Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1702787

EP1702787 - DISPLAY FOR VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.04.2012
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha
2500 Shingai Iwata-shi
Shizuoka-ken Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP
[2011/24]
Former [2010/22]For all designated states
Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha
2500 Shingai
Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP
Former [2006/38]For all designated states
Yamaha Marine Kabushiki Kaisha
1400 Nippashi-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka
4328058 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KANNO, Isao c/o Yamaha Marine Kabushiki Kaisha
1400, Nippashi-cho
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 4328058 / JP
02 / MOTOSE, Hitoshi c/o Yamaha Marine Kabushiki Kaisha
1400, Nippashi-cho
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 4328058 / JP
 [2006/38]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/38]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date04792527.618.10.2004
[2006/38]
WO2004JP15358
Priority number, dateJP2004000098006.01.2004         Original published format: JP 2004000980
[2006/38]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005065979
Date:21.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1702787
Date:20.09.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2005
[2006/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1702787
Date:15.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.07.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:B60K35/00, B60K37/02
[2008/01]
Former International [2006/38]B60K35/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANZEIGE FÜR SCHIFF[2006/38]
English:DISPLAY FOR VESSEL[2006/38]
French:AFFICHAGE POUR RECIPIENT[2006/38]
Entry into regional phase30.09.2005Translation filed 
30.09.2005National basic fee paid 
30.09.2005Search fee paid 
30.09.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
30.09.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.09.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.09.2005Examination requested  [2006/38]
28.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.04.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.12.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2010Date of oral proceedings
26.01.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.01.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
02.05.2011Fee for grant paid
02.05.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.01.2009
Opposition(s)16.03.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
30.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
29.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.06.2011
BE15.06.2011
CY15.06.2011
CZ15.06.2011
DK15.06.2011
EE15.06.2011
FI15.06.2011
HU15.06.2011
PL15.06.2011
RO15.06.2011
SI15.06.2011
SK15.06.2011
TR15.06.2011
BG15.09.2011
GR16.09.2011
ES26.09.2011
PT17.10.2011
GB18.10.2011
IE18.10.2011
LU18.10.2011
CH31.10.2011
LI31.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT15.06.2011
BE15.06.2011
CY15.06.2011
CZ15.06.2011
DK15.06.2011
EE15.06.2011
FI15.06.2011
PL15.06.2011
RO15.06.2011
SI15.06.2011
SK15.06.2011
TR15.06.2011
BG15.09.2011
GR16.09.2011
ES26.09.2011
PT17.10.2011
GB18.10.2011
IE18.10.2011
LU18.10.2011
CH31.10.2011
LI31.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
Former [2013/29]AT15.06.2011
BE15.06.2011
CY15.06.2011
CZ15.06.2011
DK15.06.2011
EE15.06.2011
FI15.06.2011
PL15.06.2011
RO15.06.2011
SI15.06.2011
SK15.06.2011
BG15.09.2011
GR16.09.2011
ES26.09.2011
PT17.10.2011
GB18.10.2011
IE18.10.2011
LU18.10.2011
CH31.10.2011
LI31.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
Former [2013/25]AT15.06.2011
BE15.06.2011
CY15.06.2011
CZ15.06.2011
DK15.06.2011
EE15.06.2011
FI15.06.2011
PL15.06.2011
RO15.06.2011
SI15.06.2011
SK15.06.2011
GR16.09.2011
ES26.09.2011
PT17.10.2011
GB18.10.2011
IE18.10.2011
LU18.10.2011
CH31.10.2011
LI31.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
Former [2013/22]AT15.06.2011
BE15.06.2011
CY15.06.2011
CZ15.06.2011
DK15.06.2011
EE15.06.2011
FI15.06.2011
PL15.06.2011
RO15.06.2011
SI15.06.2011
SK15.06.2011
GR16.09.2011
ES26.09.2011
PT17.10.2011
GB18.10.2011
IE18.10.2011
CH31.10.2011
LI31.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
Former [2012/47]AT15.06.2011
BE15.06.2011
CY15.06.2011
CZ15.06.2011
DK15.06.2011
EE15.06.2011
FI15.06.2011
PL15.06.2011
RO15.06.2011
SI15.06.2011
SK15.06.2011
GR16.09.2011
PT17.10.2011
GB18.10.2011
IE18.10.2011
CH31.10.2011
LI31.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
Former [2012/36]AT15.06.2011
BE15.06.2011
CY15.06.2011
CZ15.06.2011
DK15.06.2011
EE15.06.2011
FI15.06.2011
PL15.06.2011
RO15.06.2011
SI15.06.2011
SK15.06.2011
GR16.09.2011
PT17.10.2011
GB18.10.2011
CH31.10.2011
LI31.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
Former [2012/33]AT15.06.2011
BE15.06.2011
CY15.06.2011
CZ15.06.2011
DK15.06.2011
EE15.06.2011
FI15.06.2011
PL15.06.2011
RO15.06.2011
SI15.06.2011
SK15.06.2011
GR16.09.2011
PT17.10.2011
CH31.10.2011
LI31.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
Former [2012/31]AT15.06.2011
BE15.06.2011
CY15.06.2011
CZ15.06.2011
DK15.06.2011
EE15.06.2011
FI15.06.2011
PL15.06.2011
RO15.06.2011
SI15.06.2011
SK15.06.2011
GR16.09.2011
PT17.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
Former [2012/25]AT15.06.2011
BE15.06.2011
CY15.06.2011
CZ15.06.2011
EE15.06.2011
FI15.06.2011
PL15.06.2011
RO15.06.2011
SI15.06.2011
SK15.06.2011
GR16.09.2011
PT17.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
Former [2012/11]AT15.06.2011
BE15.06.2011
CY15.06.2011
CZ15.06.2011
EE15.06.2011
FI15.06.2011
PL15.06.2011
RO15.06.2011
SI15.06.2011
SK15.06.2011
GR16.09.2011
PT17.10.2011
Former [2012/10]AT15.06.2011
BE15.06.2011
CY15.06.2011
CZ15.06.2011
EE15.06.2011
FI15.06.2011
RO15.06.2011
SI15.06.2011
SK15.06.2011
GR16.09.2011
PT17.10.2011
Former [2012/09]AT15.06.2011
BE15.06.2011
CY15.06.2011
CZ15.06.2011
EE15.06.2011
FI15.06.2011
SI15.06.2011
GR16.09.2011
PT17.10.2011
Former [2012/05]AT15.06.2011
BE15.06.2011
CY15.06.2011
FI15.06.2011
SI15.06.2011
GR16.09.2011
Former [2011/52]AT15.06.2011
CY15.06.2011
FI15.06.2011
SI15.06.2011
GR16.09.2011
Former [2011/50]CY15.06.2011
FI15.06.2011
SI15.06.2011
GR16.09.2011
Former [2011/49]CY15.06.2011
FI15.06.2011
GR16.09.2011
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4740780  (BROWN STEVEN E [US] ET AL) [X] 1 * page 7, line 1 - line 3 * * page 15, line 35 - line 37 * * page 15, line 60 - line 62 * * page 22, line 51; figure 2 * [Y] 2-11;
 [Y]EP0895892  (VALEO ELECTRONICS GMBH & CO KG [DE] VALEO ELECTRONICS GMBH & CO KG) [Y] 2-11 * abstract *;
 [X]US2002085035  (ORBANES JULIAN [US] ET AL) [X] 1 * paragraph [0100] * * paragraph [0010]; figure 5 *;
 [A]US5371510  (MIYAUCHI KUNIHIRO [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-11 * abstract *
International search[Y]JP2001004953  (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH0242314  (SANSHIN KOGYO KK);
 [Y]JPS5741224  (NIPPON DENSO CO);
 [Y]JPS5498188U  ;
 [A]JPS6092130  (VDO SCHINDLING);
 [A]JPH0435927U
by applicantUS4740780
 EP0895892