blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1671460 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1671460



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 157
25.01.2012 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
03.01.2012 Closing of application Search / examination 2
23.09.2011 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
12.04.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
12.04.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.01.2011 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
19.11.2010 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
18.11.2010 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
11.11.2010 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 4
11.11.2010 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 10
21.07.2010 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
13.07.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
13.07.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.07.2010 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
21.04.2010 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.04.2010 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
08.10.2009 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
19.01.2007 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
24.11.2006 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
07.11.2006 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
07.11.2006 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 3
02.11.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
24.05.2006 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
12.05.2006 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
19.04.2006 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 6
19.04.2006 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
19.04.2006 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
01.03.2006 Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) Search / examination 1
17.02.2006 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
09.02.2006 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
09.02.2006 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
04.05.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 38
04.05.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 25
14.04.2005 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 27