Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1714349

EP1714349 - PROTECTED ACTIVE METAL ELECTRODE AND BATTERY CELL STRUCTURES WITH NON-AQUEOUS INTERLAYER ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.05.2016
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 22.08.2018  [2018/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Polyplus Battery Company
Suite B, 2431 Fifth Street
Berkeley, CA 94710 / US
[2006/43]
Inventor(s)01 / VISCO, Steven, J.
546 Arlington Avenue
Berkeley, CA 94707 / US
02 / NIMON, Yevgeniy, S.
10 Cross Bridge Place
Danville, CA 94526 / US
03 / KATZ, Bruce, D.
2836 Webster Street
Berkeley, CA 94704 / US
04 / DE JONGHE, Lutgard, C.
910 Acalanes Road
Lafayette, CA 94549 / US
 [2007/10]
Former [2006/52]01 / VISCO, Steven, J.
546 Arlington Avenue
Berkeley, CA 94707 / US
02 / NIMON, Yevgeniy, S.
10 Cross Bridge Place
Danville, CA 94526 / US
03 / KATZ, Bruce, D.
6363 Christie Avenue Unit 2224
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
04 / DE JONGHE, Lutgard, C.
910 Acalanes Road
Lafayette, CA 94549 / US
Former [2006/43]01 / VISCO, Steven, J.
546 Arlington Avenue
Berkeley, CA 94707 / US
02 / NIMON, Yevgeniy, S.
10 Cross Bridge Place
Danville, CA 94526 / US
03 / KATZ, Bruce, D.
1672 Oxford Street
Berkeley, CA 94709 / US
04 / DE JONGHE, Lutgard, C.
910 Acalanes Road
Lafayette, CA 94549 / US
Representative(s)Browne, Robin Forsythe , et al
Hepworth Browne
15 St Paul's Street
Leeds LS1 2JG / GB
[2015/29]
Former [2009/44]Browne, Robin Forsythe , et al
Leaman Browne Limited Pearl Chambers 22 East Parade
Leeds, Yorkshire LS1 5BY / GB
Former [2007/02]Browne, Robin Forsythe , et al
Leaman Browne 5 South Parade
Leeds, LS1 5QX / GB
Former [2006/46]McDonough, Jonathan , et al
HLBBshaw European Patent & Trade Mark Attorneys 1200 Century Way Thorpe Park Business Park Colton
Leeds LS15 8ZA / GB
Former [2006/43]Browne, Robin Forsythe , et al
HLBBshaw 1200 Century Way Thorpe Park Business Park, Colton
Leeds LS15 8ZA / GB
Application number, filing date04794655.308.10.2004
[2006/43]
WO2004US33371
Priority number, dateUS20040542532P06.02.2004         Original published format: US 542532 P
US20040548231P27.02.2004         Original published format: US 548231 P
US2004082494414.04.2004         Original published format: US 824944
[2006/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005083829
Date:09.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/36]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1714349
Date:25.10.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2005
[2006/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1714349
Date:15.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.05.2006
ClassificationInternational:H01M12/04, H01M6/34, H01M12/06, H01M4/12, H01G11/52, H01G11/58, H01G11/06, H01M2/16, H01M4/36, H01M10/052, H01M10/0562, H01M10/0565, H01M4/13, // H01M4/587, H01M10/0525
[2014/42]
Former International [2006/43]H01M12/04, H01M6/34, H01M12/06, H01M4/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/29]
Former [2006/43]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:GESCHÜTZTE AKTIVMETALL-ELEKTRODE UND BATTERIEZELLENSTRUKTUREN MIT WASSERFREIER ZWISCHENSCHICHT-ARCHITEKTUR[2006/43]
English:PROTECTED ACTIVE METAL ELECTRODE AND BATTERY CELL STRUCTURES WITH NON-AQUEOUS INTERLAYER ARCHITECTURE[2006/43]
French:STRUCTURES D'ELEMENTS DE BATTERIE ET D'ELECTRODE A METAL ACTIF PROTEGEES A STRUCTURE INTERCOUCHE NON AQUEUSE[2006/43]
Entry into regional phase18.08.2006National basic fee paid 
18.08.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
18.08.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.08.2006Examination requested  [2006/43]
26.10.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
12.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
20.01.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.05.2015Fee for grant paid
29.05.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.05.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.12.2007
Opposition(s)18.04.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/25]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
09.12.2010Request for further processing filed
09.12.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.12.2010Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
26.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
25.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
25.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
28.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
27.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.10.2004
AT15.07.2015
BE15.07.2015
BG15.07.2015
CY15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
IT15.07.2015
MC15.07.2015
NL15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
PT15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SI15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
TR15.07.2015
IE08.10.2015
LU08.10.2015
GR16.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
[2018/34]
Former [2017/39]HU08.10.2004
AT15.07.2015
BE15.07.2015
BG15.07.2015
CY15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
IT15.07.2015
MC15.07.2015
NL15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SI15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
TR15.07.2015
IE08.10.2015
LU08.10.2015
GR16.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
Former [2017/03]AT15.07.2015
BE15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
IT15.07.2015
MC15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SI15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
IE08.10.2015
LU08.10.2015
GR16.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
Former [2016/45]AT15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
IT15.07.2015
MC15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SI15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
IE08.10.2015
LU08.10.2015
GR16.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
Former [2016/36]AT15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
IT15.07.2015
MC15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SI15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
LU08.10.2015
GR16.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
Former [2016/33]AT15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
IT15.07.2015
MC15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
LU08.10.2015
GR16.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
Former [2016/28]AT15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
IT15.07.2015
MC15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
LU08.10.2015
GR16.10.2015
Former [2016/26]AT15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
IT15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
LU08.10.2015
GR16.10.2015
Former [2016/23]AT15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
IT15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
GR16.10.2015
Former [2016/22]AT15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
IT15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
GR16.10.2015
Former [2016/21]AT15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
IT15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
GR16.10.2015
Former [2016/20]AT15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
GR16.10.2015
Former [2016/11]AT15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
GR16.10.2015
Former [2016/10]ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
GR16.10.2015
Former [2016/09]FI15.07.2015
GR16.10.2015
Cited inInternational search[XY]US6391492  (KAWAKAMI SOICHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,8-11,13-26,28-31,33-41,75-78,86-91,94-98 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 55 * * column 6, line 16 - column 7, line 7 * * column 7, line 55 - column 10, line 34 * * column 16, line 7 - column 17, line 65 * * column 19, line 50 - column 20, line 27 * * column 24, lines 21-31 * * examples 15,16,22 * * figures 9b,9c,9f,9g,9h,10 * [Y] 7,12,27,32;
 [Y]US5702995  (FU JIE [JP]) [Y] 12,32 * column 2, line 19 - column 6, line 67 *;
 [DY]US5506068  (DAN PNINA [IL], et al) [DY] 7,27 * column 5, line 2 - column 7, line 58 *;
 [X]US5314765  (BATES JOHN B [US]) [X] 1,10,11,13-21,30,31,33-40,75-78,86-91,94-98 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 51 *;
 [X]EP1162675  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1,10-21,30-40,75-78,86-91,94-98 * paragraphs [0006] - [0017] * * examples 1-3 *;
 [A]US6228527  (MEDEIROS MARIA G [US], et al) [A] 21,43-47 * column 4, line 27 - column 5, line 25 *;
 [A]US4414293  (JOY RICHARD W [US], et al) [A] 21,58-60 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 11 *
ExaminationUS3607417
 US2001028977
by applicantUS4985317
 US5702995
 US6030909
 US6315881
 US6485622
 WO2004036669
 US7282302
 US2008057386
 US2004197641
 US6376123
    - T. KESSLER ET AL., "Large Microsheet Glass for 40-in. Class PALC Displays", FMC2-3, DOWNLOADED FROM SHOTT GLASS WEBSITE, (1997), URL: http://www.schott.com/english
    - T. KESSLER ET AL., "Large Microsheet Glass for 40-in. Class PALC Displays", FMC2-3, (1997), URL: http://www.schott.com/english