Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1687589 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1687589



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1551
06.11.2017 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
06.11.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.11.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.10.2017 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
29.09.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.09.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.09.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
09.06.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.06.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.06.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
08.02.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.02.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.02.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 104
03.02.2017 Claims Appeal 96
03.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
03.02.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 34
03.11.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
26.09.2016 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
21.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
21.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
21.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
21.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
21.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
21.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
21.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
21.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
21.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 25
21.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
21.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
21.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
21.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
21.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 32
21.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
21.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
21.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
21.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
21.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
21.09.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 58
16.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.09.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.09.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 49
12.09.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 48
16.07.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
16.07.2016 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
14.07.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
14.07.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
08.07.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
08.07.2016 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
05.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.07.2016 Letter concerning fees and payments Appeal 1
05.07.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
05.07.2016 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
27.05.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.05.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.05.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.05.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.05.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.05.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.05.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.05.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.05.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.05.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
12.05.2016 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
12.05.2016 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
12.05.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 15
12.05.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
12.05.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
12.05.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
12.05.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
12.05.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
12.05.2016 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.05.2016 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
18.03.2016 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
14.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
10.03.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
01.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
01.03.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
18.02.2016 Claims Opposition 5
18.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
18.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
18.02.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
18.02.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
18.02.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 15
18.02.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
23.01.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.01.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.01.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.01.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
08.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
08.01.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.09.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
22.08.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 3
18.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.08.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
06.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
06.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
06.08.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.08.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.08.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.07.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.07.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.07.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.07.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
30.07.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
30.07.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
30.07.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.07.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.07.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.07.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.07.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.07.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
04.07.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
25.03.2014 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 16
17.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.03.2014 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 16
07.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.01.2014 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
03.01.2014 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.12.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
22.11.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
20.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.11.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
12.11.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
15.07.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
15.07.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
15.07.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
11.06.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
05.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
05.06.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 45
05.06.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
05.06.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
05.06.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
05.06.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
05.06.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
05.06.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
05.06.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
05.06.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
05.06.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
05.06.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
05.06.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
05.06.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
08.05.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
04.05.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.05.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
03.05.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
03.05.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 36
03.05.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
03.05.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
03.05.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
03.05.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
03.05.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
03.05.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
03.05.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
03.05.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
05.09.2012 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
09.08.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.07.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
28.07.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
28.07.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
23.07.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
23.07.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
23.07.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
23.07.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
19.04.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
19.04.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
19.04.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
19.04.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 29
07.04.2011 Claims Search / examination 5
07.04.2011 Claims Search / examination 5
07.04.2011 Description Search / examination 2
07.04.2011 Description Search / examination 2
07.04.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.03.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
29.03.2011 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
29.03.2011 Claims Search / examination 5
29.03.2011 Description Search / examination 2
29.03.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.03.2007 Annex Search / examination 12
28.02.2007 Claims Search / examination 4
28.02.2007 Description Search / examination 5
28.02.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
20.12.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
19.12.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.12.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.12.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.08.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
31.08.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.07.2006 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
29.06.2006 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
09.06.2006 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
09.06.2006 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
30.05.2006 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
07.04.2006 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
21.06.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 22
02.06.2005 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
02.06.2005 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 31
13.12.2004 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
13.12.2004 Claims International Searching Authority 5
13.12.2004 Description International Searching Authority 18
13.12.2004 Drawings International Searching Authority 6