Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1633673

EP1633673 - METHOD FOR FABRICATING MICROELECTROMECHANICAL SYSTEMS HAVING TRENCH ISOLATED CONTACTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2006/11]MICROELECTROMECHANICAL SYSTEMS HAVING TRENCH ISOLATED CONTACTS, AND METHODS FOR FABRICATING SAME
[2019/29]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2006/11]
Inventor(s)01 / PARTRIDGE, Aaron
224 N. California Avenue
Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US
02 / LUTZ, Markus
4214 Manuela Avenue
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
03 / KRONMUELLER, Silvia
Ludwigsburger Strasse 57
71409 Schwaikheim / DE
 [2006/11]
Application number, filing date04785662.030.03.2004
[2006/11]
WO2004US09661
Priority number, dateUS2003045555504.06.2003         Original published format: US 455555
[2006/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004108585
Date:16.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1633673
Date:15.03.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004
[2006/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1633673
Date:04.12.2019
Language:EN
[2019/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US02.06.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.06.2011
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/00, B81C1/00
[2011/27]
Former International [2006/16]H01L21/00
Former International [2006/11]B81B1/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2019/49]
Former [2006/37]DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  SE 
Former [2006/11]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR MIKROELEKTROMECHANISCHE SYSTEME MIT GRABENISOLIERTEN KONTAKTEN[2019/29]
English:METHOD FOR FABRICATING MICROELECTROMECHANICAL SYSTEMS HAVING TRENCH ISOLATED CONTACTS[2019/29]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE SYSTEMES MICROELECTROMECANIQUES AVEC CONTACTS ISOLES PAR DES TRANCHEES[2019/29]
Former [2006/11]MIKROELEKTROMECHANISCHE SYSTEME MIT GRABENISOLIERTEN KONTAKTEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR
Former [2006/11]MICROELECTROMECHANICAL SYSTEMS HAVING TRENCH ISOLATED CONTACTS, AND METHODS FOR FABRICATING SAME
Former [2006/11]SYSTEMES MICROELECTROMECANIQUES AVEC CONTACTS ISOLES PAR DES TRANCHEES, ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION DE CES SYSTEMES
Entry into regional phase04.01.2006National basic fee paid 
04.01.2006Search fee paid 
04.01.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
04.01.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.01.2006Examination requested  [2006/11]
08.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
02.10.2014Date of oral proceedings
16.10.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
27.11.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
21.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.10.2019Fee for grant paid
21.10.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Appeal following examination27.01.2015Appeal received No.  T1155/15
02.04.2015Statement of grounds filed
17.01.2019Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
17.01.2019Date of oral proceedings
24.01.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP19151217.7  / EP3527529
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.03.2012
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
04.10.2012Request for further processing filed
04.10.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.10.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
02.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
02.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 14
03.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 15
01.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 16
Documents cited:Search[E]EP1464615  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [E] 1-4,6,7,9-13,15,17-20,22-25 * figures 2A-2E * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0059] *;
 [A]DE19961578  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,9,17 * column 5, line 63 - column 9, line 28 * * figures 29, 32, 33, 34' *
International search[A]US2002016058  (ZHAO BIN [US]);
 [A]US6635509  (OUELLET LUC [CA])
ExaminationDE10005555
    - KENNY ET AL, "An Integrated Wafer-Scale Packaging Process for MEMS", ASME INTERNATIONAL MECHANICAL ENGINEERING CONGRESS AND EXPOSITION,, (20021101), pages 51 - 54, XP008107777
    - LEDERMANN N ET AL, "Sputtered silicon carbide thin films as protective coating for MEMS applications", SURFACE AND COATINGS TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 125, no. 1-3, ISSN 0257-8972, (20000301), pages 246 - 250, (20000301), XP027328829
by applicantDE10005555
 DE19961578
 US6307815
 US6146917
 US6352935
 US6477901
 US6507082
 WO0177008
 WO0177009
 US20030392528