Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1747642

EP1747642 - USER INTERFACE FOR INTEGRATING APPLICATIONS ON A MOBILE COMMUNICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  04.02.2011
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.02.2011Refusal of applicationpublished on 09.03.2011  [2011/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Research In Motion Limited
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2007/05]For all designated states
Research In Motion Limited
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / SCOTT, Sherryl, Lee, Lorraine
1-185 Beverly Street
Toronto, Ontario M5T 1Y9 / CA
 [2007/05]
Representative(s)Fennell, Gareth Charles , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/05]Fennell, Gareth Charles , et al
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date04797177.505.11.2004
[2007/05]
WO2004CA01923
Priority number, dateUS20040567563P03.05.2004         Original published format: US 567563 P
[2007/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005107153
Date:10.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1747642
Date:31.01.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2005
[2007/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA10.11.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/16, H04Q7/36, G06F17/00
[2007/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/05]
Extension statesAL04.12.2006
HR04.12.2006
LT04.12.2006
LV04.12.2006
MK04.12.2006
YU04.12.2006
TitleGerman:BENUTZEROBERFLÄCHE ZUR INTEGRATION VON ANWENDUNGEN AUF EINE MOBILE KOMMUNIKATIONSEINRICHTUNG[2007/05]
English:USER INTERFACE FOR INTEGRATING APPLICATIONS ON A MOBILE COMMUNICATION DEVICE[2007/05]
French:INTERFACE UTILISATEUR POUR L'INTEGRATION D'APPLICATIONS DANS UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE[2007/05]
Entry into regional phase04.12.2006National basic fee paid 
04.12.2006Search fee paid 
04.12.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.12.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA
01.12.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.12.2006Examination requested  [2007/05]
20.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.09.2010Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/10]
24.09.2010Date of oral proceedings
20.10.2010Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/10]
20.10.2010Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP10178511.1  / EP2259492
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
15.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
12.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
12.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9732439  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 1, line 11 - page 32, line 9 *;
 [A]US2003046296  (DOSS J SMITH [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0065] *;
 [A]US2004078441  (MALIK DALE W [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0076] *;
 [A]US2004054646  (DANIELL W TODD [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0149] *
International search[A]US6466203  (VAN EE JAN [US])
 [Y]  - "AIM Service Using Text Messaging (SMS).", (2002), URL: http://www.aol.ca/aim/mobile/im2sms/AIM_SMS_UG_generic.pdf, XP003018473
 [Y]  - ROGERS S. ET AL, "Novel GroupWise 6.5 Messaging Fundamentals.", (20031121), URL: http://www.informit.com/articles/article.asp?p=102026, XP003018474