Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1687589

EP1687589 - METHOD OF ERROR COMPENSATION IN A COORDINATE MEASURING MACHINE WITH AN ARTICULATING PROBE HEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.08.2012
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2017Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 06.12.2017  [2017/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Renishaw plc
New Mills Wotton-Under-Edge
Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB
[2006/32]
Inventor(s)01 / MCMURTRY, David, Roberts
Park Farm Stancombe
Dursley
Gloucestershire GL11 6AT / GB
02 / MCFARLAND, Geoff
The Manse 22 Church Road Upper Cam
Dursley
Gloucestershire GL11 5PG / GB
03 / JONAS, Kevyn, Barry
18 Sunningdale
Clifton
Bristol BS8 2NF / GB
 [2012/36]
Former [2006/32]01 / MCMURTRY, David, Roberts
Park Farm Stancombe Dursley
Gloucestershire GL11 6AT / GB
02 / MCFARLAND, Geoff
The Manse 22 Church Road Upper Cam Dursley
Gloucestershire GL11 5PG / GB
03 / JONAS, Kevyn, Barry
18 Sunningdale Clifton
Bristol BS8 2NF / GB
Representative(s)Dunn, Paul Edward , et al
Renishaw plc
Patent Department
New Mills
Wotton-under-Edge, Glos. GL12 8JR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/36]Leland, Emma Clare , et al
Renishaw plc
New Mills
Wotton-under-Edge
GB-Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB
Former [2006/32]Leland, Emma Clare , et al
Renishaw plc New Mills Wotton-under-Edge
GB-Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB
Application number, filing date04798549.415.11.2004
[2006/32]
WO2004GB04830
Priority number, dateGB2003002653213.11.2003         Original published format: GB 0326532
[2006/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005050134
Date:02.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1687589
Date:09.08.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2005
[2006/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1687589
Date:05.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.06.2005
ClassificationInternational:G01B21/04
[2006/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/32]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR FEHLERKOMPENSATION IN EINER KOORDINATENMESSMASCHINE MIT EINEM ARTIKULIERENDEN SONDENKOPF[2006/32]
English:METHOD OF ERROR COMPENSATION IN A COORDINATE MEASURING MACHINE WITH AN ARTICULATING PROBE HEAD[2006/32]
French:PROCEDE DE COMPENSATION D'ERREURS DANS UNE MACHINE DE MESURE DE COORDONNEES AVEC UNE TETE DE SONDE ARTICULEE[2006/32]
Entry into regional phase09.06.2006National basic fee paid 
09.06.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
09.06.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.06.2006Examination requested  [2006/32]
31.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.07.2012Fee for grant paid
23.07.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.08.2006
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.05.2013  15.05.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Carl Zeiss Industrielle Messtechnik GmbH
Carl Zeiss Strasse 22
73447 Oberkochen / DE
Opponent's representative
Carl Zeiss AG - Patentabteilung
Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22
73447 Oberkochen / DE
 02  05.06.2013  11.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Hexagon Technology Center GmbH
Heinrich-Wild-Strasse
9435 Heerbrugg / CH
Opponent's representative
Kaminski Harmann
Patentanwälte AG
Landstrasse 124
9490 Vaduz / LI
 [2017/49]
Former [2013/28]
Opponent(s)01  03.05.2013  15.05.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Carl Zeiss Industrielle Messtechnik GmbH
Carl Zeiss Strasse 22
73447 Oberkochen / DE
Opponent's representative
Carl Zeiss AG - Patentabteilung
Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22
73447 Oberkochen / DE
 02  05.06.2013   
Hexagon Technology Center GmbH
Heinrich-Wild-Strasse
9435 Heerbrugg / CH
Opponent's representative
Harmann, Bernd-Günther
Kaminski Harmann
Patentanwälte AG
Landstrasse 124
9490 Vaduz / LI
Former [2013/24]
Opponent(s)01  03.05.2013   
Carl Zeiss Industrielle Messtechnik GmbH
Carl Zeiss Strasse 22
73447 Oberkochen / DE
Opponent's representative
Carl Zeiss AG - Patentabteilung
Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22
73447 Oberkochen / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
15.07.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.03.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
12.05.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.05.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition05.07.2016Appeal received No.  T1593/16
21.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
08.07.2016Appeal received No.  T1593/16
12.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
17.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
24.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
23.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.11.2004
AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
TR05.09.2012
IE15.11.2012
LU15.11.2012
FR30.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
BG05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
TR05.09.2012
IE15.11.2012
LU15.11.2012
FR30.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
BG05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
Former [2014/21]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
TR05.09.2012
IE15.11.2012
FR30.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
BG05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
Former [2013/50]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
IE15.11.2012
FR30.11.2012
BG05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
Former [2013/47]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
IE15.11.2012
BG05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
Former [2013/34]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
Former [2013/28]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
Former [2013/23]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
Former [2013/22]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
Former [2013/20]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
GR06.12.2012
Former [2013/12]AT05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
GR06.12.2012
Former [2013/11]AT05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
GR06.12.2012
Former [2013/10]AT05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
Former [2013/09]AT05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
Former [2013/07]AT05.09.2012
Cited inInternational search[PX]EP1391684  (ZEISS CARL [DE], et al) [PX] 1-4,6,11,14-18 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraphs [0019] , [0020] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0036] * * abstract *;
 [X]US5138563  (DEBITSCH RASMUS [DE], et al) [X] 1-18 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 46 * * column 4, line 19 - line 26 * * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 20 * * abstract *;
 [A]US6546643  (LOTZE WERNER [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 7, line 15 - column 9, line 62 * * abstract *
by applicantUS5138563
 EP1391684