Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1685421

EP1685421 - READOUT ORDERING IN COLLECTION OF RADIAL MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.08.2009
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.01.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 22.02.2012  [2012/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[2008/42]
Former [2006/31]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / DANNELS, Wayne, R.
595 Miner Road
Cleveland, OH 44143 / US
 [2006/31]
Representative(s)Cohen, Julius Simon
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2006/31]Cohen, Julius Simon
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards, P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date04799053.603.11.2004
[2006/31]
WO2004IB52286
Priority number, dateUS20030519836P13.11.2003         Original published format: US 519836 P
[2006/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005047920
Date:26.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1685421
Date:02.08.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2005
[2006/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1685421
Date:15.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.05.2005
ClassificationInternational:G01R33/567
[2006/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/31]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUSLESEREIHENFOLGE BEIM SAMMELN RADIALER MAGNETRESONANZ-BILDDATEN[2006/31]
English:READOUT ORDERING IN COLLECTION OF RADIAL MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING DATA[2006/31]
French:ORDONNANCEMENT DE LECTURE DANS LA COLLECTE DE DONNEES RADIALES D'IMAGERIE PAR RESONANCE MAGNETIQUE[2006/31]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2006National basic fee paid 
13.06.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.06.2006Examination requested  [2006/31]
18.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.2008Fee for grant paid
19.08.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.07.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
CY15.10.2008
CZ15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
EE15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IT15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
PL15.10.2008
RO15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
SK15.10.2008
TR15.10.2008
IE03.11.2008
LU03.11.2008
CH30.11.2008
LI30.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
FR15.12.2008
BG15.01.2009
SE15.01.2009
GR16.01.2009
ES26.01.2009
IS15.02.2009
PT16.03.2009
HU16.04.2009
[2012/08]
Former [2010/51]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
CY15.10.2008
CZ15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
EE15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IT15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
PL15.10.2008
RO15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
SK15.10.2008
TR15.10.2008
IE03.11.2008
LU03.11.2008
CH30.11.2008
LI30.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
BG15.01.2009
SE15.01.2009
GR16.01.2009
ES26.01.2009
IS15.02.2009
PT16.03.2009
HU16.04.2009
Former [2010/38]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
CY15.10.2008
CZ15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
EE15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IT15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
PL15.10.2008
RO15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
SK15.10.2008
TR15.10.2008
IE03.11.2008
LU03.11.2008
CH30.11.2008
LI30.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
BG15.01.2009
SE15.01.2009
ES26.01.2009
IS15.02.2009
PT16.03.2009
HU16.04.2009
Former [2010/36]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
CY15.10.2008
CZ15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
EE15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IT15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
PL15.10.2008
RO15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
SK15.10.2008
IE03.11.2008
LU03.11.2008
CH30.11.2008
LI30.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
BG15.01.2009
SE15.01.2009
ES26.01.2009
IS15.02.2009
PT16.03.2009
HU16.04.2009
Former [2010/33]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
CZ15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
EE15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IT15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
PL15.10.2008
RO15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
SK15.10.2008
IE03.11.2008
LU03.11.2008
CH30.11.2008
LI30.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
BG15.01.2009
SE15.01.2009
ES26.01.2009
IS15.02.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/51]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
CZ15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
EE15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IT15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
PL15.10.2008
RO15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
SK15.10.2008
IE03.11.2008
CH30.11.2008
LI30.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
BG15.01.2009
SE15.01.2009
ES26.01.2009
IS15.02.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/47]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
CZ15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
EE15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IT15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
PL15.10.2008
RO15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
SK15.10.2008
IE03.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
BG15.01.2009
SE15.01.2009
ES26.01.2009
IS15.02.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/44]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
CZ15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
EE15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IT15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
PL15.10.2008
RO15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
SK15.10.2008
MC30.11.2008
BG15.01.2009
SE15.01.2009
ES26.01.2009
IS15.02.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/41]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
CZ15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
EE15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IT15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
PL15.10.2008
RO15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
MC30.11.2008
BG15.01.2009
SE15.01.2009
ES26.01.2009
IS15.02.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/36]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
EE15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
PL15.10.2008
RO15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
MC30.11.2008
BG15.01.2009
ES26.01.2009
IS15.02.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/35]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
PL15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
MC30.11.2008
BG15.01.2009
ES26.01.2009
IS15.02.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/32]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
PL15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
MC30.11.2008
BG15.01.2009
ES26.01.2009
IS15.02.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/29]AT15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
PL15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
MC30.11.2008
BG15.01.2009
ES26.01.2009
IS15.02.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/26]AT15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
PL15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
BG15.01.2009
ES26.01.2009
IS15.02.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/24]AT15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
BG15.01.2009
ES26.01.2009
IS15.02.2009
Former [2009/20]ES26.01.2009
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0218838  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-3,8-12,14,16,18-20 * page 1, line 7 - page 3, line 5 * * page 4, line 4 - page 6, line 6 * * page 26, line 11 - line 17 * * page 31, line 10 - page 32, line 14 *;
 [A]EP0981058  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
 [X]  - VAN DE WALLE R ET AL, "Projection reconstruction MR imaging for the reduction of artifacts caused by interview motion", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NUCLEAR SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 46, no. 6, ISSN 0018-9499, pages 2253 - 2258, XP002321151 [X] 1,12,19,20 * pages 2253 - 2255: Abstract, paragraphs I and II.A *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/23.819312
 [A]  - SCHAFFTER T ET AL, "Motion compensated projection reconstruction", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, (1999), vol. 41, no. 5, ISSN 0740-3194, pages 954 - 963, XP002321152 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1522-2594(199905)41:5<954::AID-MRM15>3.0.CO;2-J
by applicantEP0218838