Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1819457

EP1819457 - KINEMATIC SYSTEM FOR THE DISPLACEMENT OF WORKING UNITS OF MACHINES FOR BENDING AND FORMING METALLIC SHEETS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2014Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 10.09.2014  [2014/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Finn-Power OY
P. Box 38
62201 Kauhava / FI
[2007/34]
Inventor(s)01 / PATUZZI, Luigi
Via Roma 114
I-37032 Monteforte D'Alpone / IT
02 / FELICI, Maurizio
Via Monte Pasubio, 7
I-36045 Lonigo / IT
03 / HAAG, Mikael, Norbert
Höylätie 18
Fin-01650 Vantaa / FI
 [2007/34]
Representative(s)Petraz, Gilberto Luigi , et al
GLP S.r.l.
Viale Europa Unita, 171
33100 Udine / IT
[N/P]
Former [2007/34]Petraz, Gilberto Luigi , et al
GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2
33100 Udine / IT
Application number, filing date04791915.422.10.2004
[2007/34]
WO2004IT00581
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006043292
Date:27.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1819457
Date:22.08.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2006
[2007/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1819457
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.04.2006
ClassificationInternational:B21D5/04
[2007/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/34]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KINEMATISCHES SYSTEM ZUR VERSCHIEBUNG VON ARBEITSEINHEITEN VON MASCHINEN ZUM BIEGEN UND BILDEN VON METALLPLATTEN[2007/34]
English:KINEMATIC SYSTEM FOR THE DISPLACEMENT OF WORKING UNITS OF MACHINES FOR BENDING AND FORMING METALLIC SHEETS[2007/34]
French:SYSTEME CINEMATIQUE ASSURANT LE DEPLACEMENT DES TETES DE TRAVAIL DE MACHINES UTILISEES POUR LE FORMAGE ET LE CINTRAGE DE TOLES METALLIQUES[2007/34]
Entry into regional phase21.05.2007National basic fee paid 
21.05.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
21.05.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.05.2007Examination requested  [2007/34]
13.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.2008Fee for grant paid
18.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.02.2009
CY18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
HU19.08.2009
GB22.10.2009
IE22.10.2009
LU22.10.2009
CH31.10.2009
LI31.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
[2014/37]
Former [2012/37]AT18.02.2009
CY18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
HU19.08.2009
GB22.10.2009
IE22.10.2009
LU22.10.2009
CH31.10.2009
LI31.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
Former [2011/45]AT18.02.2009
CY18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
HU19.08.2009
GB22.10.2009
IE22.10.2009
LU22.10.2009
CH31.10.2009
LI31.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
Former [2011/32]AT18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
HU19.08.2009
GB22.10.2009
IE22.10.2009
LU22.10.2009
CH31.10.2009
LI31.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
Former [2011/21]AT18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
GB22.10.2009
IE22.10.2009
LU22.10.2009
CH31.10.2009
LI31.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
Former [2011/01]AT18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
GB22.10.2009
IE22.10.2009
CH31.10.2009
LI31.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
Former [2010/46]AT18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
IE22.10.2009
CH31.10.2009
LI31.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
Former [2010/25]AT18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
MC31.10.2009
Former [2010/22]AT18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
Former [2010/10]AT18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
Former [2009/51]AT18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
Former [2009/46]AT18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
Former [2009/41]AT18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
Former [2009/36]FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
Former [2009/35]NL18.02.2009
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2004069444  (KYOWA MACHINE CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * figures 5,6 *;
 [A]EP1121996  (GOITI S COOP [ES]) [A] 1,11 * figures 4-7 *;
 [A]DE9404308U  (BLAZ SANTIC [DE]) [A] 1,11 * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP1302252  (SALVAGNINI ITALIA SPA [IT]) [A] 1,11 * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0293964  (SALVAGNINI TRANSFERICA SPA [IT]) [A] 1,11 * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0679456  (SALVAGNINI ITALIA SPA [IT]) [A] 1,11 * figures 1,5 *;
 [A]US4836004  (CODATTO ANTONIO [IT]) [A] 1,11 * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US5934133  (TAKAHASHI HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,11 * column 5, line 13 - line 29; figure 2 *
by applicantEP1609543
 WO2004069444