Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1692297 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1692297



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 578
07.11.2012 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
08.12.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
21.11.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
21.11.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
10.10.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.10.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
10.10.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
10.10.2011 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
10.10.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.06.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
10.06.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
10.06.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
10.06.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 60
28.04.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.04.2011 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 6
28.04.2011 Description Search / examination 4
28.04.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.04.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.03.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
24.02.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.02.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.02.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.11.2010 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
29.11.2010 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
20.10.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
20.10.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.09.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
02.09.2010 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Search / examination 14
02.09.2010 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 14
30.08.2010 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
25.08.2010 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
09.08.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 23
16.07.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
12.06.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.05.2010 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 8
26.05.2010 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
09.03.2010 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
09.03.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.02.2010 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
30.11.2009 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
30.11.2009 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
04.11.2009 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
16.10.2009 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
16.10.2009 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
30.09.2009 Claims Appeal 4
30.09.2009 Claims Appeal 4
30.09.2009 Claims Appeal 4
30.09.2009 Claims Appeal 4
30.09.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
30.09.2009 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
30.09.2009 Non-scannable object Appeal 2
30.09.2009 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
10.09.2009 Claims Appeal 5
10.09.2009 Claims Appeal 4
10.09.2009 Drawings Appeal 1
10.09.2009 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
16.07.2009 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
10.07.2009 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
10.07.2009 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
30.04.2009 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
30.04.2009 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
30.04.2009 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 2
30.04.2009 Means of redress Search / examination 2
29.04.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
29.04.2009 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
29.04.2009 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
29.04.2009 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
29.04.2009 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
08.04.2009 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
06.04.2009 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
02.04.2009 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
23.03.2009 Claims Search / examination 1
23.03.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 3
20.03.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
20.03.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
20.03.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
20.03.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 3
09.08.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
31.07.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
31.07.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
18.07.2008 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
03.11.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.10.2007 Claims Search / examination 4
10.10.2007 Claims Search / examination 4
10.10.2007 Description Search / examination 2
10.10.2007 Description Search / examination 2
10.10.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.09.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.09.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
14.09.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.05.2007 Annex to a communication Search / examination 17
07.05.2007 Annex to a communication Search / examination 8
07.05.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
07.05.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.03.2007 Claims Search / examination 4
13.03.2007 Claims Search / examination 4
13.03.2007 Description Search / examination 1
13.03.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.03.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.03.2007 Claims Search / examination 4
08.03.2007 Claims Search / examination 4
08.03.2007 Description Search / examination 1
08.03.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.03.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.11.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
08.11.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.07.2006 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
18.07.2006 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
22.06.2006 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
19.06.2006 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
19.06.2006 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
19.06.2006 Sequence listing Search / examination 11
28.04.2006 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
11.04.2006 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
04.11.2005 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.11.2005 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.11.2005 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
04.11.2005 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
04.11.2005 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
04.11.2005 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
04.11.2005 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.11.2005 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
20.07.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 62
23.06.2005 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
23.06.2005 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 59
10.06.2005 Free text PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
10.06.2005 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
10.06.2005 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
28.05.2005 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
28.05.2005 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
01.12.2004 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
01.12.2004 Claims International Searching Authority 4
01.12.2004 Description International Searching Authority 30
01.12.2004 Drawings International Searching Authority 13
01.12.2004 Sequence listing International Searching Authority 11
01.12.2004 Submission concerning representation International Searching Authority 1