Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1682014 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1682014



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 255
07.12.2018 Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application Search / examination 1
30.11.2018 Closing of application Search / examination 2
29.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.11.2018 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
17.08.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
10.08.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
03.08.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
03.08.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
03.08.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
26.07.2018 Preparation for oral proceedings Appeal 2
13.06.2018 Refund of fees Appeal 1
12.06.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.06.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 11
05.06.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Search / examination 11
05.06.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Search / examination 1
05.06.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
30.11.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
27.11.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
22.11.2017 F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation Appeal 1
10.11.2017 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
09.11.2017 F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet Appeal 2
06.10.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
14.09.2017 Submission concerning representation Appeal 1
04.09.2017 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
17.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.08.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 9
17.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
17.08.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
21.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
21.06.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
28.04.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
21.04.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
21.04.2017 Decision to refuse according to the state of the file Search / examination 2
21.04.2017 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
21.04.2017 Means of redress Search / examination 2
03.04.2017 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
27.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.03.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
27.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.02.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 9
22.08.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
08.08.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
08.08.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
08.08.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
28.07.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
25.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
25.09.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
25.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.09.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
26.05.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
20.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.05.2015 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.03.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
19.03.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.09.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.09.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
17.09.2012 Claims Search / examination 3
17.09.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.09.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
17.07.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
10.07.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.07.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.07.2012 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.03.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
05.03.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.02.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.01.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.01.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
14.01.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
14.01.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
14.01.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.01.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.01.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.01.2011 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
24.11.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.11.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.11.2010 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
05.11.2010 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
19.10.2010 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.10.2010 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 1
30.07.2010 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
05.03.2009 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 4
28.06.2006 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
27.06.2006 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
26.06.2006 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
26.06.2006 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
23.06.2006 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
12.06.2006 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
16.05.2006 Annex Search / examination 1
16.05.2006 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
16.05.2006 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
15.05.2006 Fax request to enter the European phase Search / examination 8
15.05.2006 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
05.04.2006 Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) Search / examination 1
23.03.2006 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
23.03.2006 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
03.03.2006 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
18.05.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 11
28.04.2005 Published international application - A2 Search / examination 33