Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1670632 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1670632



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1049
24.11.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
03.04.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.04.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.03.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 36
31.03.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
31.03.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
12.10.2016 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
12.10.2016 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
12.10.2016 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
06.09.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
02.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.08.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
29.08.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
11.02.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 17
11.02.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 17
15.12.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.12.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.12.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.12.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
11.12.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
11.12.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
07.12.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
05.11.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.10.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
26.10.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
04.08.2015 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
04.08.2015 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
04.08.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.08.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.07.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.07.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
23.07.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.07.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
15.07.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
14.07.2015 Request for change of name -opponent Appeal 1
13.07.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
11.05.2015 Request for change of name -opponent Appeal 4
08.04.2015 Request for change of name -opponent Appeal 2
30.03.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
26.03.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.03.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
19.12.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.12.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 2
11.12.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
11.12.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
27.08.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.08.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
03.06.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.05.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.05.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
20.05.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
07.04.2014 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
25.02.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.02.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
08.11.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.11.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.10.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
30.10.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
24.06.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.06.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 14
18.03.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
25.02.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.02.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 16
15.02.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 16
19.10.2012 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
12.10.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
12.10.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
12.10.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 20
03.09.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
03.09.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
29.08.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
27.08.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
16.08.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.07.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.07.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.06.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.06.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.06.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
27.06.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
27.06.2012 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
27.06.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 12
27.06.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
27.06.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
27.06.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
27.06.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
27.06.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
27.06.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.04.2012 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.03.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
16.03.2012 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
16.03.2012 Non-scannable object Opposition 2
16.03.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 54
28.02.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.02.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.02.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.02.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.02.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.02.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.02.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.02.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
14.02.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
14.02.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
10.02.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.02.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.02.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.02.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.02.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.02.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.02.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
02.02.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.02.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.02.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.01.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.07.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.07.2011 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 24
20.07.2011 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 24
04.04.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
04.04.2011 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
15.02.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
07.02.2011 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 9
07.02.2011 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
07.02.2011 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 9
07.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
07.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
07.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
07.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
07.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
07.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
07.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 132
07.02.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
07.02.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 28
07.02.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
07.02.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
07.02.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
07.02.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 94
07.02.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
08.06.2010 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
01.06.2010 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 1
01.06.2010 Submission concerning change of applicant's name Search / examination 1
31.05.2010 Annex Search / examination 1
31.05.2010 Submission concerning change of applicant's name Search / examination 1
09.04.2010 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
24.03.2010 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
24.03.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.03.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
22.03.2010 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
18.01.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
18.01.2010 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
18.01.2010 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
18.01.2010 Text intended for grant Search / examination 15
28.10.2009 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
24.10.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
24.10.2009 Description Search / examination 1
24.10.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
23.10.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
23.10.2009 Description Search / examination 1
23.10.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
06.07.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
06.07.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.10.2008 Claims Search / examination 4
11.10.2008 Description Search / examination 5
11.10.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.10.2008 Claims Search / examination 4
09.10.2008 Description Search / examination 5
09.10.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.09.2008 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
08.08.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
05.08.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.08.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.03.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
31.03.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.09.2007 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
14.03.2007 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
24.05.2006 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
18.05.2006 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
03.05.2006 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
11.01.2006 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
04.10.2005 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
10.08.2005 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
11.05.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 17
21.04.2005 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
21.04.2005 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
21.04.2005 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 17
03.12.2004 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
03.12.2004 Claims International Searching Authority 4
03.12.2004 Description International Searching Authority 9
03.12.2004 Drawings International Searching Authority 2