Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1671460

EP1671460 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SCHEDULING RESOURCES ON A SWITCHED UNDERLAY NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.01.2012
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.01.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.02.2012  [2012/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ciena Luxembourg S.a.r.l.
560A rue de Neudorf
2220 Luxembourg / LU
[2010/51]
Former [2006/25]For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel
St.Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / CUTRELL, William, Doug
44 Museum Way
San Francisco, CA 94114 / US
02 / COHEN, Howard, J.
3272 Cowper Street
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
03 / LAVIAN, Tal
1351 Zurich Terrace
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
 [2006/25]
Representative(s)Jeffrey, Philip Michael , et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/32]Jeffrey, Philip Michael , et al
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2006/25]Ertl, Nicholas Justin
Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date04794014.301.10.2004
[2006/25]
WO2004US32477
Priority number, dateUS20030508524P03.10.2003         Original published format: US 508524 P
US2003071922521.11.2003         Original published format: US 719225
[2006/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005033899
Date:14.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/15]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1671460
Date:21.06.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2005
[2006/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US09.02.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2006
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/56
[2006/49]
Former International [2006/25]H04L12/66
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2007/02]
Former [2006/25]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR EINTEILUNG VON BETRIEBSMITTELN IN EINEM SWITCHED-UNDERLAY-NETZWERK[2006/25]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SCHEDULING RESOURCES ON A SWITCHED UNDERLAY NETWORK[2006/25]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR ORDONNANCER LES RESSOURCES DANS UN RESEAU SOUS-JACENT COMMUTE[2006/25]
Entry into regional phase19.04.2006National basic fee paid 
19.04.2006Search fee paid 
19.04.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
19.04.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.04.2006Examination requested  [2006/25]
12.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.08.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/06]
23.09.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/06]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.04.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
07.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
07.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
12.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
11.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]US2001053152  (SALA DOLORS [US] ET AL) [X] 1-23 * abstract * * column 1, paragraph 16 - column 2, paragraph 20 * * column 2, paragraph 21 - paragraph 22 * * column 2, paragraph 35 - column 3, paragraph 42 * * column 3, paragraph 48 - column 4, paragraph 57; figures 1-4b; claims 1-4 *;
 [X]WO02100023  (CETACEAN NETWORKS INC [US]; ROGERS STEVEN A [US]; BALL SCOTT [US]; GRE) [X] 1-23 * abstract * * page 1, line 15 - line 18 * * page 1, line 27 - page 2, line 22 * * page 3, line 1 - line 18 * * page 5, line 14 - line 33 * * page 6, line 9 - page 7, line 12 * * page 7, line 21 - page 8, line 10 * * page 11, line 1 - line 18 * * page 11, line 27 - page 13, line 8 * * page 13, line 17 - page 16, line 24 * * page 19, paragraph 25 - page 23, paragraph 20; figures 1a-4,15; claims 1-3,7,16,18,19,32-37 *;
 [A]  - QUECKE G ET AL, "MeSch - An Approach to Resource Management in a Distributed Environment", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, SPRINGER VERLAG, NEW YORK, NY, US, (2000), vol. 1971, ISSN 0302-9743, pages 47 - 54, XP002390264 [A] 1-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-44444-0_5
 [A]  - TALWAR V ET AL, "An environment for enabling interactive grids", HIGH PERFORMANCE DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING, 2003. PROCEEDINGS. 12TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON 22-24 JUNE 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20030622), ISBN 0-7695-1965-2, pages 184 - 193, XP010643723 [A] 1-23 * the whole document *
International search[X]US6278712  ;
 [Y]US2003161632