Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1691871

EP1691871 - VENT SYSTEM FOR CPAP PATIENT INTERFACE USED IN TREATMENT OF SLEEP DISORDERED BREATHING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.10.2013
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.11.2013  [2013/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ResMed Limited
1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive
Bella Vista, NSW 2153 / AU
[N/P]
Former [2006/39]For all designated states
ResMed Limited
1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive
Bella Vista NSW 2153 / AU
Former [2006/34]For all designated states
RESMED LIMITED
97 Waterloo Road, North Ryde
New South Wales 2113 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / DARKIN, Donald c/-ResMed Limited
97 Waterloo Road
North Ryde, New South Wales 2113 / AU
02 / MCAULIFFE, Patrick, John c/- ResMed Limited
97 Waterloo Road
North Ryde, New South Wales 2113 / AU
 [2006/34]
Representative(s)Freiherr Schenck zu Schweinsberg, Elard , et al
Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/34]Frhr.Schenck zu Schweinsberg, Elard , et al
Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Former [2006/34]Hagmann-Smith, Martin P.
Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford
Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB
Application number, filing date04797092.625.11.2004
[2006/34]
WO2004AU01650
Priority number, dateUS20030524728P25.11.2003         Original published format: US 524728 P
US20040538507P26.01.2004         Original published format: US 538507 P
US20040550319P08.03.2004         Original published format: US 550319 P
[2006/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005051468
Date:09.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1691871
Date:23.08.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005
[2006/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU09.06.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.08.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61M16/00
[2006/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/34]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ENTLÜFTUNGSSYSTEM FÜR CPAP-PATIENTEN-SCHNITTSTELLE BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON ATEMSTÖRUNGEN IM SCHLAF[2006/34]
English:VENT SYSTEM FOR CPAP PATIENT INTERFACE USED IN TREATMENT OF SLEEP DISORDERED BREATHING[2006/34]
French:SYSTEME D'EVENT DESTINE A UNE INTERFACE DE PATIENT EN VENTILATION SPONTANEE EN PRESSION POSITIVE CONTINUE, UTILISEE DANS LE TRAITEMENT DES TROUBLES RESPIRATOIRES PENDANT LE SOMMEIL[2006/34]
Entry into regional phase19.06.2006National basic fee paid 
19.06.2006Search fee paid 
19.06.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
19.06.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.06.2006Examination requested  [2006/34]
17.08.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/46]
06.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2013/46]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.04.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
15.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
12.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
12.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
14.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201209   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US3097642  (RUSSELL ALLAN M) [X] 1-3,6-8,11,12,14,15 * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 40; figures 1,3 * [Y] 4,5;
 [XY]US5040532  (ALFERY DAVID D [US]) [X] 1,2,6-8,11,12,14,15 * column 6, line 23 - column 7, line 54; figures 3-7 * [Y] 4,5;
 [Y]US6478026  (WOOD THOMAS J [US]) [Y] 4,5 * column 8, line 39 - column 9, line 58; figures 15-18 *;
 [A]US5067487  (BAUMAN JACK [US]) [A] 1 * figures 10,11 *;
 [A]US3913607  (PRICE JOHN H) [A] 1 * figures 1,2,7,8 *
International search[A]US6561191  (KWOK PHILIP R [AU]);
 [A]US6557555  (HOLLIS SHANE DOUGLAS [AU]);
 [A]GB1548374  (PENLON LTD);
 [A]US4437461  (GREENBERG MITCHELL H [US])
by applicantUS4944310
 US3097642
 US5040532
 US20030524728
 US20070605385
 US20190605503