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1667566



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 839
14.08.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
05.08.2019 Closing of application Search / examination 2
03.05.2019 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
05.11.2018 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
02.05.2018 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 3
02.05.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
24.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.04.2018 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
24.04.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
06.11.2017 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
27.09.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
08.12.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
08.12.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
24.11.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
05.11.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.11.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 7
29.09.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
24.09.2015 Amendments not yet acceptable Search / examination 2
15.09.2015 Annex Search / examination 6
15.09.2015 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
16.07.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
16.07.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
16.07.2015 Partial European search report Search / examination 9
06.07.2015 Request for further processing allowed Search / examination 1
02.07.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
22.06.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
22.06.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
22.06.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
22.06.2015 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
22.06.2015 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
21.05.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
13.03.2015 Invitation to give notice of appointment of a professional representative and to file an authorisation Search / examination 2
03.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.03.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
21.11.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.11.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
05.11.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
28.10.2014 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
21.10.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 2
30.07.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
28.07.2014 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee after re-establishment of rights Search / examination 2
28.07.2014 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee after re-establishment of rights Search / examination 2
28.07.2014 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee after re-establishment of rights Search / examination 2
28.07.2014 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee after re-establishment of rights Search / examination 2
15.07.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.07.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
11.07.2014 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
10.07.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
10.07.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
09.07.2014 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt (Legal BoA) Appeal 1
08.07.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
30.06.2014 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
14.02.2014 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
07.02.2014 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
05.02.2014 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
17.01.2014 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 17
17.01.2014 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 5
03.01.2014 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
03.01.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
20.12.2013 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
17.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.12.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
17.12.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
17.12.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
17.12.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.12.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
23.10.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.10.2013 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
10.10.2013 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 4
07.10.2013 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
04.02.2013 F3203 Composition of the Board (J) Appeal 1
01.02.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
18.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.01.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 60
18.01.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.01.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 72
18.01.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
18.01.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
27.11.2012 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
27.11.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
15.11.2012 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
15.11.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 4
12.10.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
09.10.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
19.09.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
19.09.2012 Decision Search / examination 9
04.06.2012 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
19.04.2012 Annex Search / examination 13
19.04.2012 Annex Search / examination 2
19.04.2012 Annex Search / examination 9
19.04.2012 Grounds for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 6
13.04.2012 Annex Search / examination 9
13.04.2012 Annex Search / examination 13
13.04.2012 Annex Search / examination 2
13.04.2012 Grounds for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 6
13.04.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.02.2012 Extension of time limit granted Search / examination 1
03.02.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.02.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.02.2012 Request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
06.12.2011 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 3
22.10.2010 Annex Search / examination 2
22.10.2010 Annex Search / examination 1
22.10.2010 Annex Search / examination 3
22.10.2010 Annex Search / examination 2
22.10.2010 Annex Search / examination 4
22.10.2010 Annex Search / examination 4
22.10.2010 Annex Search / examination 5
22.10.2010 Grounds for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 3
22.10.2010 Grounds for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 1
31.08.2010 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 3
20.04.2010 General enquiry Search / examination 1
14.04.2010 General enquiry Search / examination 2
25.08.2009 Annex Search / examination 1
25.08.2009 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
18.08.2009 Annex Search / examination 1
18.08.2009 Annex Search / examination 1
18.08.2009 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
10.07.2009 Annex Search / examination 1
10.07.2009 Annex Search / examination 1
10.07.2009 Annex Search / examination 1
10.07.2009 Annex Search / examination 1
10.07.2009 Annex Search / examination 1
10.07.2009 Annex Search / examination 1
10.07.2009 Annex Search / examination 6
10.07.2009 Annex Search / examination 1
10.07.2009 Annex Search / examination 1
10.07.2009 Annex Search / examination 1
10.07.2009 Grounds for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 3
10.07.2009 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 1
18.05.2009 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
04.11.2008 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
23.04.2008 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
23.04.2008 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
05.11.2007 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
25.07.2006 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
24.07.2006 Annex Search / examination 6
24.07.2006 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
29.05.2006 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
17.05.2006 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
10.05.2006 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
01.05.2006 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
26.04.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
18.04.2006 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
11.04.2006 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
07.04.2006 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 29
07.04.2006 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
07.04.2006 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
31.03.2006 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 29
31.03.2006 Annex Search / examination 1
31.03.2006 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
31.03.2006 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
31.03.2006 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
17.02.2006 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
20.10.2005 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
20.10.2005 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
24.05.2005 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
04.05.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 75
04.05.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 104
14.04.2005 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 98