blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1671460


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
06.01.2012 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  08.02.2012  [2012/06]
14.10.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.09.2011 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
08.04.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.04.2011 First examination report
19.11.2010 Change - applicant published on  22.12.2010  [2010/51]
19.10.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.07.2010 Change - representative published on  11.08.2010  [2010/32]
14.10.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.10.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.10.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.12.2006 Change - designated states published on  10.01.2007  [2007/02]
08.12.2006 Change - extension states published on  10.01.2007  [2007/02]
03.11.2006 Supplementary search report published on  06.12.2006  [2006/49]
03.11.2006 Change - classification published on  06.12.2006  [2006/49]
13.10.2006 Change - PCT data published on  15.11.2006  [2006/46]
19.05.2006 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  21.06.2006  [2006/25]
19.05.2006 Request for examination filed published on  21.06.2006  [2006/25]
17.05.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
28.04.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
28.04.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.04.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
24.02.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
19.04.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
15.04.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
25.01.2005 PCT data prior to European publication