Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1657835

EP1657835 - MOBILE-TERMINAL-ORIENTED TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  13.02.2009
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.02.2009Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 18.03.2009  [2009/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2006/20]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / USUKI, Izumi
1-44-1-308, Kisabenishi katano-shi
Osaka 576-0041 / JP
02 / KAGEYAMA, Sadashi
29-C-302, Akashiadai 5 chome Sanda-shi
HYOGO 669-1323 / JP
03 / KISODA, Akira c/o Matsushita El. Ind. Co., Ltd.
19F Matsushita IMP Bldg., 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome
Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP
04 / YOMO, Hidekuni c/o Matsushita El. Ind. Co., Ltd.
19F Matsushita IMP Bldg., 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome
Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP
 [2007/21]
Former [2006/20]01 / USUKI, Izumi
1-44-1-308, Kisabenishi katano-shi
Osaka 576-0041 / JP
02 / KAGEYAMA, Sadashi
29-C-302, Akashiadai 5 chome Sanda-shi
HYOGO 669-1323 / JP
03 / KISODA, Akira
1-11-5-202, Kajimachi, Moriguchi-shi
Osaka 570-0015 / JP
04 / YOMO, Hidekuni
310 Syousen-ryo, 422 Ueki Kamakura-shi
Kanagawa 247-0073 / JP
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/40]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Former [2006/20]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date04792938.526.10.2004
[2006/20]
WO2004JP15810
Priority number, dateJP2003037055030.10.2003         Original published format: JP 2003370550
JP2003041363911.12.2003         Original published format: JP 2003413639
[2006/20]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005043783
Date:12.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1657835
Date:17.05.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2005
[2006/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP12.05.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04H1/00, H04L12/56, H04N5/44
[2006/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT [2007/06]
Former [2006/20]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MOBILENDGERÄT-ORIENTIERTES ÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG[2006/20]
English:MOBILE-TERMINAL-ORIENTED TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS[2006/20]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE TRANSMISSION ORIENTEE SUR TERMINAL MOBILE[2006/20]
Entry into regional phase05.01.2006Translation filed 
05.01.2006National basic fee paid 
05.01.2006Search fee paid 
05.01.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
05.01.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.01.2006Examination requested  [2006/20]
03.05.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.02.2009Application withdrawn by applicant  [2009/12]
Divisional application(s)EP09151844.9  / EP2051510
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
19.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]WO03073753  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]; YAMAGUCHI TAKAO [JP]; ITOH TOMOAK) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1, line 11 - page 2, line 10 * * page 13, line 1 - page 18, line 4 * * page 20, line 15 - line 23 * * page 23, line 25 - page 31, line 7 * * figures 1-9 *;
 [DA]EP1337071  (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [DA] 10 * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] , [0006] , [0010] , [0013] - [0021] * * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]WO03075494  (NOKIA CORP [FI]; NOKIA INC [US]; LAIHO KIMMO [FI]; PEKONEN HARRI [FI];) [A] 10 * paragraphs [0018] , [0025] - [0033] * * figures 3-11 *;
 [A]US2003196211  (CHAN PETER [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * figure 6 *;
 [A]WO03088646  (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR]; KRAKORA ROBERT VINCENT [US]; SCHNEIDEWEND D) [A] 7 * page 1, line 31 - page 2, line 8 * * page 5, line 24 - page 7, line 5 * * figures 1-3 *
International search[Y]EP1337071  ;
 [Y]JP2002010225  ;
 [Y]WO03073753  ;
 [Y]JP2003115808  ;
 [A]JPH11225168  ;
 [A]JPH10507045
 [AP]  - HASUTA A.P. ET AL, "Digital Televion wa Sekai no Ketai ni Utsurunoka Dai 3 Bu Keitai . Ido Jushin o Shiya ni Denso Gijutsu o Kodoka", NIKKEI ELECTRONICS, (20040202), no. 866, pages 108 - 113, XP002988153