Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1691989

EP1691989 - DATA CARRIER, AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.12.2009
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Giesecke & Devrient GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
81677 München / DE
[2006/34]
Inventor(s)01 / ENDRES, Günter
Karneidplatz 24
81547 München / DE
02 / KRUSE, Georg
Salmdorfer Strasse 20
85609 Aschheim / DE
 [2006/34]
Representative(s)Zeuner, Stefan
Zeuner Summerer Stütz Nussbaumstrasse 8
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/34]Zeuner, Stefan
Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Zeuner Hedwigstrasse 9
80636 München / DE
Application number, filing date04797920.816.11.2004
[2006/34]
WO2004EP12968
Priority number, dateDE200315614602.12.2003         Original published format: DE 10356146
[2006/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005053968
Date:16.06.2005
Language:DE
[2005/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1691989
Date:23.08.2006
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2005
[2006/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1691989
Date:11.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.06.2005
ClassificationInternational:B42D15/10, B41M3/14, B41M5/24, B41M3/10
[2006/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/34]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DATENTRÄGER UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG[2006/34]
English:DATA CARRIER, AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF[2006/34]
French:SUPPORT DE DONNEES ET PROCEDE POUR LE PRODUIRE[2006/34]
Entry into regional phase03.07.2006National basic fee paid 
03.07.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.09.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.07.2006Examination requested  [2006/34]
10.10.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.02.2007Fee for grant paid
20.02.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.03.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Opposition(s)12.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03]
Request for further processing for:22.05.2007Request for further processing filed
22.05.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.06.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
01.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
TR11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
HU12.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/32]CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
HU12.08.2009
Former [2011/15]CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
Former [2010/51]CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
Former [2010/10]CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
Former [2009/51]CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
Former [2009/47]DK11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
Former [2009/46]DK11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
Former [2009/41]FI11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
Former [2009/36]FI11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
ES22.05.2009
Former [2009/35]NL11.02.2009
ES22.05.2009
Cited inInternational search[X]DE10050553  (SCHREINER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-18 * column 4, line 37 - line 48; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO0230677  (SCHREINER GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1,13,16 * abstract *;
 [A]DE10154051  (KURZ LEONHARD FA [DE]) [A] 1,13,16 * page 9, line 18 - line 21; figures 11,12 *
by applicantDE3151407