Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1795456

EP1795456 - CAPPED CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.01.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
23.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance S.A.
Avenue Général-Guisan 70
1009 Pully / CH
[2012/16]
Former [2007/24]For all designated states
Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA
Avenue Général-Guisan 70, P.O. Box 430
1009 Pully / CH
Inventor(s)01 / KANEKO, Masamichi, @c/o Nihon Tetra Pak k.k.
6-12, Kioi-cho, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo, 1028544 / JP
02 / SERIZAWA, Hiroyuki, @c/o Nihon Tetra Pak k.k.
6-12 , Kioi-cho, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo, 1028544 / JP
 [2013/09]
Former [2007/24]01 / KANEKO, Masamichi, c/o Nihon Tetra Pak k.k.
6-12, Kioi-cho, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo, 1028544 / JP
02 / SERIZAWA, Hiroyuki, c/o Nihon Tetra Pak k.k.
6-12 , Kioi-cho, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo, 1028544 / JP
Representative(s)Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Bavariaring 11
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/12]Müller Schupfner & Partner
Bavariaring 11
80336 München / DE
Former [2007/24]Müller, Frank Peter , et al
Müller Schupfner Patentanwälte Bavariaring 11
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date04788361.630.09.2004
[2007/24]
WO2004JP14333
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006038251
Date:13.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1795456
Date:13.06.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2006
[2007/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1795456
Date:27.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.04.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:B65D47/36, B65D5/74, B65D51/22
[2007/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   IT [2008/02]
Former [2007/24]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:BEHÄLTER MIT VERSCHLUSSKAPPE[2012/45]
English:CAPPED CONTAINER[2007/24]
French:CONTENEUR A BOUCHON[2012/45]
Former [2007/24]GEKAPSELTER BEHÄLTER
Former [2007/24]CONTENEUR À BOUCHON
Entry into regional phase20.03.2007Translation filed 
21.03.2007National basic fee paid 
21.03.2007Search fee paid 
21.03.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
21.03.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.03.2007Examination requested  [2007/24]
30.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.01.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.2013Fee for grant paid
10.01.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.12.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.11.2013  03.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
SIG Technology AG
Laufengasse 18
8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack, et al
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2016/01]
Former [2015/22]
Opponent(s)01  27.11.2013  03.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
SIG Technology Ltd.
Laufengasse 18
8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack, et al
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2014/01]
Opponent(s)01  27.11.2013   
SIG Technology Ltd.
Laufengasse 18
8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH
Opponent's representative
Thielmann, Andreas, et al
COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
10.01.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.05.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.09.2015Date of oral proceedings
01.10.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
01.10.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition02.12.2015Appeal received No.  T2218/15
10.02.2016Statement of grounds filed
12.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
25.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
25.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
14.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
12.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1396435  (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH]) [X] 1-4,6 * paragraph [0044]; figures 4,7 * [I] 5,7;
 [X]EP1088765  (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH]) [X] 1,3,4 * paragraph [0045]; figures 5-8,14 *;
 [X]WO2004000667  (SIG TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]; WEIST MARIO [DE]; HUBER HANSJOERG [DE]; SEELH) [X] 1-4 * figures 1,4,5 *
International search[X]JP2003026219