Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1680355

EP1680355 - CATALYTIC SECONDARY REFORMING PROCESS AND REACTOR FOR SAID PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.12.2016
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
07.08.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Casale SA
Via Giulio Pocobelli, 6
6900 Lugano-Besso / CH
[2014/35]
Former [2014/32]For all designated states
Casale SA
Via Giulio Pocobelli, 6
6900 Lugano / CH
Former [2006/29]For all designated states
Casale Chemicals S.A.
Via Giulio Pocobelli, 6
6900 Lugano-Besso / CH
Inventor(s)01 / ZANICHELLI, Luca
Via IV Novembre 4
I-22010 Grandola ed Uniti (CO) / IT
 [2006/29]
Representative(s)Zardi, Marco
M. Zardi & Co. SA
Via Pioda 6
6900 Lugano / CH
[2014/35]
Former [2008/37]Zardi, Marco
M. Zardi & Co. S.A. Via Pioda 6
6900 Lugano / CH
Former [2006/29]Zardi, Marco
M. Zardi & Co. Via Pioda, 6
6900 Lugano / CH
Application number, filing date04790745.622.10.2004
[2006/29]
WO2004EP11949
Priority number, dateEP2003002552406.11.2003         Original published format: EP 03025524
[2006/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005044724
Date:19.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1680355
Date:19.07.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2005
[2006/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1680355
Date:27.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.05.2005
ClassificationInternational:B01F5/00, B01F5/04, B01J8/02, C01B3/38, B01J8/04
[2013/51]
Former International [2006/29]C01B3/38, B01J4/00, B01J8/02, B01J8/04, B01J19/26, B01F5/04, B01F15/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/29]
TitleGerman:KATALYTISCHES SEKUNDÄRES REFORMIERUNGSVERFAHREN SOWIE REAKTOR ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS[2013/51]
English:CATALYTIC SECONDARY REFORMING PROCESS AND REACTOR FOR SAID PROCESS[2006/29]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE REFORMAGE SECONDAIRE CATALYTIQUE ET RÉACTEUR PERMETTANT DE METTRE EN OEUVRE LEDIT PROCÉDÉ[2013/51]
Former [2006/29]KATALYTISCHES SEKUNDÄRREFORMIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND REAKTOR DAFÜR
Former [2006/29]PROCEDE DE REFORMAGE SECONDAIRE CATALYTIQUE ET REACTEUR PERMETTANT DE METTRE EN OEUVRE LEDIT PROCEDE
Entry into regional phase27.04.2006National basic fee paid 
27.04.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
27.04.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.06.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.04.2006Examination requested  [2006/29]
18.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.01.2014Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
28.05.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.07.2014Fee for grant paid
16.07.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.07.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.12.2006
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.05.2015  26.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE
75 Quai d'Orsay
75007 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Dropsch, Holger
Air Liquide Forschung und Entwicklung GmbH
Gwinnerstraße 27-33
60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 02  26.05.2015  26.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Haldor Topsoe A/S
Haldor Topsoes Allé 1
2800 Kongens Lyngby / DK
Opponent's representative
Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
 03  27.05.2015  26.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
thyssenkrupp Industrial Solutions AG
ThyssenKrupp Allee 1
45143 Essen / DE
Opponent's representative
Lorenz, Bernd Ingo Thaddeus
Andrejewski - Honke
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
An der Reichsbank 8
45127 Essen / DE
 04  26.05.2015  26.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Linde AG
Klosterhofstrasse 1
80331 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Fischer, Werner
Linde AG
Technology & Innovation
Corporate Intellectual Property
Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14
82049 Pullach / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2018/36]
Opponent(s)01  08.05.2015  26.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE
75 Quai d'Orsay
75007 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Dropsch, Holger
Air Liquide Forschung und Entwicklung GmbH
Gwinnerstraße 27-33
60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 02  26.05.2015  26.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Haldor Topsoe A/S
Haldor Topsoes Allé 1
2800 Kongens Lyngby / DK
Opponent's representative
Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
 03  27.05.2015  26.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
thyssenkrupp Industrial Solutions AG
ThyssenKrupp Allee 1
45143 Essen / DE
Opponent's representative
Lorenz, Bernd Ingo Thaddeus
Andrejewski - Honke
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte GbR
An der Reichsbank 8
45127 Essen / DE
 04  26.05.2015  26.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Linde AG
Klosterhofstrasse 1
80331 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Fischer, Werner
Linde AG
Technology & Innovation
Corporate Intellectual Property
Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14
82049 Pullach / DE
Former [2015/27]
Opponent(s)01  08.05.2015   
L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE
75 Quai d'Orsay
75007 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Dropsch, Holger
Air Liquide Forschung und Entwicklung GmbH
Gwinnerstraße 27-33
60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 02  26.05.2015   
Haldor Topsoe A/S
Haldor Topsoes Allé 1
2800 Kongens Lyngby / DK
Opponent's representative
Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
 03  27.05.2015   
ThyssenKrupp Industrial Solutions AG
ThyssenKrupp Allee 1
45143 Essen / DE
Opponent's representative
Lorenz, Bernd Ingo Thaddeus
Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8
45127 Essen / DE
 04  26.05.2015   
Linde AG
Klosterhofstrasse 1
80331 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Fischer, Werner
Linde AG
Legal Services
Intellectual Property
Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14
82049 Pullach / DE
Former [2015/25]
Opponent(s)01  08.05.2015   
L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE
75 Quai d'Orsay
75007 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Dropsch, Holger
Air Liquide Forschung und Entwicklung GmbH
Gwinnerstraße 27-33
60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE
03.07.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.01.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
21.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.12.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition17.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0452/17
28.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
23.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
29.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
28.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
26.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
25.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
24.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.10.2004
AT27.08.2014
BE27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
TR27.08.2014
IE22.10.2014
LU22.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
[2016/32]
Former [2015/50]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
IE22.10.2014
LU22.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/46]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
IE22.10.2014
LU22.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/33]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
LU22.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/30]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
LU22.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/27]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
LU22.10.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/26]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
LU22.10.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/24]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/23]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/22]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/16]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/12]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/10]ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
Former [2015/09]FI27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP1359119  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,2 * figure 7; claims 1,8,12 * [Y] 3-6,8,14;
 [XY]GB2305186  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 7,9 * page 6, line 21 - page 11, line 3; figure 1 * [Y] 3-6,8,14;
 [A]WO0047517  (CASALE CHEMICALS SA [CH], et al) [A] 1,7,9 * the whole document *
by applicantGB2305186